Johnson et al v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Betty J. Trinque, 3:13-cv-14207, Mindi Stewart, Lance R. Belville, Laura Elsinger, Inez A. Patton, Michael Antramgarza, Charles Johnson, Carolyn Chase, 3:13-cv-14207, Pamela D. Smith, 3:13-cv-14207, Roofwerks, Inc., Quintin Williams, Donald C. Carr, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, Gabriel Kletschka, Mills Allison, Stanley Stewart, Greg Peet, 3:13-cv-14207, John McGee, Christine Salamone, David H. Patton, Dean Richardson, Robert Brandon, 3:13-cv-20976, Jill Durant, Sharon Shaffer, 3:13-cv-14207, ACA Legal Investigations, Inc. and Josh Legato
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Consolidated Plaintiff: Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, George Shaffer, 3:13-cv-14207, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Jolene Harris, 3:13-cv-20976, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976 and Tony Burnett, 3:13-cv-14207
Counter Defendant: Beverly Gorton
Interested Party: Progressive Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2013cv06529
Filed: March 28, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Office: Huntington Office
County: Cabell
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1197 COSTS TAXED BY THE CLERK OF COURT in the sum of $26,095.01, in favor of Ford Motor Company and against Plaintiffs. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(d)(1), on motion served within 7 days, the Court may review the Clerk's decision on taxation of costs. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A) (slr)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1196 ORDER granting Defendant's #1195 MOTION to Allow for the Withdrawal of counsel J.Tracy Walker IV for Defendant. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 5/10/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1195 MOTION by J. Tracy Walker, IV to Allow the Withdrawal of Counsel on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Attachment: #1 Proposed Order)(Bonasso, Michael)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1194 MANDATE re: #1180 Notice of Appeal to the 4CCA in 4CCA Case No. 18-1470. The judgment of this Court, entered 3/25/2019, takes effect today. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. (jsa)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1193 NOTICE OF JUDGMENT as to #1180 Notice of Appeal to the 4CCA in 4CCA Case Number 18-1470. (mkw)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1192 4CCA JUDGMENT re: #1180 Notice of Appeal to the 4CCA in 4CCA Case No. 18-1470. In accordance with the decision of this court, the judgment of the district court is affirmed. This judgment shall take effect upon issuance of this court's mandate in accordance with Fed. R. App. P. 41. (mkw)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1191 4CCA OPINION re: #1180 Notice of Appeal to the 4CCA in 4CCA Case No. 18-1470. (mkw)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1190 SEALED EXHIBITS FROM SUMMARY JUDGMENT HEARING HELD 2/1/2018. Plaintiff's Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Power Point (flash drive) maintained in the sealed vault in the Office of the Clerk of Court. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Exhibit 3 - Deposition Transcripts, Part 1, #2 Plaintiff's Exhibit 3 - Deposition Transcripts, Part 2, #3 Plaintiff's Exhibit 3 - Deposition Transcripts, Part 3, #4 Plaintiff's Exhibit 3 - Deposition Transcripts, Part 4, #5 Plaintiff's Exhibit 3 - Deposition Transcripts, Part 5, #6 Plaintiff's Exhibit 3 - Deposition Transcripts, Part 6) (jsa)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1189 EXHIBIT LIST FROM SUMMARY JUDGMENT HEARING held 2/1/2018. Plaintiff's Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Power Point (flash drive) maintained in the sealed vault in the Office of the Clerk of Court as the sealed #1190 exhibits are combined on the same flash drive. (Attachment: #1 Defendant's Exhibit 1 - Defendant's Power Point) (jsa)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1188 EXHIBIT LIST FROM DAUBERT HEARING held 1/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Defendant's Exhibit 1, Part 1, #2 Defendant's Exhibit 1, Part 2) (jsa)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia (WVSD) will be upgrading its current CM/ECF system to the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) on Monday, June 11, 2018. The WVSD CM/ECF system will be unavailable from 12:00pm (noon) on Friday, June 8, 2018 until 6:00am on Monday, June 11, 2018. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step one was to upgrade your PACER account. Each attorney should have their own individual upgraded PACER account at this time. Step two will be to link your upgraded PACER account to your WVSD e-filing account in the new NextGen CM/ECF system on or after June 11, 2018. Instructions for linking your account can be found at #http://www.wvsd. uscourts.gov/pdfs/NextGen/WVSD_Link_PACER_to_CM-ECF.pdf. If you have any additional questions please call the WVSD Clerk's Office CM/ECF Help Desk at (304)-347-3111. (mwk) (ADI)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1187 RESPONSE to #1186 Objections in Response by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1A, #2 Exhibit 1B, #3 Exhibit 1C, #4 Exhibit 1D, #5 Exhibit 1E, #6 Exhibit 1F, #7 Exhibit 1G, #8 Exhibit 1H, #9 Exhibit 2, #10 Exhibit 3, #11 Exhibit 4, #12 Exhibit 5, #13 Exhibit 6, #14 Exhibit 7)(Bonasso, Michael)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1186 OBJECTIONS by Plaintiffs to #1181 Bill of Costs - Proposed (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Paul, Niall)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1185 PROPOSED BILL OF COSTS by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Bonasso, Michael)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1184 NOTICE OF APPELLATE CASE OPENING BY 4CCA re: #1180 Notice of Appeal to the 4CCA in 4CCA Case No. 18-1470. Case Manager: Emily Borneisen. (jsa) (Modified on 4/30/2018 to correct the filed date) (mkw).
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1183 ORDER pursuant to Plaintiffs' #1179 Affidavit seeking reimbursement of attorneys' fees; directing Defendant to pay Plaintiffs $6,495.00 in attorneys' fees within fourteen days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 4/27/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1182 TRANSMITTAL OF NOTICE OF APPEAL TO 4CCA via APPEAL TRANSMITTAL SHEET re: #1180 Notice of Appeal to the 4CCA. (jsa)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1181 PROPOSED BILL OF COSTS by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Bonasso, Michael)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1180 NOTICE OF APPEAL WITH FEE PAID by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Michael Antramgarza, Lance R. Belville, Robert Brandon, 3:13-cv-20976, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Donald C. Carr, Jill Durant, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, Sharon Shaffer, 3:13-cv-14207, Pamela D. Smith, 3:13-cv-14207, Mindi Stewart, Stanley Stewart, Betty J. Trinque, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams as to; #88 Memorandum Opinion and Order, #202 Memorandum Opinion and Order, #426 Memorandum Opinion and Order, #542 Order, #676 Memorandum Opinion and Order, #1168 Memorandum Opinion and Order, #1175 Memorandum Opinion and Order, and #1177 Judgment Order. Filing Fee $505. Receipt # 0425-6417520. (Paul, Niall)
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1179 AFFIDAVIT of John Tangren, dated April 9, 2018, filed on behalf of Plaintiffs re: #1147 Response by Plaintiffs in opposition to #1132 Motion by Ford Motor Company for Reconsideration of #1111 Memorandum Opinion and Order and #1120 Order (Paul, Niall) (Modified on 4/12/2018 to add link to #1147 response)(ts).
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1178 TRANSMITTED CERTIFIED COPY of #1177 Judgment Order to counsel of record. (jsa)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1177 JUDGMENT ORDER in accordance with the accompanying #1175 Memorandum Opinion and Order and the #1168 Memorandum Opinion and Order entered on 2/27/2018; entering summary judgment in favor of Defendant Ford Motor Company and directing that this case be dismissed and stricken from the docket of this Court. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 3/26/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1176 ORDER denying Plaintiffs' #1169 MOTION for Leave and Notice of Supplementation of Dr. Koopman's Curriculum Vitae. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 3/26/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1175 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting Defendant's #1046 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Designated Expert Witnesses Hubing, van Schoor, and Koopman; granting the remainder of Defendant's #1055 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 3/26/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1174 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying defendant's #1132 MOTION for Reconsideration of the 12/27/2017 #1111 Memorandum Opinion and Order Regarding Plaintiffs' Motion for Relief Related to Ford's Discovery Misconduct; granting Plaintiffs additional attorneys' fees and costs associated with responding to Ford's Motion for Reconsideration and directing Ford to pay all invoices submitted by Dr. Sanders in assisting the Court in resolving all the issues related to sanctions; further directing Plaintiffs to file an affidavit itemizing the claimed fees, costs, and expenses on or before 4/9/2018; Plaintiffs also may file a memorandum in support of the requested award; if Ford objects to Plaintiffs' claim, Ford is directed to respond on or before 4/19/2018; Plaintiff shall have until on or before 4/26/2018 in which to reply. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 3/26/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1173 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing Defendant Ford Motor Company to pay Plaintiffs the total sum of $488,028.31 as sanctions for Ford's discovery misconduct; directing that the payment shall be made within thirty days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 3/22/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (hkl)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1172 ORDER granting Defendant's #1171 MOTION to Allow for the Withdrawal of Counsel Checkovich for Defendant Ford Motor Company. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 3/19/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1171 MOTION by Michael Bonasso to Allow for the Withdrawal of Counsel Checkovich for Defendant Ford Motor Company (Bonasso, Michael)
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1170 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying Plaintiffs' oral motion and eleventh-hour attempt at the summary judgment hearing to bolster the record by introducing Dr. Hubings' technical reports. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 3/13/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (hkl)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1169 MOTION by Plaintiffs for Leave and Notice of Supplementation of Dr. Koopman's Curriculum Vitae (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A - Letter Announcing Barus Award)(Atkinson, Nathan)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1168 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting Defendant Ford Motor Company's #1055 Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' warranty and unjust enrichment claims; holding in abeyance for further consideration the remainder of Ford's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 2/27/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1167 SEALED MATERIALS filed by Ford Motor Company pursuant to Court Order: Exhibit F-2 in Support of Ford's Motion for Summary Judgment - Filed Under Seal (Bonasso, Michael)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1166 REPLY by Plaintiffs to #1152 Response In Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Paul, Niall)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1165 RESPONSE by Ford Motor Company to the Court's #1163 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs to the Court's #1149 Order. (Bonasso, Michael) (Modified on 2/16/2018 to correct link to #1163 response) (ts).
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1164 ORDER cancelling the motion hearing set for 2/22/2018 and the currently scheduled 6/5/2018 trial date; the Court will select a precise date for the trial to fall between 10/1/2018 and 11/16/2018 after it resolves the current motions. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 2/14/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1163 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs to the Court's #1149 Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1 Technical Reports, #2 Exhibit A-2 Technical Reports, #3 Exhibit A-3 Technical Reports, #4 Exhibit A-4 Technical Reports, #5 Exhibit A-5 Technical Reports)(Atkinson, Nathan)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1162 ORDER extending the deadline by which the parties are to submit the flash drives with exhibits until 2/16/2018. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 2/9/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1161 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Motion Hearing held on February 1, 2018, before Judge Robert C. Chambers. Court Reporter Kathy Swinhart, Telephone number 304-528-7583. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 2/20/2018. Redaction Request due 3/2/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/10/2018. (kls)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1160 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Motion Hearing re: Stockton held on January 19, 2018, before Judge Robert C. Chambers. Court Reporter Kathy Swinhart, Telephone number 304-528-7583. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 2/20/2018. Redaction Request due 3/2/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/10/2018. (kls)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1159 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Motion Hearing re: Hoffer and Harless held on January 19, 2018, before Judge Robert C. Chambers. Court Reporter Kathy Swinhart, Telephone number 304-528-7583. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 2/20/2018. Redaction Request due 3/2/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/10/2018. (kls)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1158 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Motion Hearing re: Madigan held on January 19, 2018, before Judge Robert C. Chambers. Court Reporter Kathy Swinhart, Telephone number 304-528-7583. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 2/20/2018. Redaction Request due 3/2/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/10/2018. (kls)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1157 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Motion Hearing re: Stopschinski held on January 18, 2018, before Judge Robert C. Chambers. Court Reporter Kathy Swinhart, Telephone number 304-528-7583. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 2/20/2018. Redaction Request due 3/2/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/10/2018. (kls)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1156 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Motion Hearing re: Kelly held on January 18, 2018, before Judge Robert C. Chambers. Court Reporter Kathy Swinhart, Telephone number 304-528-7583. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 2/20/2018. Redaction Request due 3/2/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/10/2018. (kls)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1155 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Motion Hearing re: Koopman held on January 17, 2018, before Judge Robert C. Chambers. Court Reporter Kathy Swinhart, Telephone number 304-528-7583. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 2/20/2018. Redaction Request due 3/2/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/10/2018. (kls)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1154 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Motion Hearing re: van Schoor held on January 17, 2018, before Judge Robert C. Chambers. Court Reporter Kathy Swinhart, Telephone number 304-528-7583. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 2/20/2018. Redaction Request due 3/2/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/10/2018. (kls)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1153 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Motion Hearing re: Hubing held on January 17, 2018, before Judge Robert C. Chambers. Court Reporter Kathy Swinhart, Telephone number 304-528-7583. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 2/20/2018. Redaction Request due 3/2/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/10/2018. (kls)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1152 RESPONSE by Ford Motor Company in opposition to #1143 Memorandum In Support (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(Bonasso, Michael)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1151 SEALED MATERIALS filed by Plaintiffs pursuant to Court Order: Confidential Exhibit Accompanying Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Motion for Class Certification (Sealed per Order 1107) (Paul, Niall)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1150 REPLY by Plaintiffs to #1133 Response In Opposition. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Paul, Niall)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1149 ORDER directing the parties to confer and inform the Court on or before 2/9/2018 as to what exhibits entered into the record at the hearings held 1/17/2018 through 1/19/2018 and 2/1/2018 must be sealed; further directing the parties to send the Court two flash drives containing those exhibits not previously submitted on a flash drive, with any documents to be sealed clearly labeled SEALED as part of the title of the file; further directing the parties to work together to reach an agreement regarding the extent to which Plaintiffs' exhibit number 2 can be admitted into the record; if no agreement can be reached, Plaintiffs are directed to identify their basis for the admission of the exhibit into evidence on or before 2/9/2018; Defendant shall have until on or before 2/14/2018 to file a Response; and Plaintiff shall have until on or before 2/16/2018 to file a Reply; further allowing the parties to pick and agree upon a three week period in October and/or November for trial and report the agreed upon date to the Court by 2/12/2018; trial must conclude no later than 11/16/2018. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 2/2/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1148 MOTION HEARING held by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 2/1/2018; Court Reporter: Kathy Swinhart. (trj)
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1147 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs in opposition to #1132 MOTION by Ford Motor Company for Reconsideration of #1111 Memorandum Opinion and Order and #1120 Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Paul, Niall) Modified on 1/29/2018 (ts).
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1146 REPLY by Plaintiffs to #1080 Response In Opposition. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Paul, Niall)
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1145 ORDER upon oral motion of Plaintiffs; extending the deadline for them to file their Reply to Ford Motor Company's #1133 Opposition to Plaintiffs' #1125 Motion for Class Certification to on or before 2/2/2018. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 1/26/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order SET DEADLINE as to #1125 CORRECTED MOTION by All Plaintiffs to Certify Class; Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendant's #1133 Response due by 2/2/2018, pursuant to the #1145 Order. (jsa)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1144 ORDER rescheduling the hearing on Ford Motor Company's #1055 Motion for Summary Judgment to 2/1/2018 at 1:00 p.m. in Huntington before Judge Robert C. Chambers. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 1/23/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order SET DEADLINE as to #1055 MOTION by Ford Motor Company for Summary Judgment; Motion Hearing set for 2/1/2018 at 1:00 PM in Huntington before Judge Robert C. Chambers, pursuant to the #1144 Order. (jsa)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1143 MEMORANDUM by Plaintiffs in support of #995 MOTION by All Plaintiffs for Relief Related to Ford's Discovery Misconduct (Attachment: #1 Affidavit)(Paul, Niall)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1142 MOTION HEARING held by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 1/19/2018; Court Reporter: Kathy Swinhart. (trj)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1141 MOTION HEARING held by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 1/18/2018; Court Reporter: Kathy Swinhart. (trj)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1140 MOTION HEARING held by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 1/17/2018; Court Reporter: Kathy Swinhart. (trj) (Modified on 2/5/2018 to correct proceeding date) (rea).
