Robinson v. Quicken Loans, Inc.
Plaintiff: Janet R. Robinson
Defendant: Quicken Loans, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and John Doe Holder
Case Number: 3:2012cv00981
Filed: April 5, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Office: Huntington Office
County: Cabell
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Chambers
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 248 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 219 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply, however, Plaintiff's request in her Surreply to "conform the pleadings to the evidence" is Denied; 204 MOTION for Summary Judgment is Granted in Part and Denied in Part; denying 202 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment; Plaintiff's fraud claim that, during loan-origination process, an agent of Quicken Loans misrepresented that the loan's interest rate would not rise and the Plaintiff relied upon that claim to her detriment is Dismissed as time-barred. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 12/23/2013. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (skm)
August 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 201 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 185 MOTION and 186 MOTION to Quash or Modify Subpoenas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 8/29/2013. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party, Ms. Duncan and Ms. Jefferson) (skm)
August 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 199 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER For the reasons that follow, the Court Grants Ms. Bishop's 164 motion to quash the subpoena, but Denies her request for a protective order limiting any future deposition to one taken by means of written questions; instead, the Court Grants Quicken leave to take the deposition of Ms. Bishop by oral examination, upon amended subpoena and subject to the limitations set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 8/22/2013. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (skm)
May 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 156 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying Plaintiff's 133 MOTION to Compel Production of Settlement Agreement and Related Documents Regarding the 2008 Litigation Between Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 5/10/2013. (cc: attys) (mkw)
April 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 152 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re: Plaintiff's 134 SUBMISSION OF EXPENSES FOR REIMBURSEMENT; granting Plaintiff's request for reimbursement and directing defendant Quicken Loans, Inc., or its counsel, to reimburse Plaintiff the sum of $1037.96 within 14 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 4/25/2013. (cc: attys) (mkw)
April 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 147 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER For the reasons outlined within this Order, the Court Grants in Part and Denies in Part Quicken's 117 objections to the magistrate judge's 02/11/2013 Order. The Court Grants Quicken's first objections; Denies Quicken's second and third objection. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 4/18/2013. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (skm)
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting Defendant's 102 MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendant Quicken Loans, Inc. to Produce Complete Responses to Plaintiff's Combined Discovery Requests; granting Plaintiff's 84 MOTION to Compel Defendant Quicken Loans, Inc. to Produce Complete Responses to Plaintiff's Combined Discovery Requests and 87 MOTION to Compel Defendant Quicken Loans, Inc. to Produce a Witness for Deposition on Loan Transfer & Ownership and directing as more fully set forth herein; directing Defendant to identify, by 2/22/2013, a corporate representative who can appear for deposition and testify regarding the ownership and transfer of Plaintiff's loan; also, by 2/22/2013, Defendant shall supply Plaintiff with two or three alternative dates and times on which the deposition may take place; the deposition shall be completed as promptly as possible prior to 3/16/2013; Plaint iff also requests an extension of deadlines in the Scheduling Order; given that the District Court has just entered an Order extending the deadlines, the undersigned is hesitant to recommend additional extensions at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 2/11/2013. (cc: attys) (mkw)
December 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting Plaintiff's 62 MOTION to Convert Portions of Motion to Quash Subpoenas to a Motion for Protective Order; granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 46 MOTION to Quash or for Protective Order; denying Plaintiff's 46 MOTION to quash the subpoena in its entirety but directing the Defendant to modify its subpoena to Plaintiff's former employer, Highmark West Virginia Inc., as more fully set forth herein; granting Plaintiff's motion for a protective order, in part, and directing the Defendant to reissue subpoenas duces tecum to the financial institutions, which incorporate the following limitations, as more fully set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 12/5/2012. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mkw)
August 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 11 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 8/24/2012. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (dcm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Quicken Loans, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quicken Loans, Inc.
Represented By: Carrie Goodwin Fenwick
Represented By: Thomas R. Goodwin
Represented By: Joseph M. Ward
Represented By: Victoria L. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Jeremy Cook Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Holder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet R. Robinson
Represented By: Jennifer S. Wagner
Represented By: Daniel F. Hedges 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?