McDonald v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Plaintiff: Makenzie McDonald
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Case Number: 2:2024cv00523
Filed: September 25, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Joseph R Goodwin
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 LETTER to Clerk, Kanawha County Magistrate Court, from Clerk, USDC/SDWV dated 11/13/2024, re: Enclosing certified copy of docket sheet and original case file pursuant to the #12 Memorandum Opinion and Order entered of even date remanding this case. (jsa)
November 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER granting Plaintiff's #5 MOTION to Remand; denying Plaintiff's #5 MOTION for Costs and Fees; Defendant's #11 MOTION to Stay is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 11/13/2024. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (jsa)
November 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 UNOPPOSED MOTION by Makenzie McDonald to Stay Scheduling Deadlines in the #4 Order and Notice. (Attachment: #1 Proposed Order)(Cary, Michael) (Modified on 11/8/2024 to add link to #4 order) (kew).
October 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REPLY by Makenzie McDonald to #9 Response In Opposition. (Cary, Michael)
October 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RESPONSE by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC in opposition to #5 MOTION by Makenzie McDonald to Remand and for Costs and Fees. (Ward, Matthew)
October 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MAGISTRATE COURT RECORDS from Kanawha County. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (kew)
October 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Ward, Matthew)
October 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM by Makenzie McDonald in support of #5 MOTION by Makenzie McDonald to Remand and for Costs and Fees. (Cary, Michael)
October 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION by Makenzie McDonald to Remand and for Costs and Fees. (Cary, Michael)
September 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND NOTICE: Motions under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) - 10/17/2024. Last day for Rule 26(f) meeting - 10/28/2024. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) meeting - 11/4/2024. Scheduling Conference at 9:00 AM on 11/18/2024 at the Robert C. Byrd United States Courthouse, 300 Virginia Street East, Room 6610 (Library/Conference Room), Charleston, WV. Entry of scheduling order - 11/25/2024. Last day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures - 12/2/2024. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 9/26/2024. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (mfo)
September 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED SEPTEMBER 1, 2024. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley. (cc: counsel of record and any pro se party) (klc)
September 25, 2024 Opinion or Order CASE assigned to Judge Joseph R. Goodwin. (klc)
September 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (lca)
September 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC with summons and complaint, answer from Magistrate Court of Kanawha County. Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-8739425. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (lca) (Modified on 9/26/2024 to update docket text and associated court) (ts).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDonald v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Represented By: Matthew L. Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Makenzie McDonald
Represented By: Michael McDonald Cary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?