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1139 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION by Sarah Virginia Bondurant updating name and/or firm information on behalf of Ford Motor Company. (Bonasso, Michael)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1138 NOTICE OF CERTIFICATION FOR USE OF COURTROOM TECHNOLOGY on January 25, 2018 at 1:00 p.m. Judge Chambers Courtroom (Paul, Niall)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1137 NOTICE OF CERTIFICATION FOR USE OF COURTROOM TECHNOLOGY on January 25, 2018 at 1:00 p.m. in Judge Chambers' Courtroom (Bonasso, Michael)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1136 NOTICE OF CERTIFICATION FOR USE OF COURTROOM TECHNOLOGY on January 17 - 19, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. in Judge Chambers' Courtroom (Bonasso, Michael)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1135 NOTICE OF CERTIFICATION FOR USE OF COURTROOM TECHNOLOGY on January 17 - 19, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. Judge Chambers Courtroom (Paul, Niall)
January 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1134 SEALED MATERIALS filed by Ford Motor Company pursuant to Court Order: Confidential Exhibits Accompanying Ford Motor Company's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit C-2, #3 Exhibit G, #4 Exhibit H)(Bonasso, Michael)
January 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1133 OPPOSITION by Ford Motor Company to #1125 CORRECTED MOTION by All Plaintiffs to Certify Class (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B, #3 Appendix C, #4 Appendix D, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J-1, #12 Exhibit J-1, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit P, #19 Exhibit Q, #20 Exhibit R, #21 Exhibit S, #22 Exhibit T, #23 Exhibit U, #24 Exhibit V, #25 Exhibit W, #26 Exhibit X, #27 Exhibit Y)(Bonasso, Michael)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1132 MOTION by Ford Motor Company for Reconsideration of #1111 Memorandum Opinion and Order and #1120 Order (Bonasso, Michael)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1131 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION by Anne M. Tarvin updating name and/or firm information on behalf of Charles Johnson. (Tarvin, Anne)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1130 MEMORANDUM by All Plaintiffs in opposition to #1101 Sealed Memorandum by All Plaintiffs in Opposition to Motion by Ford Motor Company to Exclude Plaintiffs' Designated Expert Witnesses Hubing, Van Schoor, and Koopman, #1046 MOTION by Ford Motor Company to Exclude Plaintiffs' Designated Expert Witnesses Hubing, Van Schoor, and Koopman (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V)(Paul, Niall)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1129 MEMORANDUM by All Plaintiffs in opposition to #1049 MOTION by Ford Motor Company to Exclude Plaintiffs Designated Expert Witness David Madigan, #1082 MOTION by Plaintiffs for Leave to File Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. David Madigan and Exhibits Under Seal and for Leave to File Pubicily-Available Redacted Versions Where Possible, #1095 Sealed Memorandum by All Plaintiffs in Opposition to Defendant's #1049 Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. David Madigan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Paul, Niall)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1128 RESPONSE by All Plaintiffs in opposition to #1055 MOTION by Ford Motor Company for Summary Judgment, #1099 Sealed Response to Ford's Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C-1, #4 Exhibit C-2, #5 Exhibit D-1, #6 Exhibit D-2, #7 Exhibit D-3, #8 Exhibit D-4, #9 Exhibit D-5, #10 Exhibit D-6, #11 Exhibit D-7, #12 Exhibit D-8, #13 Exhibit D-9, #14 Exhibit D-10, #15 Exhibit E-1, #16 Exhibit E-2, #17 Exhibit E-3, #18 Exhibit E-4, #19 Exhibit E-5, #20 Exhibit E-6, #21 Exhibit F-1, #22 Exhibit F-2, #23 Exhibit F-3, #24 Exhibit F-4, #25 Exhibit F-5, #26 Exhibit F-6, #27 Exhibit G, #28 Exhibit H, #29 Exhibit I, #30 Exhibit J, #31 Exhibit K-1, #32 Exhibit K-2, #33 Exhibit K-3, #34 Exhibit K-4, #35 Exhibit L-1, #36 Exhibit L-2, #37 Exhibit M, #38 Exhibit N, #39 Exhibit O, #40 Exhibit P, #41 Exhibit Q, #42 Exhibit R, #43 Exhibit S, #44 Exhibit T, #45 Exhibit U, #46 Exhibit V, #47 Exhibit W, #48 Exhibit X, #49 Exhibit Y, #50 Exhibit AA, #51 Exhibit BB, #52 Exhibit CC, #53 Exhibit DD, #54 Exhibit EE, #55 Exhibit FF, #56 Exhibit GG, #57 Exhibit HH, #58 Exhibit II, #59 Exhibit JJ, #60 Exhibit KK, #61 Exhibit LL, #62 Exhibit MM, #63 Exhibit NN, #64 Exhibit OO, #65 Exhibit QQ, #66 Exhibit RR, #67 Exhibit SS, #68 Exhibit TT, #69 Exhibit UU, #70 Exhibit VV, #71 Exhibit WW, #72 Exhibit XX, #73 Exhibit YY, #74 Exhibit ZZ, #75 Exhibit AAA, #76 Exhibit BBB, #77 Exhibit CCC, #78 Exhibit DDD, #79 Exhibit EEE, #80 Exhibit FFF, #81 Exhibit GGG, #82 Exhibit HHH, #83 Exhibit III, #84 Exhibit JJJ, #85 Exhibit KKK, #86 Exhibit LLL, #87 Exhibit MMM, #88 Exhibit NNN, #89 Exhibit OOO, #90 Exhibit PPP, #91 Exhibit QQQ, #92 Exhibit RRR, #93 Exhibit SSS, #94 Exhibit TTT, #95 Exhibit UUU, #96 Exhibit VVV, #97 Exhibit XXX, #98 Exhibit YYY, #99 Exhibit ZZZ, #100 Exhibit AAAA, #101 Exhibit BBBB, #102 Exhibit CCCC, #103 Exhibit DDDD, #104 Exhibit EEEE, #105 Exhibit FFFF, #106 Exhibit GGGG, #107 Exhibit HHHH, #108 Exhibit IIII, #109 Exhibit JJJJ, #110 Exhibit KKKK, #111 Exhibit LLLL, #112 Exhibit MMMM, #113 Exhibit NNNN, #114 Exhibit OOOO, #115 Exhibit PPPP, #116 Exhibit QQQQ, #117 Exhibit RRRR)(Paul, Niall)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1127 NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE by Charles Johnson (Bartimus, James) (Modified on 1/10/2018 to convert event to notice of change of address) (ts).
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1126 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by All Plaintiffs in support of #1125 CORRECTED MOTION by All Plaintiffs to Certify Class (Paul, Niall) (Modified on 1/9/2018 to remove link to #1097 and 1098) (ts).
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1125 CORRECTED MOTION by All Plaintiffs to Certify Class (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Paul, Niall)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1124 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Brian D. Schmalzbach on behalf of Ford Motor Company. Local counsel: Bradley Schmalzer. Fee $50.00. Receipt # 0425-6167039. (Schmalzer, Bradley)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1123 ORDER to assist the parties in preparing for the upcoming hearings, the Court sets forth the following tentative schedule for arguments, as more fully set forth herein; at the hearings, the Court will ask the proponent of each expert first to explain the expert's opinion and the bases of that opinion; the Court then will allow the parties to argue their respective positions on the motions; the Court reserves the right to rule on any of these motions prior to the scheduled hearing and/or modify the schedule as necessary; Motion Hearing set for 1/25/2018 at 1:00 PM in Huntington before Judge Robert C. Chambers, re: #1055 MOTION by Ford Motor Company for Summary Judgment; to accommodate Plaintiffs' preparation of their Reply brief in support of their #1097 Corrected Motion for Class Certification, EXTENDING the deadline for the Reply to 1/29/2018. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 1/5/2018. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (mkw)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order SET DEADLINE: Motion Hearing set for 1/25/2018 at 01:00 PM in Huntington before Judge Robert C. Chambers re: #1055 MOTION by Ford Motor Company for Summary Judgment pursuant to the #1123 Order. (mkw)
December 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1122 SEALED MATERIALS filed by Ford Motor Company pursuant to Court Order: Confidential Exhibits Accompanying Ford Motor Company's Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 F-2, #2 G, #3 H, #4 J-2, #5 K, #6 L, #7 M-2, #8 N-2, #9 Q)(Bonasso, Michael)
December 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1121 REPLY by Ford Motor Company to #1099 Sealed Materials pursuant to Court Order: Response to Ford's Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit F-2, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit J-2, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit M-2, #17 Exhibit N, #18 Exhibit N-2, #19 Exhibit O, #20 Exhibit P, #21 Exhibit Q, #22 Exhibit R, #23 Exhibit S, #24 Exhibit T, #25 Exhibit U, #26 Exhibit V, #27 Exhibit W, #28 Exhibit X, #29 Exhibit Y, #30 Exhibit Z, #31 Exhibit AA, #32 Exhibit BB, #33 Exhibit CC, #34 Exhibit DD, #35 Exhibit EE, #36 Exhibit FF, #37 Exhibit GG, #38 Exhibit HH, #39 Exhibit II, #40 Exhibit JJ)(Bonasso, Michael)
December 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1120 ORDER pursuant to the Court's #1111 Memorandum Opinion and Order finding that Plaintiffs are entitled to an award of monetary sanctions; directing Plaintiffs, within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, to file an affidavit itemizing the claimed fees, costs, and expenses; Plaintiffs may also file a memorandum in support of the requested award; Defendant shall have fourteen (14) days after receipt of Plaintiffs' affidavit and memorandum in which to file a response; Plaintiffs shall have seven (7) days after service of the Defendant's response in which to reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 12/29/2017. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (jsa)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1119 SEALED MATERIALS filed by All Plaintiffs pursuant to Court Order: Reply by Plaintiffs to Ford's Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Daubert Motion Pertaining to Dr. Kelly (Sealed per Order 1107) (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Paul, Niall)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1118 REPLY by All Plaintiffs to #1079 Response In Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Paul, Niall)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1117 REPLY by All Plaintiffs to #1085 Response In Opposition. (Paul, Niall)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1116 SEALED MATERIALS filed by Ford Motor Company pursuant to Court Order: Exhibits in Support of Ford Motor Company's Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs Designated Expert Witness David Madigan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A2, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit E-1, #4 Exhibit E-2, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit G)(Bonasso, Michael)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1115 SEALED MATERIALS filed by Ford Motor Company pursuant to Court Order: Exhibits in Support of Ford Motor Company's Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs Designated Witnesses Hubing, Van Schoor, and Koopman (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D, #2 Exhibit F-1, #3 Exhibit F-2, #4 Exhibit F-3, #5 Exhibit F-4, #6 Exhibit F-5)(Bonasso, Michael)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1114 REPLY by Ford Motor Company to #1101 Memorandum in Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Bonasso, Michael)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1113 REPLY by Ford Motor Company to #1095 Memorandum in opposition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A2, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(Bonasso, Michael)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1112 REPLY BRIEF by Ford Motor Company to #1081 Response In Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Bonasso, Michael)
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1111 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiffs' #995 MOTION for Relief Related to Ford's Discovery Misconduct, as more fully set forth herein; directing the Magistrate Judge to conduct further proceedings to award an amount of attorneys' fees, expert fees, and costs consistent with this Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 12/27/2017. (cc: Magistrate Judge Eifert; counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1110 AMENDED ORDER modifying the Court's #1109 Order Granting Docket Correction; directing the Clerk of this Court to unseal the redacted version of Plaintiffs' #1102 Reply in Support of their Motion for Relief Related to Ford's Discovery Misconduct, but retaining the exhibits as attachments UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 12/19/2017. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (mkw)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1109 ORDER GRANTING DOCKET CORRECTION granting Plaintiffs' #1108 AGREED MOTION to Correct Filing of Redacted Version; directing the Clerk to remove the exhibits attached to ECF No. 1102; further directing that the redacted brief filed at ECF No. 1102 be made public. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 12/19/2017. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1108 AGREED MOTION by All Plaintiffs to Correct Filing of Redacted Version (Attachment: #1 Proposed Order Granting Docket Correction)(Paul, Niall)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1107 ORDER granting the parties the authority to file future response and reply briefs to a currently pending motion, together with exhibits, under seal without motion if those documents contain confidential information; when filing a document or exhibit under seal, the parties shall reference this Order; if it is possible to have a publicly-available redacted version of a document, the parties are directed to file the redacted version within fourteen (14) days of filing the sealed version; further directing the parties to label any redacted document as a redacted version when it is filed. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 12/18/2017. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1106 RESPONSE by Ford Motor Company to the Court's #1077 Order. (Bonasso, Michael)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1105 REDACTED VERSION of Response to Ford Motor Company's Surreply to Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Motion for Relief pursuant to the Court's #1069 Order, #1077 Order. (Levitt, Adam) (Modified on 12/18/2017 to note redacted version) (ts)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1104 REDACTED VERSION of Motion by All Plaintiffs to Exclude Certain Expert Testimony of Karl E. Stopschinski pursuant to the Court's #1069 Order, #1077 Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Levitt, Adam) (Modified on 12/18/2017 to note redacted version) (ts)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1103 REDACTED VERSION of Motion by All Plaintiffs to Exclude Expert Testimony of John P.J. Kelly pursuant to the Court's #1069 Order, #1077 Order. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit B)(Levitt, Adam) (Modified on 12/18/2017 to note redacted version) (ts)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1102 REPLY by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams to #995 MOTION for Relief Related to Ford's Discovery Misconduct pursuant to #1069 Order, #1077 Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Levitt, Adam) (Modified on 12/17/2017 to add link to #995 motion) (ts)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1101 MEMORANDUM by All Plaintiffs in Opposition to #1046 MOTION by Ford Motor Company to Exclude Plaintiffs' Designated Expert Witnesses Hubing, Van Schoor, and Koopman; filed under seal pursuant to the #1094 Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D-1, #5 Exhibit D-2, #6 Exhibit D-3, #7 Exhibit D-4, #8 Exhibit D-5, #9 Exhibit D-6, #10 Exhibit D-7, #11 Exhibit D-8, #12 Exhibit E, #13 Exhibit F, #14 Exhibit G, #15 Exhibit H, #16 Exhibit I-1, #17 Exhibit I-2, #18 Exhibit I-3, #19 Exhibit I-4, #20 Exhibit I-5, #21 Exhibit J, #22 Exhibit K, #23 Exhibit L, #24 Exhibit M, #25 Exhibit N, #26 Exhibit O-1, #27 Exhibit O-2, #28 Exhibit O-3, #29 Exhibit P, #30 Exhibit Q, #31 Exhibit R-1, #32 Exhibit R-2, #33 Exhibit R-3, #34 Exhibit R-4, #35 Exhibit S, #36 Exhibit T, #37 Exhibit U, #38 Exhibit V) (jsa)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1100 EXHIBIT 2 by Ford Motor Company in Support of Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Certain Testimony of Karl E. Stopschinski; filed under seal pursuant to the #1094 Order. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 2B) (jsa)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1099 SEALED MATERIALS filed by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams pursuant to Court Order: Response to Ford's Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C-1, #4 Exhibit C-2, #5 Exhibit G, #6 Exhibit H, #7 Exhibit I, #8 Exhibit J, #9 Exhibit K-1, #10 Exhibit K-2, #11 Exhibit K-3, #12 Exhibit K-4, #13 Exhibit L-1, #14 Exhibit L-2, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit P, #19 Exhibit Q, #20 Exhibit R, #21 Exhibit S, #22 Exhibit T, #23 Exhibit U, #24 Exhibit V, #25 Exhibit W, #26 Exhibit X, #27 Exhibit Y, #28 Exhibit AA, #29 Exhibit BB, #30 Exhibit CC, #31 Exhibit DD, #32 Exhibit EE, #33 Exhibit FF, #34 Exhibit GG, #35 Exhibit HH, #36 Exhibit II, #37 Exhibit JJ, #38 Exhibit KK, #39 Exhibit LL, #40 Exhibit MM, #41 Exhibit NN, #42 Exhibit OO, #43 Exhibit QQ, #44 Exhibit RR, #45 Exhibit SS, #46 Exhibit TT, #47 Exhibit UU, #48 Exhibit VV, #49 Exhibit WW, #50 Exhibit XX, #51 Exhibit YY, #52 Exhibit ZZ, #53 Exhibit AAA, #54 Exhibit BBB, #55 Exhibit CCC, #56 Exhibit DDD, #57 Exhibit EEE, #58 Exhibit FFF, #59 Exhibit GGG, #60 Exhibit HHH, #61 Exhibit III, #62 Exhibit JJJ, #63 Exhibit KKK, #64 Exhibit LLL, #65 Exhibit MMM, #66 Exhibit NNN, #67 Exhibit OOO, #68 Exhibit PPP, #69 Exhibit QQQ, #70 Exhibit RRR, #71 Exhibit SSS, #72 Exhibit TTT, #73 Exhibit UUU, #74 Exhibit VVV, #75 Exhibit XXX, #76 Exhibit YYY, #77 Exhibit ZZZ, #78 Exhibit AAAA, #79 Exhibit BBBB, #80 Exhibit CCCC, #81 Exhibit DDDD, #82 Exhibit EEEE, #83 Exhibit FFFF, #84 Exhibit GGGG, #85 Exhibit HHHH, #86 Exhibit IIII, #87 Exhibit JJJJ, #88 Exhibit KKKK, #89 Exhibit LLLL, #90 Exhibit MMMM, #91 Exhibit NNNN, #92 Exhibit OOOO, #93 Exhibit PPPP, #94 Exhibit QQQQ, #95 Exhibit RRRR, #96 Exhibit E-1, #97 Exhibit E-2, #98 Exhibit E-3, #99 Exhibit E-4, #100 Exhibit E-5, #101 Exhibit E-6, #102 Exhibit D-1, #103 Exhibit D-2, #104 Exhibit D-3, #105 Exhibit D-4, #106 Exhibit D-5, #107 Exhibit D-6, #108 Exhibit D-7, #109 Exhibit D-8, #110 Exhibit D-9, #111 Exhibit D-10, #112 Exhibit F-1, #113 Exhibit F-2, #114 Exhibit F-3, #115 Exhibit F-4, #116 Exhibit F-5, #117 Exhibit F-6)(Paul, Niall)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1098 SEALED MATERIALS filed by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams pursuant to Court Order: Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Motion for Class Certification (Paul, Niall)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1097 SEALED MATERIALS filed by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams pursuant to Court Order: Corrected Motion for Class Certification (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit C)(Paul, Niall)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1096 EXHIBIT by Ford Motor Company in Support of Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Testimony of John P. J. Kelly; filed under seal pursuant to the #1094 Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1B, #2 Exhibit 1C, #3 Exhibit 1D, #4 Exhibit 1E, #5 Exhibit 1F) (jsa)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1095 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by all Plaintiffs to Defendant's #1049 Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. David Madigan; filed under seal pursuant to the #1094 Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J) (jsa) (Modified on 1/2/2018 to add link to #1049 motion) (mkw).
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1094 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' oral motion to file amended motions and exhibits to correct the errors in their #1091 Response to Ford's Motion for Summary Judgment with related exhibits and their #1089 Motion for Class Certification with related exhibits, and to file their Memorandum in Support of Class Certification; granting Ford a one-day extension to file its corresponding Reply and Response briefs; granting the #1082 , #1083 , #1086 , #1087 , #1089 , and #1091 MOTIONS to seal certain documents and file publicly-available redacted versions where possible; directing that only the amended versions of the attachments to #1089 and #1091 be filed UNDER SEAL under new docket numbers; directing the parties to contact the Court to discuss a resolution of the deadline to file the publicly-available redacted version of these documents on or before 12/20/2017. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 12/14/2017. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1093 SEALED DOCUMENT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit , #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit, #37 Exhibit, #38 Errata, #39 Exhibit, #40 Exhibit, #41 Exhibit, #42 Exhibit, #43 Exhibit, #44 Exhibit, #45 Exhibit, #46 Exhibit, #47 Exhibit, #48 Exhibit, #49 Exhibit, #50 Exhibit, #51 Exhibit, #52 Exhibit, #53 Exhibit, #54 Exhibit, #55 Exhibit, #56 Exhibit, #57 Exhibit, #58 Exhibit, #59 Exhibit, #60 Exhibit, #61 Exhibit, #62 Exhibit, #63 Exhibit, #64 Exhibit, #65 Exhibit, #66 Exhibit, #67 Exhibit, #68 Exhibit, #69 Exhibit, #70 Exhibit, #71 Exhibit, #72 Exhibit, #73 Exhibit, #74 Exhibit, #75 Exhibit, #76 Exhibit, #77 Exhibit, #78 Exhibit, #79 Exhibit, #80 Exhibit, #81 Exhibit, #82 Exhibit, #83 Exhibit, #84 Exhibit, #85 Exhibit, #86 Exhibit, #87 Exhibit, #88 Exhibit, #89 Exhibit, #90 Exhibit, #91 Exhibit, #92 Exhibit, #93 Exhibit, #94 Exhibit, #95 Exhibit, #96 Exhibit, #97 Exhibit, #98 Exhibit, #99 Exhibit, #100 Exhibit, #101 Exhibit, #102 Exhibit, #103 Exhibit, #104 Exhibit, #105 Exhibit, #106 Exhibit, #107 Exhibit, #108 Exhibit, #109 Exhibit, #110 Exhibit, #111 Exhibit, #112 Exhibit, #113 Exhibit, #114 Exhibit, #115 Exhibit, #116 Exhibit, #117 Exhibit, #118 Exhibit, #119 Exhibit, #120 Exhibit, #121 Exhibit, #122 Exhibit, #123 Exhibit, #124 Exhibit, #125 Exhibit, #126 Exhibit, #127 Exhibit)(Paul, Niall)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1092 MEMORANDUM by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams in support of #1091 MOTION by Plaintiffs for Leave to File Their Response in Opposition to Ford Motor Company's Motion for Summary Judgment Under Seal and for Leave to File Publicly-Available Redacted Versions Where Possible (Paul, Niall)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1091 MOTION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Mills Allison, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams for Leave to File Their Response in Opposition to Ford Motor Company's Motion for Summary Judgment Under Seal and for Leave to File Publicly-Available Redacted Versions Where Possible. (Attachments: #1 Response, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C-1, #8 Exhibit C-2, #9 Exhibit C-3, #10 Exhibit C-4, #11 Exhibit C-5, #12 Exhibit C-6, #13 Exhibit C-7, #14 Exhibit C-8, #15 Exhibit C-9, #16 Exhibit C-10, #17 Exhibit C-11, #18 Exhibit C-12, #19 Exhibit D-1, #20 Exhibit D-2, #21 Exhibit D-3, #22 Exhibit D-4, #23 Exhibit D-6, #24 Exhibit E-2, #25 Exhibit E-4, #26 Exhibit E-6, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit AAA, #29 Exhibit NN, #30 Exhibit OO, #31 Exhibit PP, #32 Exhibit RR, #33 Exhibit SS, #34 Exhibit UU, #35 Exhibit VV, #36 Exhibit WW, #37 Exhibit XX, #38 Exhibit, #39 Exhibit YY, #40 Exhibit QQ, #41 Exhibit ZZ, #42 Exhibit, #43 Exhibit, #44 Exhibit, #45 Exhibit)(Paul, Niall)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1090 MEMORANDUM by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams in support of #1089 MOTION by Plaintiffs for Leave to File Motion for Class Certification Under Seal and for Leave to File Publicly-Available Redacted Versions Where Possible (Paul, Niall)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1089 MOTION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams for Leave to File Motion for Class Certification Under Seal and for Leave to File Publicly-Available Redacted Versions Where Possible. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Paul, Niall)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1088 MEMORANDUM by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams in support of #1087 MOTION by Plaintiffs to Seal Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Ford's Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Designated Expert Witnesses Hubing, van Schoor, and Koopman (Paul, Niall)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1087 MOTION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams for Leave to File Their Response in Opposition to Ford Motor Company's Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Designated Expert Witnesses Hubing, Van Schoor, and Koopman Under Seal and MOTION for Leave to File Publicly-Available Redacted Versions Where Possible. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D-1, #6 Exhibit D-2, #7 Exhibit D-3, #8 Exhibit D-4, #9 Exhibit D-5, #10 Exhibit D-6, #11 Exhibit D-7, #12 Exhibit D-8, #13 Exhibit E, #14 Exhibit F, #15 Exhibit G, #16 Exhibit H, #17 Exhibit I-1, #18 Exhibit I-2, #19 Exhibit I-3, #20 Exhibit I-4, #21 Exhibit I-5, #22 Exhibit J, #23 Exhibit K, #24 Exhibit L, #25 Exhibit M, #26 Exhibit N, #27 Exhibit O-1, #28 Exhibit O-2, #29 Exhibit O-3, #30 Exhibit P, #31 Exhibit Q, #32 Exhibit R-1, #33 Exhibit R-2, #34 Exhibit R-3, #35 Exhibit R-4, #36 Exhibit S, #37 Exhibit T, #38 Exhibit U, #39 Exhibit V)(Paul, Niall)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1086 MOTION by Ford Motor Company to Seal Exhibit in Support of Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Certain Testimony of Karl E. Stopschinski. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2A, #2 Exhibit 2B)(Bonasso, Michael)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1085 MEMORANDUM by Ford Motor Company in opposition to #1060 MOTION by Plaintiffs for Leave to File Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Mr. Stopschinski and Exhibits Under Seal and for Leave to File Publicly-Available Redacted Versions Where Possible (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Bonasso, Michael)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1084 MEMORANDUM by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams in support of #1082 MOTION by Plaintiffs for Leave to File Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. David Madigan and Exhibits Under Seal and for Leave to File Pubicily-Available Redacted Versions Where Possible. (Paul, Niall)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1083 MOTION by Ford Motor Company to Seal Exhibit in Support of Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Testimony of John P.J. Kelley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1A, #2 Exhibit 1B, #3 Exhibit 1C, #4 Exhibit 1D, #5 Exhibit 1E, #6 Exhibit 1F)(Bonasso, Michael)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1082 MOTION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams for Leave to File Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. David Madigan and Exhibits Under Seal and for Leave to File Pubicily-Available Redacted Versions Where Possible. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Opposition, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J)(Paul, Niall)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1081 RESPONSE by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams in opposition to #1052 MOTION by Ford Motor Company to Exclude Plaintiffs Designated Expert Witness Edward Stockton (Paul, Niall)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1080 MEMORANDUM by Ford Motor Company in opposition to #1059 MOTION by Plaintiffs for Leave to File Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Kelly and Exhibits Under Seal and for Leave to File Publicly-Available Redacted Versions Where Possible (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Bonasso, Michael)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1079 RESPONSE by Ford Motor Company in opposition to #1058 MOTION by Plaintiffs to Exclude the Expert Opinion of David Harless and George Hoffer of No Class Damages (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2A, #3 Exhibit 2B, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)(Bonasso, Michael)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1078 ORDER granting the parties' joint oral motion for an extension of the page limitations for their briefing on class certification; directing that Plaintiffs shall have forty pages for its motion, Defendant shall have forty pages to respond, and Plaintiffs shall have twenty pages to reply. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 12/13/2017. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1077 ORDER granting the parties' joint oral motion to extend the 12/8/2017 deadline set forth in the Court's #1069 Order that directed Plaintiffs to file publicly-available redacted versions of certain documents; directing Plaintiffs to file the redacted versions on or before 12/15/2017; further directing Plaintiffs to file a redacted version of ECF No. 1041 and Ford to file a redacted version of ECF No. 1066 on or before 12/15/2017. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 12/7/2017. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1076 SEALED MATERIALS pursuant to the #1069 Order: MOTION by Plaintiffs to Exclude Certain Expert Testimony. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (jsa)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1075 SEALED MATERIALS pursuant to the #1069 Order: MOTION by Plaintiffs to Exclude Expert Testimony. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, part 1, #5 Exhibit D, part 2) (jsa)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1074 SEALED MATERIALS filed under seal pursuant to #1069 Order: Plaintiffs' Response to Ford Motor Company's Surreply to Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of their Motion for Relief. (jsa)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1073 SEALED MATERIALS filed under seal pursuant to #1069 Order: Exhibits in support of #1055 MOTION by Ford Motor Company for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D, #2 Exhibit E-2, #3 Exhibit G, #4 Exhibit I, #5 Exhibit J, #6 Exhibit K, #7 Exhibit L, #8 Exhibit M-2, #9 Exhibit N, #10 Exhibit O) (jsa)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1072 SEALED MATERIALS filed under seal pursuant to #1069 Order: Exhibit in Support of #1052 MOTION by Ford Motor Company to Exclude Plaintiffs' Designated Expert Witness Edward Stockton. (jsa)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1071 SEALED MATERIALS filed under seal pursuant to #1069 Order: Exhibits in Support of #1049 MOTION by Ford Motor Company to Exclude Plaintiffs' Designated Expert Witness David Madigan. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit I) (jsa)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1070 SEALED MATERIALS filed under seal pursuant to #1069 Order: Sealed Exhibits in Support of #1046 MOTION by Ford Motor Company to Exclude Plaintiffs' Designated Expert Witnesses Hubing, Van Schoor, and Koopman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C-2, #2 Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit E-2, #4 Exhibit F, #5 Exhibit G, #6 Exhibit H, #7 Exhibit I, #8 Exhibit J-2) (jsa)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1069 ORDER granting the following motions to seal filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company: #1048 Motion to Seal Certain Exhibits in Support of Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Designated Expert Witnesses Hubing, Van Schoor, and Koopman; #1051 Motion to Seal Certain Exhibits in Support of Ford's Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Designated Expert Witness David Madigan; #1054 Motion to Seal Exhibit in Support of Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Designated Expert Witness Edward Stockton;(4) #1057 Motion to Seal Certain Exhibits in Support of Ford's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting the following motions to seal filed by Plaintiffs: #1059 Motion for Leave to File Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Kelly and Exhibits under Seal and for Leave to File Publicly-Available Redacted Versions where Possible; #1060 Motion for Leave to File Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Mr. Stopschinski and Exhibits under Seal and for Leave to File Publicly-Available Redacted Version where Possible; and #1067 Motion for Leave to File their Response to Ford Motor Company's Surreply to Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of their Motion for Relief under Seal and for Leave to File Publicly-Available Redacted Versions where Possible; directing Plaintiffs to file publicly-available redacted versions of the documents that are the subject of ECF Nos. 1059, 1060, and 1067 on or before 12/8/2017. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 12/5/2017. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED to Judge Robert C. Chambers: #1076 MOTION by Plaintiffs to Exclude Certain Expert Testimony, #1075 MOTION by Plaintiffs to Exclude Expert Testimony. (ts)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1068 MEMORANDUM by Plaintiffs to #1067 MOTION by Plaintiffs to Seal for Leave to File Response to Ford's Surreply (Paul, Niall) (Modified on 11/28/2017 to add link to #1067 motion) (ts).
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1067 MOTION by Plaintiffs to Seal for Leave to File Response to Ford's Surreply. (Attachment: #1 Response)(Paul, Niall)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1066 SUR-REPLY by Ford Motor Company's to #1041 REPLY by All Plaintiffs in Support of Their Motion for Relief Related to Ford's Discovery Misconduct. (jsa)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1065 ORDER granting Defendant's #1064 MOTION to Seal Sur-Reply to Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Motion for Relief. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 11/21/2017. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1064 MOTION by Ford Motor Company to Seal Ford's Surreply to Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Motion for Relief. (Attachment: #1 Surreply Brief)(Bonasso, Michael)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1063 ORDER granting Defendant's #1044 MOTION for Leave to File 10-Page Sur-Reply to Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Motion for Relief; further allowing Plaintiffs to file a five-page Response to the Sur-Reply; once both documents are filed, the Court shall provide copies to Dr. Sanders. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 11/16/2017. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1062 ORDER directing that William H. Sanders, Ph.D., M.S.E., B.S.E., continue in his role as technical advisor for the purpose of assisting the Court in understanding the concepts, principles, and terminology necessary to resolve the issues in Plaintiffs' #995 MOTION for Relief Related to Ford's Discovery Misconduct; establishing herein the terms of appointment with respect to his present advisory role, as more fully set forth herein; directing that the parties shall prepare a joint exhibit with any documents they agree should be provided to Dr. Sanders for his review; if the parties disagree upon whether a particular document should be included, they should notify the Court of their disagreement on or before 11/16/2017. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 11/14/2017. (cc: Dr. William H. Sanders; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (jsa)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1061 TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 11/14/2017; not reported. (trj)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1060 MOTION by Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams for Leave to File Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Mr. Stopschinski and Exhibits Under Seal and for Leave to File Publicly-Available Redacted Versions Where Possible (Attachments: #1 Motion, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Levitt, Adam)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1059 MOTION by Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams for Leave to File Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Kelly and Exhibits Under Seal and for Leave to File Publicly-Available Redacted Versions Where Possible. (Attachments: #1 Motion, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D part 1, #6 Exhibit D part 2)(Levitt, Adam)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1058 MOTION by Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams to Exclude the Expert Opinion of David Harless and George Hoffer of No Class Damages. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Levitt, Adam)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1057 MOTION by Ford Motor Company to Seal Certain Exhibits in Support of Ford's Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C-2, #2 Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit E-2, #4 Exhibit G, #5 Exhibit I, #6 Exhibit J, #7 Exhibit K, #8 Exhibit L, #9 Exhibit M-2, #10 Exhibit N, #11 Exhibit O)(Bonasso, Michael)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1056 MEMORANDUM by Ford Motor Company in support of #1055 MOTION by Ford Motor Company for Summary Judgment (Bonasso, Michael)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1055 MOTION by Ford Motor Company for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C, #2 Exhibit C-2, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit E-2, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit F-2, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit M-2, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit P-Q, #19 Exhibit R-U, #20 Exhibit V-CC, #21 Exhibit DD-GG, #22 Exhibit HH-KK, #23 Exhibit OO-TT)(Bonasso, Michael)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1054 MOTION by Ford Motor Company to Seal Exhibit in Support of Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Designated Expert Witness Edward Stockton (Attachment: #1 Exhibit H)(Bonasso, Michael)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1053 MEMORANDUM by Ford Motor Company in support of #1052 MOTION by Ford Motor Company to Exclude Plaintiffs Designated Expert Witness Edward Stockton (Bonasso, Michael)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1052 MOTION by Ford Motor Company to Exclude Plaintiffs Designated Expert Witness Edward Stockton (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q)(Bonasso, Michael)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1051 MOTION by Ford Motor Company to Seal Certain Exhibits in Support of Ford's Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Designated Expert Witness David Madigan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D, #2 Exhibit I)(Bonasso, Michael)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1050 MEMORANDUM by Ford Motor Company in support of #1049 MOTION by Ford Motor Company to Exclude Plaintiffs Designated Expert Witness David Madigan (Bonasso, Michael)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1049 MOTION by Ford Motor Company to Exclude Plaintiffs Designated Expert Witness David Madigan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Bonasso, Michael)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1048 MOTION by Ford Motor Company to Seal Certain Exhibits in Support of Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Designated Expert Witnesses Hubing, Van Schoor, and Koopman (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-2, #2 Exhibit C-2, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E-2, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit G, #7 Exhibit H, #8 Exhibit I, #9 Exhibit J-2)(Bonasso, Michael)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1047 MEMORANDUM by Ford Motor Company in support of #1046 MOTION by Ford Motor Company to Exclude Plaintiffs' Designated Expert Witnesses Hubing, Van Schoor, and Koopman (Bonasso, Michael)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1046 MOTION by Ford Motor Company to Exclude Plaintiffs' Designated Expert Witnesses Hubing, Van Schoor, and Koopman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit C-2, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit E-2, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit J-2)(Bonasso, Michael)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1045 RESPONSE by Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams in opposition to #1044 MOTION by Ford Motor Company for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Plaintiffs Reply in Support of Their Motion for Relief (Levitt, Adam)
November 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1044 MOTION by Ford Motor Company for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Plaintiffs Reply in Support of Their Motion for Relief (Bonasso, Michael)
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1043 NOTICE OF CONTINUED DEPOSITION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams of John Kelly on November 2, 2017 at 8:00 a.m. (Atkinson, Nathan)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1042 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ford Motor Company for Third Rule 26(a)(2)(C) Supplemental Disclosure Of Expert Witnesses. (Bonasso, Michael)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1041 REPLY by All Plaintiffs in Support of Their Motion for Relief Related to Ford's Discovery Misconduct. (jsa)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1040 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #1039 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Motion for Relief Related to Ford's Discovery Misconduct and Exhibits. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 10/23/2017. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1039 MOTION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams for Leave to File Reply and Exhibits Under Seal and for Leave to File Publicly-Available Redacted Versions Where Possible (Attachment: #1 Exhibits A-C)(Levitt, Adam)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1038 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ford Motor Company for Second Rule 26(A)(2)(C) Supplemental Disclosure Of Expert Witnesses. (Bonasso, Michael)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1037 TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 10/16/2017; Court Reporter: CourtSmart. (hkl)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1036 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ford Motor Company for Rule 26(A)(2)(C) Supplemental Disclosure Of Expert Witnesses. (Bonasso, Michael)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1035 ORDER directing that the Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/12/2017 is canceled. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 10/6/2017. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1034 TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 10/5/2017; Court Reporter: CourtSmart. (hkl)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1033 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams for Disclosure of Expert Rebuttal Reports. (Paul, Niall)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1032 ORDER denying Plaintiffs' #868 MOTION for Case Management Order Establishing Bellwether Protocol without prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 9/26/2017. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (hkl)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1031 RESPONSE (redacted) by Ford Motor Company to #995 MOTION by All Plaintiffs for Relief Related to Ford's Discovery Misconduct. (jsa)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1030 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Ford Motor Company's #1029 MOTION to Re-File Ford's Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Relief Related to Ford's Discovery Misconduct; granting Defendant's motion to the extent it seeks to file an unsealed and redacted version of its Response and denying the motion to the extent Defendant seeks to replace the unredacted version with the redacted version; directing the Clerk of this Court to file ECF No. 1029-1as an unsealed redacted Response to Plaintiffs' motion and MAINTAIN UNDER SEAL Defendant's unredacted version. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 9/13/2017. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1029 MOTION by Ford Motor Company Re-File Ford's Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Relief Related to Ford's Discovery Misconduct re: 1022 Sealed Document (Attachment: #1 Response Brief)(Bonasso, Michael)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1028 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams of John Kelly on September 27, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. (Atkinson, Nathan)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1027 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams of David Harless on September 22, 2017 at 1:00 p.m. (Atkinson, Nathan)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1026 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams of George Hoffer on September 22, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. (Atkinson, Nathan)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1025 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams of Karl Stopschinski on September 22, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. (Atkinson, Nathan)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1024 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams of Douglas Young on September 20, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. (Atkinson, Nathan)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1023 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams of Paul Taylor on September 19, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. (Atkinson, Nathan)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1021 ORDER granting the #1019 MOTION by Ford Motor Company to Seal Ford's Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Relief Related to Ford's Discovery Misconduct; directing the Clerk of Court to file Ford's brief and exhibits UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 9/5/2017. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa) (Modified on 9/6/2017 to add link to the #1019 motion) (mkw).
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1020 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ford Motor Company for Designation of Expert Witnesses. (Bonasso, Michael)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1019 MOTION by Ford Motor Company to Seal Ford's Response to Plaitniffs' Motion for Relief Related to Ford's Discovery Misconduct (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Responseive Brief, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9)(Bonasso, Michael)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1018 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams for Supplemental Report of David J. Bilek, P.E.. (Atkinson, Nathan)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1017 NOTICE OF CONTINUED DEPOSITION by Ford Motor Company of Phillip Koopman on August 18, 2017 at 8:00 a.m. (Bonasso, Michael) (Modified on 8/18/2017 to convert event to notice to take or amend deposition) (ts).
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1016 ORDER canceling the Case Management Conference set on 8/24/2017; reminding the parties that the next Case Management Conference will be held on 10/12/2017 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 8/15/2017. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1015 ORDER granting in part Defendant's #1001 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' #995 MOTION for Relief Related to Ford's Discovery Misconduct; Defendant's Response due by 9/1/2017; Plaintiffs' Reply due by 10/20/2017. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 7/13/2017. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1014 AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Ford Motor Company of Steven Loudon on July 20, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. (Bonasso, Michael)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1013 REPLY by Ford Motor Company to #1003 Response In Opposition. (Bonasso, Michael)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1012 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Ford Motor Company of Joellen Gill on July 7, 2017 at 8:00 a.m. (Bonasso, Michael)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1011 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Ford Motor Company of Todd Hubing on July 18, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. (Bonasso, Michael)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1010 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Ford Motor Company of Phillip Koopman on July 28, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. (Bonasso, Michael)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1009 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Ford Motor Company of David Madigan on July 26, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. (Bonasso, Michael)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1008 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Ford Motor Company of Edward Stockton on July 12, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. (Bonasso, Michael)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1007 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Ford Motor Company of Steven Loudon on July 31, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. (Bonasso, Michael)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1006 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Ford Motor Company of Marthinus C. van Schoor on July 31, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. (Bonasso, Michael)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1005 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Ford Motor Company of David J. Bilek on July 14, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. (Bonasso, Michael)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1004 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams for Amended Expert Witness Disclosure of Joellen Gill. (Paul, Niall)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1003 MEMORANDUM by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams in Opposition to #1001 MOTION by Ford Motor Company to Extend Time to Respond to #995 MOTION by All Plaintiffs for Relief Related to Ford's Discovery Misconduct (Levitt, Adam)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1002 ORDER directing Plaintiffs to file a response to the #1001 MOTION by Ford Motor Company to Extend Time to Respond to #995 MOTION by All Plaintiffs for Relief Related to Ford's Discovery Misconduct on or before 6/26/2017; further directing Ford to file a Reply on or before 6/28/2017; the Court EXTENDS Ford's time to respond to Plaintiffs' underlying motion pending a ruling by the Court on Ford's motion for an extension of time. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 6/22/2017. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order SET DEADLINES as to #1001 MOTION by Ford Motor Company to Extend Time to Respond to #995 MOTION by All Plaintiffs for Relief Related to Ford's Discovery Misconduct; Responses due by 6/26/2017, Replies due by 6/28/2017, pursuant to the #1002 Order. (jsa)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1001 MOTION by Ford Motor Company to Extend Time to Respond to #995 MOTION by All Plaintiffs for Relief Related to Ford's Discovery Misconduct (Bonasso, Michael)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1000 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #993 Motion for Leave to File Motion, Memorandum, and Exhibits under Seal, and for Leave to File Publicly-Available Redacted Versions, Where Possible. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 6/20/2017. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa) (Modified on 6/20/2017 to add link to #993 motion) (mkw).
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert: #995 MOTION by All Plaintiffs for Relief Related to Ford's Discovery Misconduct. (kp)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert: #993 MOTION by Plaintiffs for Leave to File Motion, Memorandum, and Exhibits Under Seal, and For Leave to File Publicly-Available Redacted Versions, Where Possible. (kp)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order MOTIONS NO LONGER REFERRED: #993 MOTION by Plaintiffs for Leave to File Motion, Memorandum, and Exhibits Under Seal, and For Leave to File Publicly-Available Redacted Versions, Where Possible, #995 MOTION by All Plaintiffs for Relief Related to Ford's Discovery Misconduct. (kp)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 999 COMPOSITE EXHIBIT C MATERIALS SUBMITTED PURSUANT TO PROTECTIVE ORDER, SEALED, by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams, Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207 to #995 MOTION by All Plaintiffs for Relief Related to Ford's Discovery Misconduct (Levitt, Adam) (Modified on 6/19/2017 to add party filers) (kp).
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 998 EXHIBIT A SUBMITTED PURSUANT TO PROTECTIVE ORDER, SEALED, by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams, Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207 to #995 MOTION by All Plaintiffs for Relief Related to Ford's Discovery Misconduct (Levitt, Adam) (Modified on 6/19/2017 to add party filers) (kp).
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 997 MEMORANDUM OF LAW SUBMITTED PURSUANT TO PROTECTIVE ORDER, SEALED, by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams,Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207 re: #996 Redacted Memorandum of Law (Levitt, Adam) (Modified on 6/19/2017 to add party filers) (kp).
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 996 REDACTED MEMORANDUM OF LAW by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams, Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207 in support of #995 MOTION by All Plaintiffs for Relief Related to Ford's Discovery Misconduct (Levitt, Adam) (Modified on 6/19/2017 to add party filers) (kp).
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 995 MOTION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams, Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207 for Relief Related to Ford's Discovery Misconduct (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, [REDACTED] Declaration of Philip Koopman, Ph.D., #2 Exhibit B, May 28, 2015 Hearing Transcript, #3 Exhibit C, [Composite, Filed Under Seal] Electronic Communications Produced in Discovery) (Levitt, Adam) (Modified on 6/19/2017 to add party filers) (kp).
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 994 MEMORANDUM by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207 in support of #993 MOTION ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207 for Leave to File Motion, Memorandum, and Exhibits Under Seal, and For Leave to File Publicly-Available Redacted Versions, Where Possible (Levitt, Adam) (Modified on 6/19/2017 to add party filers) (ts).
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 993 MOTION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207 for Leave to File Motion, Memorandum, and Exhibits Under Seal, and For Leave to File Publicly-Available Redacted Versions, Where Possible. (Levitt, Adam) (Modified on 6/19/2017 to add party filers) (ts)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 992 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Mills Allison, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams for Expert Witness Disclosure. (Paul, Niall) (Modified on 6/16/2017 to remove terminated party filer) (kp).
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 991 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael Antramgarza for Supplemental Responses to Ford Motor Company's Interrogatories. (Levitt, Adam)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 990 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Charles Johnson for Supplemental Responses to Ford Motor Company's Interrogatories. (Levitt, Adam)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 989 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Quintin Williams for Supplemental Responses to Ford Motor Company's Interrogatories. (Levitt, Adam)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 988 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976 for Supplemental Responses to Ford Motor Company's Interrogatories. (Levitt, Adam)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 987 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams for Joint Supplemental Responses to Ford Motor Company's Contention Interrogatories. (Levitt, Adam)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 986 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207 for Supplemental Responses to Ford Motor Company's Interrogatories. (Levitt, Adam)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 985 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John McGee for Supplemental Responses to Ford Motor Company's Interrogatories. (Levitt, Adam)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 984 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207 for Supplemental Responses to Ford Motor Company's Interrogatories. (Levitt, Adam)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 983 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976 for Supplemental Responses to Ford Motor Company's Interrogatories. (Levitt, Adam)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 982 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207 for Supplemental Responses to Ford Motor Company's Interrogatories. (Levitt, Adam)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 981 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207 for Supplemental Responses to Ford Motor Company's Interrogatories. (Levitt, Adam)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 980 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207 for Supplemental Responses to Ford Motor Company's Interrogatories. (Levitt, Adam)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 979 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207 for Third Supplemental Responses to Ford Motor Company's Interrogatories. (Levitt, Adam)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 978 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976 for Second Supplemental Responses to Ford Motor Company's Interrogatories. (Levitt, Adam)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 977 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976 for Supplemental Responses to Ford Motor Company's Interrogatories. (Levitt, Adam)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 976 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976 for Second Supplemental Responses to Ford Motor Company's Interrogatories. (Levitt, Adam)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 975 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976 for Supplemental Responses to Ford Motor Company's Second Set of Interrogatories. (Levitt, Adam)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 974 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ford Motor Company for Responses to Plaintiffs' Sixth Set of Requests for Production of Documents. (Bonasso, Michael)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 973 ORDER canceling the Case Management Conference set on 5/25/2017; reminding the parties that the next Case Management Conference will be held on 8/24/2017 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 5/22/2017. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (mkw)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 972 AMENDED NOTICE OF SUBPOENA FOR DEPOSITION by Ford Motor Company of Michael Gloor on May 16, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. EST (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A - Subpoena)(Bonasso, Michael)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 971 NOTICE OF SUBPOENA FOR DEPOSITION by Ford Motor Company of Michael Gloor on May 16, 2017 at 9:30 a.m. EST (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A - Subpoena)(Bonasso, Michael)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 970 NOTICE OF SUBPOENA FOR DEPOSITION by Ford Motor Company of Denise D'Arpa on May 18, 2017 at 8:00 a.m. EST (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A - Subpoena)(Bonasso, Michael)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 969 NOTICE OF SUBPOENA FOR TELEPHONIC DEPOSITION by Ford Motor Company of Billy Stinnett on May 16, 2017 at 11:00 a.m. EST (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A - Subpoena)(Bonasso, Michael)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 968 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying in part and granting in part #954 MOTION by Ford Motor Company for Protective Order and OBJECTIONS to Plaintiffs' Service of New Discovery; LIFTING the current stay; directing Ford to produce documents: 4, 5, 7, 8, 10, 13, 18, 19, 20, 21, 22, 23, 24, 25, 26, 27, 28, 30, 31, 33, 34, 36, 37, 38, 39, and 40 by 5/24/2017; GRANTING a protective order as to the remainder of the discovery. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 5/9/2017. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (mkw)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 967 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Mark A. DiCello on behalf of Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Inez A. Patton, David H. Patton, ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Michael Antramgarza, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Charles Johnson, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, John McGee, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207. Local counsel: Niall A. Paul. Fee $50.00. Receipt # 0425-5592099. (Paul, Niall)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 966 NOTICE OF SUBPOENA FOR DEPOSITION by Ford Motor Company of Steve Arshambault on May 18, 2017 at 12:30 p.m. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Subpoena)(Bonasso, Michael)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 965 ORDER staying the pending discovery that is the subject of the #954 MOTION by Ford Motor Company for Protective Order and Objections to Plaintiffs' Service of New Discovery. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 5/2/2017. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (mkw)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 964 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams of Nina Mattikow on May 1, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit Subpoena)(Atkinson, Nathan)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 963 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams of Alfred Mattikow on May 1, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit Subpoena)(Atkinson, Nathan)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 962 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 04/05/2017, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Catherine Schutte-Stant, Telephone number 304-347-3151. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 5/8/2017. Redaction Request due 5/17/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/30/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/25/2017. (css)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 961 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Telephonic Discovery Conference held on 03/01/2017, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Ayme Cochran, Telephone number 304-347-3128. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 5/5/2017. Redaction Request due 5/16/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/26/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/24/2017. (aac)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 960 NOTICE OF SUBPOENA/NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams of Alberta Tinsley-Talabi on April 28, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena)(Atkinson, Nathan)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 959 REPLY by Ford Motor Company to #958 Response In Opposition. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Bonasso, Michael)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 958 RESPONSE by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams in opposition to #954 MOTION by Ford Motor Company for Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Paul, Niall)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 957 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Amy E. Keller on behalf of Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Inez A. Patton, David H. Patton, ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Michael Antramgarza, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Charles Johnson, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, John McGee, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207. Local counsel: Niall A. Paul. Fee $50.00. Receipt # 0425-5525338. (Paul, Niall)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 956 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION by Adam J. Levitt for John E. Tangren updating his contact information on behalf of ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams. (Levitt, Adam)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 955 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION by Adam J. Levitt updating his contact information on behalf of ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams. (Levitt, Adam)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 954 MOTION by Ford Motor Company for Protective Order and OBJECTIONS to Plaintiffs' Service of New Discovery (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R)(Bonasso, Michael)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 953 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams for Fourth Set of Requests for Admission and Seventh Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Levitt, Adam)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 952 ORDER directing Defendant to file its motion/objections to Plaintiffs' requests for production and requests for admissions on or before 4/14/2017; Plaintiffs' Response due 4/20/2017; and Defendant's Reply due 4/24/2017. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 4/12/2017. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 951 NOTICE OF RULE 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION by Ford Motor Company of a Corporate Representative of the Missouri State Highway Patrol on April 17, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. CDT (10:00 a.m. EDT) (Bonasso, Michael)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 950 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Ford Motor Company of Larry Rains on April 17, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. CDT (10:00 a.m. EDT) (Bonasso, Michael)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 949 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Ford Motor Company for proceedings held on 3/1/2017 before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. (Bonasso, Michael)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 948 ORDER denying #906 MOTION by Ford Motor Company for a Case Management Order Establishing an Amended Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 4/6/2017. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (mkw)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 947 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 914 MOTION by Plaintiffs to Compel Ford to Produce Documents Identified at the Depositions of Said Deep and Paul Szuszman; directing Ford to produce to Plaintiffs "[d]ocuments describing in which chips the main processor executable binary (including IPC code) is/are located, as well as the location of the RAM used by this binary" for the vehicles that correspond to the source code previously provided to Plaintiffs; Ford shall have through and including 4/30/2017, in which to produce the documents; Plaintiffs' remaining requests for documents are denied; with respect to Ford's motion for costs and fees, the following briefing schedule shall apply: Ford shall have through and including 4/17/2017 in which to file a memorandum, affidavits, and any other documentation or argument in support of its motion; Plaintiffs shall have through and including 4/24/2017 in which to respond to Fords submission; Ford shall have through and including 5/1/2017 in which to file a reply memorandum. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 4/5/2017. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mkw)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 946 TELEPHONIC MOTION HEARING held by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 4/5/2017 re: 914 MOTION by Plaintiffs to Compel Ford to Produce Documents Identified at the Depositions of Said Deep and Paul Szuszman; Court Reporter: Cathy Schutte-Stant. (mkw)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 945 PARTIAL SCHEDULING ORDER directing that the following dates are hereby fixed as the times by or on which certain events must occur: directing that the depositions of those individuals whose depositions could not be completed by 3/31/2017 be completed on or before 4/30/2017; Ford shall have until on or before 5/31/2017 for rebuttal; rescheduling the Case Management Conference currently set for 5/11/2017 to 5/25/2017 at 1:30 p.m.; scheduling additional Case Management Conferences for 8/24/2017 at 1:30 p.m. and 10/12/2017 at 1:30 p.m.; the parties shall complete all fact discovery by 6/1/2017; Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 6/15/2017, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 9/1/2017, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 9/29/2017; expert discovery must be completed by 10/13/2017; directing the party disclosing an expert to make that expert available for deposition prior to the 10/13/2017 deadline; all Daubert motions and all summary judgment motions due 11/13/2017; responses due 12/13/2017 and replies due 12/28/2017; a case management conference and a hearing on all Daubert motions, summary judgment motions, and any other matters the Court deems appropriate scheduled for Wednesday, 1/17/2018, at 10:00 a.m. through Friday, 1/19/2018; Plaintiffs' motion for class certification due 12/13/2017; response shall be filed no later than 1/12/2018, and a reply no later than 1/26/2018; Case Management Conference and a hearing on Plaintiffs' motion for class certification scheduled for Thursday, February 22, 2/22/2018 at 10:00 a.m.; Trial set to begin on 6/12/2018 at 8:30 AM and run through 6/22/2018 in Huntington before Judge Robert C. Chambers; directing Plaintiffs' counsel to submit a joint letter to the Court outlining the issues to be addressed seven days prior to the Case Management Conference; further directing the parties to submit a hard copy of any motion, supporting memorandum, response or reply, together with documents or materials in support, exceeding fifty (50) pages in length to the undersigned at the time of filing. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 4/4/2017. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 944 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207 for Responses to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Second Set of Requests for Production. (Paul, Niall)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 943 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207 for Responses to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Second Set of Interrogatories. (Paul, Niall)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 942 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Quintin Williams for Responses to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Second Set of Requests for Production. (Paul, Niall)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 941 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Quintin Williams for Responses to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Second Set of Interrogatories. (Paul, Niall)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 940 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207 for Responses to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Second Set of Requests for Production. (Paul, Niall)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 939 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207 for Responses to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Second Set of Interrogatories. (Paul, Niall)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 938 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Inez A. Patton for Responses to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Second Set of Requests for Production. (Paul, Niall)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 937 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Inez A. Patton for Responses to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Second Set of Interrogatories. (Paul, Niall)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 936 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by David H. Patton for Responses to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Second Set of Requests for Production. (Paul, Niall)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 935 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by David H. Patton for Responses to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Second Set of Interrogatories. (Paul, Niall)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 934 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976 for Responses to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Third Set of Requests for Production. (Paul, Niall)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 933 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976 for Responses to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Second Set of Interrogatories. (Paul, Niall)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 932 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc. for Responses to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Second Set of Requests for Production. (Paul, Niall)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 931 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc. for Responses to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Second Set of Interrogatories. (Paul, Niall)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 930 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207 for Responses to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Second Set of Interrogatories. (Paul, Niall)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 929 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207 for Responses to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Second Set of Requests for Production. (Paul, Niall) (Modified on 4/2/2017 to remove party filers)(ts).
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 928 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams for Sixth Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Paul, Niall)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 927 ORDER canceling the Case Management Conference set for 4/6/2017; the next Case Management Conference will be held on 5/11/2017 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 3/30/2017. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 926 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Case Management Conference held on March 16, 2017, before Judge Robert C. Chambers. Court Reporter Terry Ruffner, Telephone number 304-528-7583. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 4/7/2017. Redaction Request due 4/18/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/28/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/26/2017. (tmr)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 925 NOTICE OF SUBPOENA DEPOSITION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams of Kathleen Fitzgerald on March 21, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 45 (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena)(Atkinson, Nathan)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 924 NOTICE OF SUBPOENA FOR DEPOSITION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams of John Fitzgerald on March 21, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 45 (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena)(Atkinson, Nathan)
March 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 923 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE held by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 3/16/2017; Court Reporter: Teresa Ruffner. (trj)
March 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 922 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bonasso, Michael)
March 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 921 RESPONSE by Ford Motor Company in opposition to #910 MOTION by Plaintiffs to Seal Motion to Compel (Bonasso, Michael)
March 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 920 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams of Said Deep on March 20, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. (Paul, Niall)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 919 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Ford Motor Company (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Bonasso, Michael)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 918 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Ford Motor Company (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Bonasso, Michael)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 917 NOTICE of Subpoena for Deposition of Alberta Tinsley-Talabi Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 45 by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena to Alberta Tinsley-Talabi)(Atkinson, Nathan)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 916 NOTICE of Subpoena for Deposition of Kimberly Hunt Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 45 by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena to Kimberly Hunt)(Atkinson, Nathan)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 915 REPLY MEMORANDUM by Ford Motor Company to #909 Response In Opposition. (Bonasso, Michael)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 913 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #910 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Ford to Produce Documents Identified at the Deposition of Said Deep and Paul Szuszman, along with the attached exhibits; directing the Clerk to seal the motion and its supporting exhibits until further order of the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 3/3/2017. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 912 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Ford Motor Company (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Bonasso, Michael)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 911 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Ford Motor Company (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Bonasso, Michael)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert: #910 MOTION by Plaintiffs to Seal Motion to Compel (ts)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 910 MOTION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams to Seal Motion to Compel. (Attachment: #1 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel)(Paul, Niall)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 909 RESPONSE by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams in opposition to #906 MOTION by Ford Motor Company for a Case Management Order Establishing an Amended Scheduling Order (Paul, Niall)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 908 TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY CONFERENCE held by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 3/1/2017; Court Reporter: CourtSmart. (cbo)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 907 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Ford Motor Company (Attachment #1 Exhibit A)(Bonasso, Michael)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 906 MOTION by Ford Motor Company for a Case Management Order Establishing an Amended Scheduling Order (Bonasso, Michael)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 905 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ford Motor Company for Second Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Charles Burd (Bonasso, Michael)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 904 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ford Motor Company for Third Set of Requests for Production to Plaintiff Charles Burd (Bonasso, Michael)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 903 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ford Motor Company for Second Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Timothy Matthews (Bonasso, Michael)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 902 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ford Motor Company for Second Set of Requests for Production to Plaintiff Timothy Matthews (Bonasso, Michael)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 901 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ford Motor Company for Second Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Mary Phippen (Bonasso, Michael)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 900 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ford Motor Company for Second Set of Requests for Production to Plaintiff Mary Phippen (Bonasso, Michael)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 899 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ford Motor Company for Second Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Quinton Williams (Bonasso, Michael)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 898 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ford Motor Company for Second Set of Requests for Production to Plaintiff Quinton Williams (Bonasso, Michael)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 897 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ford Motor Company for Second Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff ACA Legal Investigations, Inc. (Bonasso, Michael)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 896 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ford Motor Company for Second Set of Requests for Production to Plaintiff ACA Legal Investigations, Inc. (Bonasso, Michael)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 895 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ford Motor Company for Second Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff David Patton (Bonasso, Michael)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 894 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ford Motor Company for Second Set of Requests for Production to Plaintiff David Patton (Bonasso, Michael)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 893 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ford Motor Company for Second Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Inez Patton (Bonasso, Michael)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 892 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ford Motor Company for Second Set of Requests for Production to Plaintiff Inez Patton (Bonasso, Michael)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 891 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ford Motor Company for Second Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Shelley Riley (Bonasso, Michael)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 890 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ford Motor Company for Second Set of Requests for Production to Plaintiff Shelley Riley (Bonasso, Michael)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 889 NOTICE of Subpoena and Deposition Duces Tecum of Gerald Bonnett Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 45 by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena to Gerald Bonnett)(Atkinson, Nathan)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 888 NOTICE of Subpoena and Deposition Duces Tecum of Jerry M. Wise Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 45 by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena to Jerry M. Wise)(Atkinson, Nathan)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 887 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Telephonic Case Management Conference held on February 1, 2017, before Judge Robert C. Chambers and Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Terry Ruffner, Telephone number 304-528-7583. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 2/13/2017. Redaction Request due 2/23/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/6/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/3/2017. (tmr) (Modified docket text on 2/2/2017) (klc)
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 886 TELEPHONIC CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE held by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 2/1/2017; Court Reporter: Teresa Ruffner. (trj)
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 885 ORDER pursuant to the Case Management Conference held 2/1/2017; directing that Plaintiffs shall have 7 days following the completion of Mr. Deep's deposition to request any additional documents identified by Mr. Deep or Mr. Szuszman that have not already been produced; Defendant shall have 7 days to respond to Plaintiffs' request; if Defendant denies any of Plaintiffs' requests for production, Plaintiff shall have 7 days from the denial to file a motion to produce; Defendant shall have 14 days to submit any supplemental interrogatories or requests for production to Plaintiffs regarding the status of their vehicles; Plaintiffs shall have until on or before 2/6/2017 to substitute individuals who may have experienced other similar incidents of unintended acceleration; depositions of any individuals identified by Plaintiffs must be completed on or before 3/31/2017; Plaintiffs shall have 14 days to provide Defendant and the Court with a summary and projected timeline with regard to NHTSA's production of documents; Defendant shall have 6 weeks from 3/31/2017 to complete its discovery and depositions of fact witnesses relevant to other similar incidents; Defendant shall deliver the source code to Plaintiffs on or before 2/6/2017; thereafter, Plaintiffs shall have 6 weeks to complete their evaluation of the code. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 2/1/2017. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 884 REPLY by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams to #880 Response In Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Paul, Niall)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 883 ORDER directing that the Case Management Conference currently set for 1:30 p.m. on Wednesday, 2/1/2017, is reset to a telephone conference at 11:00 a.m. on that same day; directing counsel for Plaintiffs to arrange the telephone call. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 1/30/2017. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 882 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams of Said Deep on February 8, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. (Atkinson, Nathan)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 881 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams of Paul Szuszman on January 30, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. (Atkinson, Nathan)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 880 OPPOSITION by Ford Motor Company to #868 MOTION by Plaintiffs for Case Management Order Establishing Bellwether Protocol (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Bonasso, Michael)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 879 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiffs' #847 MOTION to Compel the Continued Deposition of Paul Szuszman; Plaintiffs are granted leave to continue the fact witness deposition of Mr. Szuszman, but are limited to four (4) additional hours rather than the seven (7) hours requested; directing the parties to promptly meet and confer as to a convenient date and location for the conclusion of the deposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 1/23/2017. (cc: counsel of record) (jsa)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 878 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams of Lt. Ryan Burckhardt on February 9, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. (Atkinson, Nathan)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 877 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Telephonic Motions Hearing held on January 13, 2017, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Lisa Cook, Telephone number 304-254-8053. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 1/30/2017. Redaction Request due 2/8/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/21/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/18/2017. (lac)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 876 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER granting Defendant Ford Motor Company's #875 MOTION to Seal Deposition of Paul Szuszman; directing the Clerk to seal Exhibit G to Defendant's #859 Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel the Continued Deposition of Paul Szuszman until further order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 1/18/2017. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert: #875 MOTION by Ford Motor Company to Seal Deposition of Paul Szuszman submitted as Exhibit G to the #859 Response In Opposition. (mkw)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 875 MOTION by Ford Motor Company to Seal Deposition of Paul Szuszman submitted as Exhibit G to the #859 Response In Opposition. (Bonasso, Michael)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 874 MOTION HEARING held by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 1/13/2017, re: #847 MOTION by Plaintiffs to Compel the Continued Deposition of Paul Szuszman. Court Reporter: Lisa Cook. (cbo)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 873 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, Daniel Gallegos, John E. Grimaldi, Samuel Hairston, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Rhoda Jeffers, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, Timothy Matthews, Shane Mayfield, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, Jonathan Poma, Thomas Porter, Shelley Riley, William S. Troutman, Quintin Williams of Garrett J. Loring on January 18, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. (Atkinson, Nathan)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 872 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, Daniel Gallegos, John E. Grimaldi, Samuel Hairston, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Rhoda Jeffers, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, Timothy Matthews, Shane Mayfield, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, Jonathan Poma, Thomas Porter, Shelley Riley, William S. Troutman, Quintin Williams of Homer C. Ervin on January 17, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. (Atkinson, Nathan)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 871 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Objects and to Permit Inspection or Testing by Ford Motor Company (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Bonasso, Michael)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 870 NOTICE of Subpoena for Deposition of Michael Garvin Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 45 by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena to Michael Garvin)(Atkinson, Nathan)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 869 NOTICE of Subpoena for Deposition of Alexandra Garvin Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 45 by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena to Alexandra Garvin)(Atkinson, Nathan)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 868 MOTION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams for Case Management Order Establishing Bellwether Protocol. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Paul, Niall)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 867 NOTICE of Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition in a Civil Action - Michael Brown by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena to Michael Brown)(Atkinson, Nathan)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 866 ORDER directing that a telephonic hearing on Plaintiffs' #847 MOTION to Compel the Continued Deposition of Paul Szuszman is set for 1/13/2017 at 11:30 AM in Huntington before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 1/6/2017. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (jsa)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 865 ORDER denying without prejudice #860 MOTION by Michael M. Stevens, E. Kay Fuller and Martin & Seibert, L.C. to Withdraw from the ECF filing system on behalf of Progressive Casualty Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 1/4/2017. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (mkw)
December 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 864 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Ford Motor Company (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Bonasso, Michael)
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 863 REPLY MEMORANDUM by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams to #859 Response In Opposition. (Paul, Niall)
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 862 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Ford Motor Company (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Bonasso, Michael)
December 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 861 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Ford Motor Company (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Bonasso, Michael)
December 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 860 MOTION by Michael M. Stevens, E. Kay Fuller and Martin & Seibert, L.C. to Withdraw from the ECF filing system on behalf of Progressive Casualty Insurance Company (Stevens, Michael)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 859 RESPONSE by Ford Motor Company in opposition to #847 MOTION by Plaintiffs to Compel the Continued Deposition of Paul Szuszman (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Bonasso, Michael)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 858 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Telephonic Case Management Conference held on December 19, 2016, before Judge Robert C. Chambers. Court Reporter Terry Ruffner, Telephone number 304-528-7583. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 1/3/2017. Redaction Request due 1/11/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/23/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/21/2017. (tmr)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 857 TELEPHONIC CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE held by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 12/19/2016; Court Reporter: Teresa Ruffner. (trj)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 856 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Ford Motor Company (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Bonasso, Michael)
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 855 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Ford Motor Company (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Bonasso, Michael)
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 854 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Ford Motor Company (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Bonasso, Michael)
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 853 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Ford Motor Company (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Bonasso, Michael)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 852 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Ford Motor Company (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Bonasso, Michael)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 851 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Ford Motor Company (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Bonasso, Michael)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 850 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #848 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' #847 Motion to Compel; directing the Clerk to seal the motion and its supporting exhibits until further order of the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 12/9/2016. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 849 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams in support of #848 MOTION by Plaintiffs to Seal #847 MOTION by Plaintiffs to Compel the Continued Deposition of Paul Szuszman (Paul, Niall)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 848 MOTION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams to Seal #847 MOTION by Plaintiffs to Compel the Continued Deposition of Paul Szuszman (Paul, Niall)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert: #848 MOTION by Plaintiffs to Seal #847 MOTION by Plaintiffs to Compel the Continued Deposition of Paul Szuszman (skh)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert: #847 MOTION by Plaintiffs to Compel the Continued Deposition of Paul Szuszman (skh)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 847 MOTION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams to Compel the Continued Deposition of Paul Szuszman (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Ford Motor Companys Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures, #2 Exhibit B - February 25, 2015 Deposition Excerpts of Paul Szuszman, #3 Exhibit C - Plaintiffs Amended Notice F.R.C.P. 30(b)(6) Corporate Representative Deposition of Defendant Ford Motor Company, #4 Exhibit D - June 21, 2016 Deposition Excerpts of Top Chea, #5 Exhibit E - July 28, 2016 Deposition Excerpts of Tom Erickson, #6 Exhibit F - July 22, 2016 Deposition Excerpts of Bradley Gresens)(Atkinson, Nathan)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 846 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents to Michael Brown by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena for Production of Documents to Michael Brown)(Atkinson, Nathan)
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 845 ORDER rescheduling the Case Management Conference currently set for 12/19/2016 from 9:30 a.m. until 10:30 a.m.; directing counsel for Defendant to set up the conference call with counsel for Plaintiffs and the Court; rescheduling the Case Management Conference currently set for 2/2/2017 to 2/1/2017 at 1:30 p.m. in Huntington before Judge Robert C. Chambers. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 12/6/2016. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 844 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Ford Motor Company (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Bonasso, Michael)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 843 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents to National Academy Of Sciences by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena for Production of Documents to National Academy Of Sciences)(Atkinson, Nathan)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 842 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents to Alliance Of Automobile Manufacturers, Inc. by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena for Production of Documents to Alliance Of Automobile Manufacturers, Inc.)(Atkinson, Nathan)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 841 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Ford Motor Company (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Bonasso, Michael)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 840 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Ford Motor Company (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Bonasso, Michael)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 839 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Ford Motor Company (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Bonasso, Michael)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 838 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Ford Motor Company (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Bonasso, Michael)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 837 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Ford Motor Company (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Bonasso, Michael)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 836 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Ford Motor Company (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Bonasso, Michael)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 835 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Ford Motor Company (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Bonasso, Michael)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 834 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Ford Motor Company (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Bonasso, Michael)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 833 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Ford Motor Company (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Bonasso, Michael)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 832 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Ford Motor Company (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Bonasso, Michael)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 831 NOTICE of Issuance of Subpoenas Duces Tecum by Ford Motor Company (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Bonasso, Michael)
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 830 ORDER directing that Attorney Holly Anne Bartuska is terminated and removed as counsel for Plaintiffs as she is no longer associated with the firm of Bremer Whyte Brown & O'Meara and therefore no longer represents Plaintiffs in this matter. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 11/16/2016. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 829 ORDER canceling the Case Management Conference previously scheduled for 12/15/2016; the next Case Management Conference is set for 12/19/2016 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 11/16/2016. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 828 NOTICE of Subpoena and Deposition Duces Tecum of Gerald Bonnett Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 45 by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena to Gerald Bonnett)(Atkinson, Nathan)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 827 NOTICE of Subpoena and Deposition Duces Tecum of Jerry M. Wise Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 45 by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena to Jerry M. Wise)(Atkinson, Nathan)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 826 NOTICE of Subpoena and Deposition Duces Tecum of Homer C. Ervin Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 45 by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena to Homer C. Ervin)(Atkinson, Nathan)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 825 NOTICE of Subpoena and Deposition Duces Tecum of Garrett J. Loring Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 45 by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena to Garrett J. Loring)(Atkinson, Nathan)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 824 NOTICE of Subpoena and Deposition Duces Tecum of Lt. Ryan Burckhardt Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 45 by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena to Ryan Burckhardt)(Atkinson, Nathan)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 823 NOTICE of Subpoena and Deposition Duces Tecum of Michael Garvin Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 45 by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena to Michael Garvin)(Atkinson, Nathan)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 822 NOTICE of Subpoena and Deposition Duces Tecum of Alexandra Garvin Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 45 by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena to Alexandra Garvin)(Atkinson, Nathan)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 821 NOTICE of Subpoena and Deposition Duces Tecum of Alfred Mattikow Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 45 by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena to Alfred Mattikow)(Atkinson, Nathan)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 820 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, Daniel Gallegos, John E. Grimaldi, Samuel Hairston, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Rhoda Jeffers, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, Timothy Matthews, Shane Mayfield, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, Jonathan Poma, Thomas Porter, Shelley Riley, William S. Troutman, Quintin Williams of Paul Szuszman on November 15, 2016 at 9:00 a.m. EST (Atkinson, Nathan)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 819 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION by Michael M. Stevens for E. Kay Fuller to be removed from the Court's service list on behalf of Progressive Casualty Insurance Company. (Stevens, Michael)
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 818 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Telephone (Discovery) Conference held on 09/07/2016, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Mary Schweinhagen, Telephone number 304-347-3188. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 11/10/2016. Redaction Request due 11/21/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/1/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/30/2017. (klc)
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 817 ORDER directing that the next case management conference is set for 12/19/2016 at 9:30 AM in Huntington before Judge Robert C. Chambers; further directing that the parties discuss amongst themselves what issue they believe need to be addressed at the Case Management Conference and directing Plaintiffs' counsel to submit a joint letter to the Court outlining the issues on or before 12/12/2016. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 10/31/2016. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
October 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 816 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE held by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 10/20/2016; Court Reporter: Teresa Ruffner. (trj)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 815 NOTICE OF SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DAVID MCDAVID PLANO LINCOLN by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams (Attachments: #1 Notice of Subpoena, #2 Schedule A)(Dang, Jason) (Modified on 10/5/2016 to correct party filers) (skh).
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 814 NOTICE OF SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO AUTONATION FORD MAZDA CORPUS CHRISTI by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams (Attachments: #1 Notice of Subpoena, #2 Schedule A)(Dang, Jason) (Modified on 10/5/2016 to correct party filers) (skh).
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 813 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, Daniel Gallegos, John E. Grimaldi, Samuel Hairston, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Rhoda Jeffers, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, Timothy Matthews, Shane Mayfield, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, Jonathan Poma, Thomas Porter, Shelley Riley, William S. Troutman, Quintin Williams of Robert Brown on October 5, 2016 at 10:30 a.m. EST (Atkinson, Nathan)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 812 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, Daniel Gallegos, John E. Grimaldi, Samuel Hairston, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Rhoda Jeffers, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, Timothy Matthews, Shane Mayfield, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, Jonathan Poma, Thomas Porter, Shelley Riley, William S. Troutman, Quintin Williams of Daniel Dittman on October 11, 2016 at 9:30 a.m. EST (Atkinson, Nathan)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 811 NOTICE of Amended Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition of Sunrise Ford Company by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Subpoena to Sunrise Ford Company)(Atkinson, Nathan)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 810 NOTICE of Amended Subpoena and Deposition Duces Tecum of Sam Galloway Ford, Inc. by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Subpoena to Sam Galloway Ford, Inc.)(Atkinson, Nathan)
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 809 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Hearing held on August 25, 2016, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Mary Schweinhagen, Telephone number 304-347-3188/mary_schweinhagen@wvsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 9/19/2016. Redaction Request due 9/29/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/11/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/7/2016. (mas)
September 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 808 NOTICE OF SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO TOM PECK FORD OF HUNTLEY, INC. by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Mills Allison, Michael Antramgarza, Lance R. Belville, Robert Brandon, 3:13-cv-20976, Donald C. Carr, Carolyn Chase, 3:13-cv-14207, Jill Durant, Laura Elsinger, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, Beverly Gorton, Charles Johnson, Gabriel Kletschka, Josh Legato, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Greg Peet, 3:13-cv-14207, Dean Richardson, Roofwerks, Inc., Christine Salamone, Sharon Shaffer, 3:13-cv-14207, Pamela D. Smith, 3:13-cv-14207, Mindi Stewart, Stanley Stewart, Betty J. Trinque, 3:13-cv-14207, Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Dang, Jason)
September 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 807 NOTICE OF SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO SMITH CAIRNS FORD OF WHITE PLAINS, INC. by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Mills Allison, Michael Antramgarza, Lance R. Belville, Robert Brandon, 3:13-cv-20976, Donald C. Carr, Carolyn Chase, 3:13-cv-14207, Jill Durant, Laura Elsinger, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, Beverly Gorton, Charles Johnson, Gabriel Kletschka, Josh Legato, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Greg Peet, 3:13-cv-14207, Dean Richardson, Roofwerks, Inc., Christine Salamone, Mindi Stewart, Stanley Stewart, Betty J. Trinque, 3:13-cv-14207, Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Dang, Jason)
September 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 806 DISCOVERY CONFERENCE held by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 9/7/2016; Court Reporter: Mary Schweinhagen. (mkw)
September 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 805 NOTICE OF SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO JEFF BELZER NEW PRAGUE FORD, LLC by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Mills Allison, Michael Antramgarza, Lance R. Belville, Robert Brandon, 3:13-cv-20976, Donald C. Carr, Carolyn Chase, 3:13-cv-14207, Jill Durant, Laura Elsinger, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, Beverly Gorton, Charles Johnson, Gabriel Kletschka, Josh Legato, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Greg Peet, 3:13-cv-14207, Dean Richardson, Roofwerks, Inc., Christine Salamone, Sharon Shaffer, 3:13-cv-14207, Pamela D. Smith, 3:13-cv-14207, Mindi Stewart, Stanley Stewart, Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Dang, Jason)
September 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 804 NOTICE OF SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO JENKINS FORD by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Mills Allison, Michael Antramgarza, Lance R. Belville, Robert Brandon, 3:13-cv-20976, Donald C. Carr, Carolyn Chase, 3:13-cv-14207, Jill Durant, Laura Elsinger, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, Beverly Gorton, Charles Johnson, Gabriel Kletschka, Josh Legato, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Greg Peet, 3:13-cv-14207, Dean Richardson, Roofwerks, Inc., Christine Salamone, Sharon Shaffer, 3:13-cv-14207, Pamela D. Smith, 3:13-cv-14207, Mindi Stewart, Stanley Stewart, Betty J. Trinque, 3:13-cv-14207, Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Dang, Jason)
September 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 803 NOTICE OF SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO BALISE MOTOR SALES CO. by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Mills Allison, Michael Antramgarza, Lance R. Belville, Robert Brandon, 3:13-cv-20976, Donald C. Carr, Carolyn Chase, 3:13-cv-14207, Jill Durant, Laura Elsinger, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, Beverly Gorton, Charles Johnson, Gabriel Kletschka, Josh Legato, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Greg Peet, 3:13-cv-14207, Dean Richardson, Roofwerks, Inc., Christine Salamone, Sharon Shaffer, 3:13-cv-14207, Pamela D. Smith, 3:13-cv-14207, Mindi Stewart, Stanley Stewart, Betty J. Trinque, 3:13-cv-14207, Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Dang, Jason)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 802 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents to Visteon Corporation by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena to Visteon Corporation)(Atkinson, Nathan)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 801 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Ford Motor Company for proceedings held on 8/25/2016 before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. (Bonasso, Michael)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 800 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER REGARDING SOURCE CODE DISCOVERY directing that within twenty (20) days, Ford shall provide Plaintiffs with the particular source code and other files described herein; Plaintiffs are instructed to begin testing of the source code in a manner consistent with this Order; Plaintiffs shall be prepared to provide the court with a status report and estimated time table for completion of source code discovery at the next status conference scheduled in October. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 9/1/2016. (cc: counsel of record) (jsa)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 799 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Jason H. Dang on behalf of Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Inez A. Patton, David H. Patton, ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Michael Antramgarza, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Charles Johnson, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, John McGee, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207. Local counsel: Niall A. Paul. Fee $50.00. Receipt # 0425-4827529. (Paul, Niall)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 798 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Keith G. Bremer on behalf of Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Inez A. Patton, David H. Patton, ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Michael Antramgarza, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Charles Johnson, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, John McGee, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207. Local counsel: Niall A. Paul. Fee $50.00. Receipt # 0425-4827509. (Paul, Niall)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 797 DISCOVERY HEARING held by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 8/25/2016; Court Reporter: CourtSmart. (cbo)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 796 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, Daniel Gallegos, John E. Grimaldi, Samuel Hairston, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Rhoda Jeffers, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, Timothy Matthews, Shane Mayfield, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, Jonathan Poma, Thomas Porter, Shelley Riley, William S. Troutman, Quintin Williams of Scott Clark on September 22, 2016 at 9:00 a.m. EST (Atkinson, Nathan)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 795 RESPONSE TO #793 TECHNICAL ADVISOR'S REPORT by Ford Motor Company Concerning Code, Features, and Drivers Produced by Ford and Requested by Plaintiffs Concerning Additional Software Tools. (Bonasso, Michael)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 794 RESPONSE TO #793 TECHNICAL ADVISOR'S REPORT by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams (Levitt, Adam)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 793 NOTICE OF FILING OF TECHNICAL ADVISOR'S REPORT, RESPONSE DEADLINE, AND NOTICE OF HEARING; directing that the parties have through and including 8/19/2016 in which to file a response to the technical advisor's report attached herein; further directing that a hearing to address the report, recommendations, responses, and objections, if any, is set for 8/25/2016 at 9:00 AM in Huntington before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 8/12/2016. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (jsa)
August 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 792 ORDER cancelling the 10/3/2016 pretrial conference, the 10/31/2016 final settlement conference, and the 11/1/2016 trial as a result of previous scheduling. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 8/11/2016. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 791 ORDER directing Attorney Keith Bremer to comply with the provisions of Local Rule 83.6 of the United States District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia and others related thereto by associating with qualified local counsel, satisfying the requirements of the West Virginia State Bar Association, and filing in this civil action the Statement of Visiting Attorney form within 20 days of the date of entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 8/10/2016. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 790 ORDER directing that the Case Management Conference currently set for 8/11/2016 is cancelled; directing that Case Management Conferences are scheduled on the following Thursdays at 1:30 p.m.: 10/20/2016; 12/15/2016; 2/2/2017; 3/16/2017; 4/6/2017; and 5/11/2017. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 8/8/2016. (cc: Magistrate Judge Eifert; counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 789 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, Daniel Gallegos, John E. Grimaldi, Samuel Hairston, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Rhoda Jeffers, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, Timothy Matthews, Shane Mayfield, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, Jonathan Poma, Thomas Porter, Shelley Riley, William S. Troutman, Quintin Williams of Paul Szuszman on August 25, 2016 at 9:00 AM EST (Atkinson, Nathan)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 788 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, Daniel Gallegos, John E. Grimaldi, Samuel Hairston, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Rhoda Jeffers, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, Timothy Matthews, Shane Mayfield, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, Jonathan Poma, Thomas Porter, Shelley Riley, William S. Troutman, Quintin Williams of Jeff Doering on August 24, 2016 at 9:00 AM EST (Atkinson, Nathan)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 787 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, Daniel Gallegos, John E. Grimaldi, Samuel Hairston, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Rhoda Jeffers, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, Timothy Matthews, Shane Mayfield, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, Jonathan Poma, Thomas Porter, Shelley Riley, William S. Troutman, Quintin Williams of Philip Yuhasz on August 23, 2016 at 9:00 AM EST (Atkinson, Nathan)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 786 AMENDED NOTICE of Subpoena and Deposition Duces Tecum of Day Ford, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 45 and 30(b)(6) by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Subpoena to Day Ford, Inc.)(Atkinson, Nathan)
July 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 785 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION by Stephanie Poli requesting removal from the Court's service list on behalf of Certain Plaintiffs. (skh)
July 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 784 ORDER directing that the Case Management Conference currently scheduled for 8/11/2016 at 1:30 p.m. will now be held on 8/11/2016 at 2:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 7/7/2016. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
July 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 783 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, Daniel Gallegos, John E. Grimaldi, Samuel Hairston, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Rhoda Jeffers, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, Timothy Matthews, Shane Mayfield, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, Jonathan Poma, Thomas Porter, Shelley Riley, William S. Troutman, Quintin Williams of Bill Goodwin on July 29, 2016 at 9:00 a.m. EST (Atkinson, Nathan)
July 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 782 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, Daniel Gallegos, John E. Grimaldi, Samuel Hairston, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Rhoda Jeffers, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, Timothy Matthews, Shane Mayfield, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, Jonathan Poma, Thomas Porter, Shelley Riley, William S. Troutman, Quintin Williams of Tom Erickson on July 28, 2016 at 9:00 a.m. EST (Atkinson, Nathan)
July 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 781 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, Daniel Gallegos, John E. Grimaldi, 3 Samuel Hairston, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Rhoda Jeffers, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, Timothy Matthews, Shane Mayfield, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, Jonathan Poma, Thomas Porter, Shelley Riley, William S. Troutman, Quintin Williams of James Engle on July 27, 2016 at 9:00 a.m. EST (Atkinson, Nathan)
July 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 780 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, Daniel Gallegos, John E. Grimaldi, Samuel Hairston, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Rhoda Jeffers, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, Timothy Matthews, Shane Mayfield, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, Jonathan Poma, Thomas Porter, Shelley Riley, William S. Troutman, Quintin Williams of Bradley Gresens on July 22, 2016 at 9:00 a.m. EST (Atkinson, Nathan)
July 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 779 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, Daniel Gallegos, John E. Grimaldi, Samuel Hairston, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Rhoda Jeffers, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, Timothy Matthews, Shane Mayfield, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, Jonathan Poma, Thomas Porter, Shelley Riley, William S. Troutman, Quintin Williams of Said Deep on July 20, 2016 at 9:00 a.m. EST (Atkinson, Nathan)
July 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 778 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, Daniel Gallegos, John E. Grimaldi, Samuel Hairston, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Rhoda Jeffers, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, Timothy Matthews, Shane Mayfield, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, Jonathan Poma, Thomas Porter, Shelley Riley, William S. Troutman, Quintin Williams of Ken Lilly on July 19, 2016 at 9:00 a.m. EST (Atkinson, Nathan)
June 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 777 AMENDED NOTICE of Subpoena and Deposition Duces Tecum of Pundmann Motor Company Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 45 and 30(b)(6) by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Subpoena to Pundmann Motor Company)(Atkinson, Nathan)
June 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 776 AMENDED NOTICE of Subpoena and Deposition Duces Tecum of Town and Country Ford, Incorporated Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 45 and 30(b)(6) by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Subpoena to Town and Country Ford, Incorporated)(Atkinson, Nathan)
June 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 775 AMENDED NOTICE of Subpoena and Deposition Duces Tecum of Ganley Ford, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 45 and 30(b)(6) by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Subpoena to Ganley Ford, Inc.)(Atkinson, Nathan)
June 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 774 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena to Sunrise Ford Company)(Atkinson, Nathan) Modified on 6/27/2016 (rea).
June 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 773 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena to Rountree-Moore Ford, LLLP)(Atkinson, Nathan) Modified on 6/27/2016 (rea).
June 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 772 NOTICE of Subpoena and Deposition Duces Tecum of Sam Galloway Ford, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 45 and 30(b)(6) by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena to Sam Galloway Ford, Inc.)(Atkinson, Nathan)
June 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 771 NOTICE of Subpoena and Deposition Duces Tecum of Don Gasgarth Ford, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 45 and 30(b)(6) by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 - Subpoena to Don Gasgarth Ford, Inc.)(Atkinson, Nathan) Modified on 6/27/2016 (rea).
June 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 770 NOTICE of Subpoena and Deposition Duces Tecum of Ed Howard Lincoln-Mercury, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 45 and 30(b)(6) by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena to Ed Howard Lincoln-Mercury, Inc.)(Atkinson, Nathan)
June 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 769 NOTICE of Subpoena and Deposition Duces Tecum of Brandon Ford, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 45 and 30(b)(6) by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena to Brandon Ford, Inc.)(Atkinson, Nathan)
June 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 768 NOTICE of Subpoena and Deposition Duces Tecum of Ernie Haire Ford, Inc. by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena to Ernie Haire Ford, Inc.)(Atkinson, Nathan) Modified on 6/27/2016 to add party filer and to remove terminated party filer) (rea).
June 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 767 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT for pro se and non-electronic filers re #766 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of telephone conference held on June 8, 2016, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Mary Schweinhagen, Telephone number 304-347-3188/email mary_schweinhagen@wvsd.uscourts.gov. (klc)
June 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 766 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of telephone conference held on June 8, 2016, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Mary Schweinhagen, Telephone number 304-347-3188/email mary_schweinhagen@wvsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 7/1/2016. Redaction Request due 7/12/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/22/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/19/2016. (mas)
June 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 765 THIRD NOTICE FOR DEPOSITION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 30(b)(6) by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, Daniel Gallegos, John E. Grimaldi, Samuel Hairston, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Rhoda Jeffers, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, Timothy Matthews, Shane Mayfield, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, Jonathan Poma, Thomas Porter, Shelley Riley, William S. Troutman, Quintin Williams of Ford Motor Company Corporate Representative on July 26, 2016 at 9:00 a.m. EST (Attachment: #1 Exhibit(s) - Schedule A)(Atkinson, Nathan) (Modified on 6/20/2016 to add "third")(taq).
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 764 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION by Jodi Munn Schebel updating her contact information on behalf of Ford Motor Company. (Schebel, Jodi)
June 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 763 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, Daniel Gallegos, John E. Grimaldi, Samuel Hairston, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Rhoda Jeffers, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, Timothy Matthews, Shane Mayfield, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, Jonathan Poma, Thomas Porter, Shelley Riley,William S. Troutman, Quintin Williams of Top Chea on June 21, 2016 at 9:00 a.m. EST (Atkinson, Nathan)
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 762 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, Daniel Gallegos, John E. Grimaldi, Samuel Hairston, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Rhoda Jeffers, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, Timothy Matthews, Shane Mayfield, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, Jonathan Poma, Thomas Porter, Shelley Riley, William S. Troutman, Quintin Williams of John O'Rear on June 29, 2016 at 9:00 a.m. EST (Atkinson, Nathan)
June 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 761 DISCOVERY CONFERENCE held by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 6/8/2016; Court Reporter: Mary Schweinhagen. (mkw)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 760 NOTICE of Subpoena and Deposition Duces Tecum of McLarty CMFO, LLC d/b/a Joe Machens Ford Lincoln Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 45 and 30(b)(6) by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena to McLarty CMFO, LLC d/b/a Joe Machens Ford Lincoln)(Atkinson, Nathan)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 759 NOTICE of Subpoena and Deposition Duces Tecum of Pundmann Motor Company Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 45 and 30(b)(6) by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena to Pundmann Motor Company)(Atkinson, Nathan)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 758 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT for pro se and non-electronic filers re #757 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Telephonic Discovery Conference held on 05/25/2016, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Catherine Schutte-Stant, Telephone number 304-347-3151. (klc)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 757 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Telephonic Discovery Conference held on 05/25/2016, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Catherine Schutte-Stant, Telephone number 304-347-3151. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 6/13/2016. Redaction Request due 6/22/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/5/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/30/2016. (css)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 756 NOTICE of Subpoena and Deposition Duces Tecum of Town and Country Ford, Incorporated Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 45 and 30(b)(6) by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Atkinson, Nathan)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 755 NOTICE of Subpoena and Deposition Duces Tecum of Hinder Ford, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 45 and 30(b)(6) by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Atkinson, Nathan)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 754 NOTICE of Subpoena and Deposition Duces Tecum of Ganley Ford, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 45 and 30(b)(6) by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Atkinson, Nathan)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 753 NOTICE of Subpoena and Deposition Duces Tecum of Fred Beans Ford, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 45 and 30(b)(6) by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Robert Brandon, 3:13-cv-20976, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Atkinson, Nathan)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 752 NOTICE of Subpoena and Deposition Duces Tecum of Day Ford, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 45 and 30(b)(6) by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Atkinson, Nathan)
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 751 ORDER canceling the Case Management Conference currently set for 6/2/2016; directing the parties to include in the joint letter submitted in advance of the 8/11/2016 conference a list of agreed upon dates to hold future Case Management Conferences through the end of 2016, as more fully set forth herein. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 5/27/2016. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 750 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, Daniel Gallegos, John E. Grimaldi, Samuel Hairston, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Rhoda Jeffers, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, Timothy Matthews, Shane Mayfield, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, Jonathan Poma, Thomas Porter, Shelley Riley, William S. Troutman, Quintin Williams of Michelle Fraser on June 15, 2016 at 9:00 a.m. EST (Atkinson, Nathan)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 749 DISCOVERY CONFERENCE held by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 5/25/2016; Court Reporter: Cathy Schutte-Stant. (mkw)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 748 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, Daniel Gallegos, John E. Grimaldi, Samuel Hairston, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Rhoda Jeffers, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, Timothy Matthews, Shane Mayfield, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, Jonathan Poma, Thomas Porter, Shelley Riley, William S. Troutman, Quintin Williams of Mark Tuneff on June 14, 2016 at 9:00 a.m. EST (Atkinson, Nathan)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 747 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3: Daniel Gallegos, John E. Grimaldi, Samuel Hairston, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Rhoda Jeffers, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, Timothy Matthews, Shane Mayfield, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, Jonathan Poma, Thomas Porter, Shelley Riley, William S. Troutman, Quintin Williams of Keith Love on June 13, 2016 at 9:00 a.m. EST (Atkinson, Nathan)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 746 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, Daniel Gallegos, John E. Grimaldi, Samuel Hairston, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Rhoda Jeffers, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, Timothy Matthews, Shane Mayfield, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, Jonathan Poma, Thomas Porter, Shelley Riley, William S. Troutman, Quintin Williams of Kris Christensen on June 7, 2016 at 9:00 a.m. EST (Atkinson, Nathan)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 745 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, Daniel Gallegos, John E. Grimaldi, Samuel Hairston, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Rhoda Jeffers, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, Timothy Matthews, Shane Mayfield, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, Jonathan Poma, Thomas Porter, Shelley Riley, William S. Troutman, Quintin Williams of Basel Abbasi on June 6, 2016 at 9:00 a.m. EST (Atkinson, Nathan)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 744 AGENDA FOR THE PARTIES' INITIAL MEETING WITH COURT-APPOINTED SOURCE CODE TECHNICAL ADVISOR, WILLIAM H. SANDERS, Ph.D., M.S.E., B.S.E., setting forth the agenda for the initial meeting between the parties and the court-appointed source code technical advisor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 5/2/2016. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (jsa)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 743 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT for pro se and non-electronic filers re #742 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Telephonic Status Conference held on 04/27/2016, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Catherine Schutte-Stant, Telephone number 304-347-3151. (klc)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 742 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Telephonic Status Conference held on 04/27/2016, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Catherine Schutte-Stant, Telephone number 304-347-3151. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 5/9/2016. Redaction Request due 5/20/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/31/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/28/2016. (css)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 741 ACKNOWLEDMENT AND AGREEMENT TO BE BOUND by Dr. William Sanders, RE: #630 Protective Order. (jsa)
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 740 ORDER APPOINTING TECHNICAL ADVISOR FOR THE COURT directing that William H. Sanders, Ph.D., M.S.E., B.S.E., is appointed as a technical advisor to the Court for the purpose of assisting with issues related to source code and source code discovery; setting forth the terms of Dr. Sanders' appointment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 4/28/2016. (cc: Dr. William H. Sanders; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (jsa)
April 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 739 DISCOVERY CONFERENCE held by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 4/27/2016; Court Reporter: Cathy Schutte-Stant. (mkw)
April 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 738 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT for pro se and non-electronic filers re #737 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Case Management Conference held on April 21, 2016, before Judge Robert C. Chambers and Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Terry Ruffner, Telephone number 304-528-7583. (klc)
April 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 737 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Case Management Conference held on April 21, 2016, before Judge Robert C. Chambers and Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Terry Ruffner, Telephone number 304-528-7583. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 5/9/2016. Redaction Request due 5/18/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/31/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/26/2016. (tmr) (Modified docket text on 4/27/2016) (klc).
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 736 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE held by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 4/21/2016; Court Reporter: Teresa Ruffner. (trj)
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 735 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT for pro se and non-electronic filers re #734 TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Discovery Conference held on April 13, 2016, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Lisa Cook, Telephone number 304-254-8053. (klc)
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 734 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Telephonic Discovery Conference held on April 13, 2016, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Lisa Cook, Telephone number 304-254-8053. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 4/25/2016. Redaction Request due 5/6/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/16/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/14/2016. (lac)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 733 TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY CONFERENCE held by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 4/13/2016. (mkw)
April 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 732 ORDER directing the parties to confer and submit a letter to the Court identifying what specific discovery remains to be completed, as more fully set forth herein, on or before noon on Tuesday, 4/19/2016, in preparation for the upcoming Case Management Conference to be held on 4/21/2016. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 4/12/2016. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 731 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Niall)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 730 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT for pro se and non-electronic filers re #727 TRANSCRIPT of telephone status conference held on March 16, 2016, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Mary Schweinhagen, Telephone number 304-347-3188; email mary_schweinhagen@wvsd.uscourts.gov. (klc)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 729 SEALED EXHIBIT E filed by Plaintiffs pursuant to Court Order. Exhibit E to Plaintiffs' #700 Motion to Compel Ford to Produce Documents Listed in Ford's ASO Privilege Log. (mkw)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 728 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying Plaintiffs' #700 MOTION to Compel Ford to Produce Documents Listed in Ford's ASO Privilege Log and Plaintiffs' accompanying request for sanctions; granting Plaintiffs' #698 MOTION to Seal, and directing that Exhibit E attached to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel be sealed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 3/28/2016. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mkw)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 727 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of a telephone status conference held on March 16, 2016, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Mary Schweinhagen, Telephone number 304-347-3188; email mary_schweinhagen@wvsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 4/7/2016. Redaction Request due 4/18/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/28/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/27/2016. (mas)
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 726 DISCOVERY CONFERENCE held by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 3/16/2016; Court Reporter: Mary Schweinhagen. (mkw)
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 725 RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS by Ford Motor Company to Plaintiffs' #724 Revised Second Notice for Deposition Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) for Corporate Representative Deposition of Defendant Ford Motor Company (Bonasso, Michael)
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 724 REVISED SECOND NOTICE FOR DEPOSITION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 30(b)(6) by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams of 30(b)(6) of corporate representative of Defendant Ford Representative on March 23, 2016 at 9:00 a.m. (EST) (Attachment: #1 Exhibit(s) Schedule A)(Paul, Niall) (Modified on 3/9/2016 to convert event)(taq).
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 723 ORDER directing that bi-weekly discovery conferences will be conducted telephonically on the following Wednesdays: 3/16/2016, 3/30/2016, 4/13/2016, 4/27/2016, 5/11/2016, 5/25/2016, 6/8/2016, and 6/22/2016, from 3:00 p.m. to 4:30 p.m.; directing the parties to exchange agenda items by noon on the Monday preceding each conference via email, copying the undersigned's judicial assistant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 3/4/2016. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (jsa)
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 722 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT for pro se and non-electronic filers re #721 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Telephonic Discovery Conference held on 02/17/2016, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Catherine Schutte-Stant, Telephone number 304-347-3151. (klc)
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 721 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Telephonic Discovery Conference held on 02/17/2016, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Catherine Schutte-Stant, Telephone number 304-347-3151. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 3/7/2016. Redaction Request due 3/18/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/28/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/26/2016. (css) (Modified on 2/26/2016 to note that the telephonic discovery conference was held before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert) (mkw).
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 720 ORDER directing that the Case Management Conference set for 3/10/2016 is hereby CANCELLED upon agreement of the parties and the Court. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 2/24/2016. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 719 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Perry W. Miles IV on behalf of Ford Motor Company. Local counsel: Bradley J. Schmalzer. Fee $50.00. Receipt # 0425-4411564. (Schmalzer, Bradley)
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 718 DISCOVERY CONFERENCE held by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 2/17/2016; Court Reporter: Cathy Schutte-Stant. (mkw)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 717 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Michael Jaffe on behalf of Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Inez A. Patton, David H. Patton, ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Michael Antramgarza, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Charles Johnson, Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, John McGee, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Quintin Williams, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207. Local counsel: Niall A. Paul. Fee $50.00. Receipt # 0425-4385320. (Paul, Niall)
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 716 NOTICE OF F.R.C.P. 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams of corporate representative of Holman Ford on February 11, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. (EST) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1)(Paul, Niall)
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 715 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT for pro se and non-electronic filers re #714 TRANSCRIPT OF Motion Hearing and Discovery Conference held on February 2, 2016, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Terry Ruffner, Telephone number 304-528-7583 (klc)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 714 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Motion Hearing and Discovery Conference held on February 2, 2016, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Terry Ruffner, Telephone number 304-528-7583. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 2/16/2016. Redaction Request due 2/25/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/7/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/4/2016. (tmr)
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 713 DISCOVERY CONFERENCE held by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 2/2/2016; Court Reporter: Terry Ruffner. (mkw)
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 712 MOTION HEARING held by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 2/2/2016 re: #700 MOTION by Plaintiffs to Compel Ford to Produce Documents Listed in Ford's ASO Privilege Log; Court Reporter: Terry Ruffner. (mkw)
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 711 ORDER directing that a hearing on Plaintiffs' #700 MOTION to Compel Ford to Produce Documents Listed in Ford's ASO Privilege Log is set for 2/2/2016 at 2:00 PM in Huntington before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert; the discovery conference will begin immediately upon conclusion of the motion hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 1/27/2016. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (jsa)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 710 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena to Continental Automotive Systems, Inc., A Division of German Continental AG)(Atkinson, Nathan)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 709 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena to Robert Bosch, LLC)(Atkinson, Nathan)
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 708 REPLY by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams to #703 Response In Opposition. (Paul, Niall)
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 707 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT for pro se and non-electronic filers re #706 TRANSCRIPT OF Case Management Conference held on January 13, 2016, before Judge Robert C. Chambers and Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Terry Ruffner, Telephone number 304-528-7583. (klc)
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 706 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Case Management Conference held on January 13, 2016, before Judge Robert C. Chambers and Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Terry Ruffner, Telephone number 304-528-7583. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 1/29/2016. Redaction Request due 2/9/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/19/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/18/2016. (tmr) (Modified docket text on 1/19/2016) (klc).
January 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 705 NOTICE of Filing of Fifth Supplemental Response to Subpoena Duces Tecum by Progressive Casualty Insurance Company (Stevens, Michael)
January 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 704 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE held by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 1/13/2016; Court Reporter: Teresa Ruffner. (trj)
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 703 RESPONSE by Ford Motor Company in opposition to #700 MOTION by Plaintiffs to Compel Ford to Produce Documents Listed in Ford's ASO Privilege Log (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Bonasso, Michael)
December 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 702 ANSWER TO #686 Second Amended Master Consolidated Class Action Complaint with Jury Demand by Ford Motor Company.(Bonasso, Michael)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley: #698 MOTION by Plaintiffs to Seal Exhibit E and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel, #700 MOTION by Plaintiffs to Compel Ford to Produce Documents Listed in Ford's ASO Privilege Log. (mkw)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order MOTIONS NO LONGER REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley: #698 MOTION by Plaintiffs to Seal Exhibit E and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel, #700 MOTION by Plaintiffs to Compel Ford to Produce Documents Listed in Ford's ASO Privilege Log. (mkw)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert: #698 MOTION by Plaintiffs to Seal Exhibit E and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel, #700 MOTION by Plaintiffs to Compel Ford to Produce Documents Listed in Ford's ASO Privilege Log. (mkw)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 701 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams in support of #700 MOTION by Plaintiffs to Compel Ford to Produce Documents Listed in Ford's ASO Privilege Log (Paul, Niall)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 700 MOTION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Josh Legato, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams to Compel Ford to Produce Documents Listed in Ford's ASO Privilege Log (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Paul, Niall)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 699 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams in support of #698 MOTION by Plaintiffs to Seal (Paul, Niall)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 698 MOTION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams to Seal Exhibit E and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel Ford to Produce Documents Listed in Ford's ASO Privilege Log, #2 Exhibit E to Motion to Compel Ford to Produce Documents Listed in Ford's ASO Privilege Log)(Paul, Niall)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 697 NOTICE of Subpoena for Testimony by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1 Subpoena)(Paul, Niall)
December 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 696 ORDER directing that the January Case Management Conference is rescheduled for Wednesday, January 13, 2016, at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 12/18/2015. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 695 NOTICE of Filing of Fourth Supplemental Response of Progressive Casualty Insurance Company to Subpoena Duces Tecum by Progressive Casualty Insurance Company (Stevens, Michael)
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 694 ORDER directing that the discovery telephone conference currently scheduled on Wednesday, December 23, 2015, is rescheduled to Tuesday, December 22, 2015 at 3:00 p.m.; the discovery telephone conference currently scheduled on Wednesday, February 3, 2016, is rescheduled to Tuesday, February 2, 2016 at 3:00 p.m.; directing the parties to exchange agenda items by noon on the Friday preceding the conference via email, copying the undersigned's judicial assistant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 12/15/2015. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (jsa)
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 693 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT for pro se and non-electronic filers re #692 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Telephonic Motions Hearing held on December 9, 2015, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Lisa Cook, Telephone number 304-254-8053. (klc)
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 692 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Telephonic Motions Hearing held on December 9, 2015, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Lisa Cook, Telephone number 304-254-8053. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 12/24/2015. Redaction Request due 1/4/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/14/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/14/2016. (lac)
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 691 NOTICE of Filing of Third Supplemental Response of Progressive Casualty Insurance Company to Subpoena Duces Tecum by Progressive Casualty Insurance Company (Stevens, Michael)
December 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 690 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiffs' #684 MOTION for Clarification of the Court's November 24, 2015 Memorandum Opinion and Order, as more fully set forth herein. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 12/10/2015. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
December 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 689 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, Daniel Gallegos, John E. Grimaldi, Samuel Hairston, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Rhoda Jeffers, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, Timothy Matthews, Shane Mayfield, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, Jonathan Poma, Thomas Porter, Shelley Riley, William S. Troutman, Quintin Williams of Said Deep on December 16, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. (Paul, Niall)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 688 TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY CONFERENCE held by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 12/9/2015. (mkw)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 687 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Matthew M. Wawrzyn on behalf of Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Inez A. Patton, David H. Patton, ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Michael Antramgarza, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Charles Johnson, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, John McGee, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams, Jolene Harris, 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207. Local counsel: Niall A. Paul. Fee $50.00. Receipt # 0425-4275247. (Paul, Niall)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #685 Claim - Second Amended Master Consolidated Class Action Complaint. ERROR: Incorrect event selected. CORRECTION: Image removed and re-filed as a Complaint - Amended. (skh)
December 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 686 SECOND AMENDED MASTER CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT by Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, Charles Johnson, Daniel Gallegos, 3:13-cv-14207, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Quintin Williams, ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., John McGee, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, and Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207 against Ford Motor Company. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A) (skh)
December 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 685 INCORRECT ENTRY; SEE ENTRY #686. (Modified on 12/9/2015 to remove image and re-file it as entry #686) (skh).
December 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 684 MOTION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams for Clarification of the Court's November 24, 2015 #676 Memorandum Opinion and Order (Paul, Niall) (Modified on 12/8/2015 to add link to #676 order) (skh).
December 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 683 ORDER directing the parties to confer with each other on or before 12/21/2015 and to submit a joint memoranda to the Court on or before 12/29/2015, as more fully set forth herein; scheduling a Case Management Conference for 1/21/2016 at 1:30 PM in Huntington before Judge Robert C. Chambers; directing that the parties discuss amongst themselves what issues they believe need to be addressed at the Case Management Conference and that Plaintiffs' counsel submit a joint letter to the Court outlining the issues seven days prior to the Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 12/7/2015. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 682 NOTICE of Filing of Second Supplemental Response of Progressive Casualty Insurance Company to Subpoena Duces Tecum by Progressive Casualty Insurance Company (Stevens, Michael)
November 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 680 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT for pro se and non-electronic filers re #679 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Telephonic Status Conference held on 11/24/2015, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Catherine Schutte-Stant, Telephone number 304-347-3151. (klc)
November 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 679 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Telephonic Status Conference held on 11/24/2015, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Catherine Schutte-Stant, Telephone number 304-347-3151. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 12/7/2015. Redaction Request due 12/16/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/28/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/23/2016. (css)
November 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 681 TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY CONFERENCE held by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 11/24/2015. (mkw)
November 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 678 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT for pro se and non-electronic filers re #677 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Telephonic Discovery Conferece held on 11/13/2015, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Ayme Cochran, Telephone number 304-347-3128. (klc)
November 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 677 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Telephonic Discovery Conferece held on 11/13/2015, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Ayme Cochran, Telephone number 304-347-3128. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 12/4/2015. Redaction Request due 12/15/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/28/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/22/2016. (aac)
November 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 676 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting, in part, and denying, in part, Plaintiffs' #381 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Master Consolidated Class Action Complaint, as more fully set forth herein; the Court will permit Plaintiffs to file a Consolidated Complaint; however, Plaintiffs should edit the current version to be consistent with this Court's rulings; in addition to removing the proposed new Plaintiffs and any claims or facts related solely to those Plaintiffs, directing Plaintiffs to remove the specific claims set forth herein; directing Plaintiffs to correct the drafting error in Count 71 in the revised Consolidated Complaint, consistent with this Memorandum Opinion and Order; directing the revised Consolidated Complaint be filed within fourteen (14) days of today. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 11/24/2015. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 675 SECOND NOTICE FOR DEPOSITION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 30(b)(6) by All Plaintiffs to depose a corporate representative of Defendant Ford Motor Company on a date and time to be agreed upon by the parties (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Schedule A)(Paul, Niall) (Modified text on 11/23/2015 for clarity and to add deponent)(taq).
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 674 NOTICE of Filing of First Supplemental Response of Progressive Casualty Insurance Company to Subpoena Duces Tecum by Progressive Casualty Insurance Company (Stevens, Michael)
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 673 SUR-REPLY by Defendant Ford Motor Company to #665 CORRECTED SUPPLEMENTAL STATEMENT REGARDING FORD'S SOURCE CODE PRODUCTION. (jsa)
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 672 ORDER granting Defendant's #669 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Plaintiffs' Response to Ford's Objections to the Scope of Production of Source and Source Code Related Materials. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 11/16/2015. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (jsa)
November 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 671 ORDER canceling the Case Management Conference currently scheduled for 11/19/2015; the Court will reset the Conference approximately two weeks after the Court issues its decision on the Plaintiffs' #94 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Master Consolidated Complaint. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 11/13/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (mkw)
November 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 670 TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY CONFERENCE held by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 11/13/2015. (mkw)
November 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 669 MOTION by Ford Motor Company for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Plaintiffs' Response to Ford's Objections to the Scope of Production of Source and Source Code Related Materials, with proposed document attached (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Schmalzer, Bradley)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 668 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION by John H. Gomez requesting removal from the Court's service list on behalf of Plaintiffs. (skh)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 667 ORDER defendant incorrectly filed a working copy of the #664 Supplemental Statement Regarding Ford's Source Code Production. Defendant has subsequently filed a #665 Corrected Supplemental Statement Regarding Ford's Source Code Production. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to delete ECF No. 664. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 11/9/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (skh)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 666 RESPONSE by All Plaintiffs to #665 Corrected Supplemental Statement Regarding Ford's Source Code Production (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A - An Electronic Cause for Sudden Unintended Acceleration)(Atkinson, Nathan) (Modified on 11/9/2015 to add all plaintiffs as filers)(skh).
November 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 665 CORRECTED SUPPLEMENTAL STATEMENT REGARDING FORD'S SOURCE CODE PRODUCTION by Ford Motor Company to #659 Corrected Statement Regarding the Proper Scope of Ford's Production of Source Code and Source Code-Related Materials (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Bonasso, Michael)
November 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 664 INCORRECT ENTRY; SEE ENTRY #665. (Modified on 11/9/2015 to remove image as directed in the #667 Order entered 11/9/2015)(skh).
November 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 663 NOTICE of Filing of Response of Progressive Casualty Insurance Company to Subpoena Duces Tecum by Progressive Casualty Insurance Company (Stevens, Michael)
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 662 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying in part and granting in part Defendant Ford's #634 objections to the July 8 and September 11, 2015 Magistrate Judge's Orders, as more fully set forth herein; denying as moot Defendant Ford's #633 MOTION to Stay Magistrate Judge's Orders pending resolution of its objections. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 11/5/2015. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
November 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 661 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT for pro se and non-electronic filers re #660 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Telephonic Status Conference held on 10/14/2015, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Ayme Cochran, Telephone number 304-347-3128. (klc)
November 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 660 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Telephonic Status Conference held on 10/14/2015, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Ayme Cochran, Telephone number 304-347-3128. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 11/12/2015. Redaction Request due 11/23/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/3/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/1/2016. (aac)
November 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 659 CORRECTED STATEMENT REGARDING THE PROPER SCOPE OF FORD'S PRODUCTION OF SOURCE CODE AND SOURCE CODE-RELATED MATERIALS by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams (Paul, Niall)
November 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 658 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT for pro se and non-electronic filers re #657 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Telephonic Status Conference held on 10/28/2015, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Catherine Schutte-Stant, Telephone number 304-347-3151. (klc)
November 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 657 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Telephonic Status Conference held on 10/28/2015, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Catherine Schutte-Stant, Telephone number 304-347-3151. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 11/12/2015. Redaction Request due 11/23/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/3/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/1/2016. (css)
November 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 656 STATEMENT REGARDING THE PROPER SCOPE OF FORD'S PRODUCTION OF SOURCE CODE AND SOURCE CODE-RELATED MATERIALS by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams (Paul, Niall) (Modified on 11/2/2015 to convert event to response to court order) (skh).
November 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 655 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION by L. Lee Javins, II updating his firm name on behalf of ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams. (Javins, L.)
October 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 654 ORDER directing the parties to file a Status Report by 11/4/2015 regarding the word-search document collection process referenced in the #577 Letter, as more fully set forth herein. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 10/29/2015. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
October 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 653 ORDER scheduling telephonic discovery conferences from 3:00 PM to 4:30 PM on 11/9/2015; 11/25/2015; 12/9/2015; 12/23/2015; 1/6/2016; 1/20/2016; 2/3/2016; and 2/17/2016; directing the parties to exchange agenda items by noon on the Monday preceding each conference via email, copying Magistrate Judge Eifert's judicial assistant as instructed herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 10/29/2015. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (jsa)
October 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 652 TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY CONFERENCE held by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 10/28/2015. (mkw)
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 651 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying Ford Motor Company's #642 APPEAL OF/ OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION TO DISTRICT COURT. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 10/26/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (mkw)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 650 REPLY by Ford Motor Company to #646 Response In Opposition. (Bonasso, Michael)
October 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 649 TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY CONFERENCE held by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 10/14/2015. (mkw)
October 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 648 REPLY by Ford Motor Company to #645 Opposition to Objections to Magistrate Judge Decision. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Bonasso, Michael)
October 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 647 MEMORANDUM by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams in opposition to #633 MOTION by Ford Motor Company to Stay Magistrate Judge's #563 Memorandum Opinion and Order and #620 Order (Paul, Niall)
October 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 646 OPPOSITION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams to #634 Appeal of or Objections to Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court (Paul, Niall)
October 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 645 OPPOSITION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, William S. Troutman, 3:13-cv-20976, Quintin Williams to Ford Motor Company's #642 Appeal of or Objections to Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Atkinson, Nathan)
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 644 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT for pro se and non-electronic filers re #643 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of telephone status conference held on September 21, 2015, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Mary Schweinhagen, Telephone number 304-347-3188. (klc)
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 643 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of telephone status conference held on September 21, 2015, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Mary Schweinhagen, Telephone number 304-347-3188. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 10/16/2015. Redaction Request due 10/26/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/5/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/4/2016. (mas)
October 3, 2015 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #641 Objections to #627 Order. ERROR: Incorrect event selected. CORRECTION: Image removed and re-filed using the event Appeal Of Or Objections To Magistrate Judge Decision To District Court, entry #642. (skh)
October 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 642 APPEAL OF / OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION TO DISTRICT COURT by Ford Motor Company re: #627 Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit B-1, #4 Exhibit B-2, #5 Exhibit B-3, #6 Exhibit B-4, #7 Exhibit B-5, #8 Exhibit B-6, #9 Exhibit B-6a, #10 Exhibit B-7, #11 Exhibit B-8, #12 Exhibit C, #13 Exhibit D, #14 Exhibit D-1, #15 Exhibit D-2, #16 Exhibit E, #17 Exhibit F) (skh)
October 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 641 INCORRECT ENTRY; SEE ENTRY #642. (Modified on 10/3/2015 to remove image and re-file it as entry #642) (skh).
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 640 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT for pro se and non-electronic filers re #639 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Telephone status conference held on Spetember 16, 2015, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Mary Schweinhagen, Telephone number 304-347-3188. (klc)
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 639 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Telephone status conference held on Spetember 16, 2015, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Mary Schweinhagen, Telephone number 304-347-3188. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 10/13/2015. Redaction Request due 10/21/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/2/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/29/2015. (mas)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 638 ORDER granting #628 MOTION for Voluntary Dismissal of Plaintiffs Mills Allison, Tony Burnett, Jolene Harris, Josh Legato, Roofwerks, Inc., and George Shaffer; directing that Plaintiffs Mills Allison, Tony Burnett, Jolene Harris, Josh Legato, Roofwerks, Inc., and George Shaffer be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 9/29/2015. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa) (Modified on 9/29/2015 to correct the judge's signature in text to Judge Robert C. Chambers) (mkw).
September 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 637 RESPONSE by Ford Motor Company to #628 MOTION by Mills Allison, Tony Burnett, 3:13-cv-14207, Jolene Harris, 3:13-cv-20976, Josh Legato, Roofwerks, Inc., George Shaffer, 3:13-cv-14207 for Voluntary Dismissal (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Schmalzer, Bradley)
September 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 636 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT for pro se and non-electronic filers re #635 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Case Management Conference held on Spetember 25, 2015, before Judge Robert C. Chambers and Magistrate Judge Cheryl Eifert. Court Reporter Mary Schweinhagen, Telephone number 304-347-3188. (klc)
September 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 635 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Case Management Conference held on Spetember 25, 2015, before Judge Robert C. Chambers and Magistrate Judge Cheryl Eifert. Court Reporter Mary Schweinhagen, Telephone number 304-347-3188. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 10/8/2015. Redaction Request due 10/19/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/29/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/28/2015. (mas) (Main Document 635 replaced on 9/28/2015 with corrected image.) (klc)
September 28, 2015 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #635 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Case Management Conference held on Spetember 25, 2015, before Judge Robert C. Chambers and Magistrate Judge Cheryl Eifert. Court Reporter Mary Schweinhagen, Telephone number 304-347-3188. ERROR: Case information incorrect on page 1. CORRECTION: Removed incorrect image and replaced with corrected image. (klc)
September 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 634 APPEAL OF / OBJECTION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION TO DISTRICT COURT by Ford Motor Company re: #563 Memorandum Opinion and Order and #620 Order. (skh)
September 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 633 MOTION by Ford Motor Company to Stay Magistrate Judge's #563 Memorandum Opinion and Order and #620 Order (Schmalzer, Bradley)
September 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 632 INCORRECT ENTRY; SEE ENTRY #634. (Modified on 9/25/2015 to remove image and re-file it as entry #634) (skh).
September 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 631 ORDER upon Case Management Conference held 9/25/2015; directing Defendant Ford Motor Company to file a Response on or before 9/30/2015 to Plaintiffs' #628 Motion for Voluntary Dismissal; further directing Defendant to file any objections it has to the 9/22/2015 #627 Order entered by Magistrate Judge Eifert on or before 10/2/2015. Plaintiffs must file their Response within five calendar days of the date the objections are filed. Thereafter, Defendant must file its Reply within three calendar days of the date the Response is filed. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 9/25/2015. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
September 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 630 PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING SOURCE CODE. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 9/25/2015. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
September 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 629 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE held by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 9/25/2015; Court Reporter: Mary Schweinhagen. (trj)
September 25, 2015 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #632 Objections to #563 Memorandum Opinion and Order and #620 Order by Ford Motor Company. ERROR: Incorrect event selected. CORRECTION: Image removed and re-filed using the event Appeal Of Or Objections To Magistrate Judge Decision To District Court, entry #634 . (skh)
September 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 628 MOTION by Mills Allison, Tony Burnett, 3:13-cv-14207, Jolene Harris, 3:13-cv-20976, Josh Legato, Roofwerks, Inc., George Shaffer, 3:13-cv-14207 for Voluntary Dismissal of their claims against Ford Motor Company (Paul, Niall) (Modified on 9/23/2015 to correct party filers) (skh).
September 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 627 ORDER upon telephonic discovery conference held 9/21/2015; directing that Plaintiffs are authorized to conduct depositions of certain individuals as more fully set forth herein; that Ford shall conduct a search, collection, and production of certain custodial files as more fully set forth herein; that certain discovery requests are held in abeyance as more fully set forth herein; that certain discovery will not be permitted as more fully set forth herein; that certain discovery requests are moot as more fully set forth herein; and that certain requests regarding computer workstations are granted as more fully set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 9/22/2015. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (jsa)
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 626 TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY CONFERENCE held by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 9/21/2015. (mkw)
September 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 625 NOTICE of Subpoena for Testimony and for Production of Documents by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Robert Agris, 3:13-cv-14207, Mills Allison, Michael Antramgarza, Charles T. Burd, 3:13-cv-20976, Tony Burnett, 3:13-cv-14207, John E. Grimaldi, 3:13-cv-14207, Samuel Hairston, 3:13-cv-14207, Jolene Harris, 3:13-cv-20976, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., 3:13-cv-20976, Rhoda Jeffers, 3:13-cv-14207, Charles Johnson, Josh Legato, Andrea Martin, 3:13-cv-20976, Timothy Matthews, 3:13-cv-14207, Shane Mayfield, 3:13-cv-20976, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Mary Phippen, 3:13-cv-14207, Jonathan Poma, 3:13-cv-14207, Thomas Porter, 3:13-cv-20976, Shelley Riley, 3:13-cv-14207, Roofwerks, Inc., George Shaffer, 3:13-cv-14207, Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Niall)
September 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 624 TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY CONFERENCE held by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 9/16/2015. (mkw)
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 623 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER the Court GRANTS, IN PART, DENIES, IN PART, and HOLD IN ABEYANCE, IN PART #381 MOTION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Mills Allison, Michael Antramgarza, Charles Johnson, Josh Legato, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Roofwerks, Inc., Quintin Williams for Leave to File First Amended Master Consolidated Class Action Complaint. The Court GRANTS Plaintiffs' motion to consolidate Civil Actions 3:13-6529, 3:13-14207, and 3:13-20976 into a single action and to file a Consolidated Complaint, and GRANTS Plaintiffs' motion to include in the Consolidated Complaint additional facts, revived claims, or new claims for any existing Plaintiffs. The Court DENIES the addition of new Plaintiffs and any claims or facts related solely to those proposed Plaintiffs. The Court further DENIES WITHOUT PREJUDICE the removal of any existing Plaintiffs at this time. If after consideration of this Memorandum Opinion and Order, any existing Plaintiff wants to be dismissed from this action, then that Plaintiff must file a motion pursuant to Rule 41 on or before 9/23/2015. Ford must file any objection on or before 9/28. A reply shall be due on or before 9/30/2015. After the Court issues a Memorandum Opinion and Order on the remaining individual claims and any Orders of dismissal under Rule 41, the Court will direct Plaintiffs to file a revised Consolidated Complaint consistent with the Court's decisions. Plaintiffs need not revise the proposed Consolidated Complaint until further notice by the Court. However, the parties shall proceed under the proposed Consolidated Complaint to the extent it is consistent with this Opinion. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of this Court to consolidate these three actions, and the Court DESIGNATES Civil Action No. 3:13-6529 as the lead case. No new Plaintiffs should be added to the Style or docket of the Court and all existing Plaintiffs should be included or added to the lead case. The Court DIRECTS that the Consolidated for Discovery Only flag be removed and all existing Plaintiffs in Civil Action Nos. 3:13-14207 and 3:13-20976 be designated as a Consolidated Plaintiff. Hereafter, all filings shall be made only in Civil Action No. 3:13-6529, including any motions pursuant to Rule 41 that Plaintiffs may file. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 9/15/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (skh)
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order LEAD CASE: THIS CASE HAS BEEN CONSOLIDATED WITH 3:13-cv-14207 AND 3:13-cv-20976 PURSUANT TO THE #623 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER ENTERED 09/15/2015. ALL FURTHER ENTRIES SHALL BE DOCKETED HEREIN. (skh)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 622 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ford Motor Company for Defendant Ford Motor Company's Second Supplemental Responses to Nos. 1-4, 6-7 and 39-46 of Plaintiffs' Fourth Set of Request for Production of Documents (Schmalzer, Bradley)
September 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 621 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiffs' #537 MOTION to Sanction Ford Motor Company Regarding Engle Documents as more fully set forth herein; directing Defendant to supply the privilege log within twenty (20) days of the date of this Order; directing that Plaintiffs shall have through and including 9/25/2015 in which to file an affidavit of reasonable fees and costs incurred in making and arguing their motion; Defendant shall file a response within 14 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 9/11/2015. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (jsa)
September 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 620 ORDER denying Defendant's #577 MOTION for Reconsideration of July 8, 2015 Memorandum Opinion and Order Requiring Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition. Within seven (7) days of the date of this Order, Ford Motor Company shall provide Plaintiffs with convenient dates for the taking of a 30(b)(6) deposition as set forth in the 7/8/2015 Order; completion of the deposition to occur no later than 10/14/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 9/11/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (jsa)
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 619 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Mills Allison, Michael Antramgarza, Charles Johnson, Josh Legato, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Roofwerks, Inc., