Ayash v. Barnette et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Ayash
Defendant: David Barnette and Karl Hamm
Case Number: 2:2024cv00720
Filed: December 13, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene C Berger
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING ORDER directing that the scheduling conference set for 2/6/2025, is cancelled and that this case shall proceed as follows: The amendment of any pleading and the joinder of any party shall be completed no later than 3/17/2025. Last date to serve discovery requests - 7/14/2025. All discovery to be completed - 8/8/2025. Last date to complete depositions - 8/28/2025. Opening Rule 26 expert disclosures - 6/30/2025. Responsive Rule 26 expert disclosures - 7/29/2025. Rebuttal Rule 26 expert disclosure - 8/14/2025. Dispositive motions deadline - 10/14/2025. Responses to dispositive motions are due within 14 days, with replies due within 7 days. Settlement Meeting must be held 45 days prior to Pretrial Conference. Mediation must be concluded 30 days prior to Pretrial Conference. A written status report is due within 5 days of completion of mediation. If the case is not settled, all Rule 26(a)(3) disclosures are due 30 days prior to Pretrial Conference. Motions in limine deadline - 1/5/2026. Responses for motions in limine - 1/12/2026. Proposed voir dire, jury instructions, and verdict form - 2/2/2026. The Plaintiff's portion of the proposed integrated pretrial order shall be submitted to opposing counsel by 1/29/2026, Integrated pretrial order - 2/5/2026. Pretrial Conference/Final Settlement Conference on 2/12/2026 at 9:00 AM. Trial on 2/23/2026 at 9:00 AM before the undersigned. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 2/3/2025. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (lca)
January 28, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by Christopher Ayash, David Barnette, Karl Hamm. (Smith, Christopher) (Modified on 1/29/2025 to add party filers) (kew).
January 13, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SEALED UNREDACTED REPLY by David Barnette and Karl Hamm to Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; filed pursuant to Memorandum Opinion and Order (ECF No. 18). (arb)
January 13, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SEALED RESPONSE by Christopher Ayash in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; filed pursuant to Memorandum Opinion and Order (ECF No. 18). (arb)
January 13, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SEALED EXHIBITS I - IV by David Barnette and Karl Hamm to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment; filed pursuant to Memorandum Opinion and Order (ECF No. 18). (arb)
January 13, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting the MOTION by David Barnette and Karl Hamm to File Under Seal Certain Documents to be Attached to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment in Favor of Defendants (ECF No. 7); granting the MOTION by Christopher Ayash to File Under Seal Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 10); and granting the MOTION by David Barnette and Karl Hamm to File Under Seal Unredacted Version of Defendants' Reply to Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 16). Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 1/13/2025. (cc: counsel of record and any unrepresented party) (arb)
January 8, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by David Barnette, Karl Hamm in support of #16 MOTION by David Barnette, Karl Hamm to File Under Seal Unredacted Version of Reply to Response in Opposition (ECF No. 12) to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Rodgers, R.)
January 3, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION by David Barnette, Karl Hamm to File Under Seal Unredacted Version of Reply to Response in Opposition (ECF No. 12) to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (Rodgers, R.)
January 3, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REPLY by David Barnette, Karl Hamm to #12 Response In Opposition. (Rodgers, R.)
January 2, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying the parties' #13 Agreed Order Extending Deadline for Defendants to File Their Reply to Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, construed as a motion to extend time, finding that the parties have failed to set forth good cause for the requested additional time given the lack of factual information included in the motion. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 1/2/2025. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (jsa)
December 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PROPOSED ORDER Agreed Order Extending Deadline for Defendants to File Their Reply to Plaintiff's "Response In Opposition to Defendants' Motion To Dismiss" by David Barnette, Karl Hamm, Christopher Ayash. (Rodgers, R.) (Modified on 12/31/2024 to add party filer) (kew).
December 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RESPONSE by Christopher Ayash in opposition to #4 MOTION by David Barnette, Karl Hamm to Dismiss Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment. (Smith, Christopher)
December 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Christopher Ayash in support of #10 MOTION by Christopher Ayash to File Under Seal Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 4). (Smith, Christopher)
December 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION by Christopher Ayash to File Under Seal Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 4). (Attachment: #1 Proposed Response)(Smith, Christopher)
December 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by David Barnette, Karl Hamm for Motion To File Under Seal Certain Documents To Be Attached To "Defendants' Motion To Dismiss Plaintiff's 'Complaint,' Or, In The Alternative, For Summary Judgment In Favor Of Defendants". (Rodgers, R.)
December 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by David Barnette, Karl Hamm in support of #7 MOTION by David Barnette, Karl Hamm to File Under Seal Certain Documents to be Attached to Motion to Dismiss Complaint Attached to Notice of Removal or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 4). (Rodgers, R.)
December 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION by David Barnette, Karl Hamm to File Under Seal Certain Documents to be Attached to Motion to Dismiss Complaint Attached to Notice of Removal or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 4) (Attachment: #1 Exhibits I-IV)(Rodgers, R.)
December 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER AND NOTICE: Motions under FR Civ P 12(b) - 1/14/2025. Last day for Rule 26(f) meeting - 1/21/2025. Last day to file Report of Parties' Planning Meeting and Scheduling Order Worksheet - 1/28/2025. Scheduling Conference at 2:30 PM in Charleston, West Virginia on 2/6/2025, before the undersigned, unless cancelled. Entry of Scheduling Order - 2/13/2025. Last day to serve FR Civ P 26(a)(1) initial disclosures pre-discovery - 2/20/2025. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 12/17/2024. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (mfo)
December 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by David Barnette, Karl Hamm in support of #4 MOTION by David Barnette, Karl Hamm to Dismiss Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment. (Rodgers, R.)
December 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION by David Barnette, Karl Hamm to Dismiss Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment. (Rodgers, R.) (Modified on 12/17/2024 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (kew).
December 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER FOR ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES OF CIVIL ACTIONS ASSIGNED TO JUDGE IRENE C. BERGER ENTERED NOVEMBER 12, 2019. This matter referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn for Discovery. (cc: counsel of record and any pro se party) (klc)
December 13, 2024 Opinion or Order CASE assigned to Judge Irene C. Berger. (klc)
December 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendants David Barnette and Karl Hamm. (mfo)
December 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Karl Hamm, David Barnette with summons, complaint, docket sheet and other miscellaneous documents from the Circuit Court of Kanawha County. Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-8790293. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (mfo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ayash v. Barnette et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Barnette
Represented By: R. Terrance Rodgers
Represented By: John R. McGhee, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karl Hamm
Represented By: R. Terrance Rodgers
Represented By: John R. McGhee, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Ayash
Represented By: Christopher D. Smith
Represented By: Benjamin L. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?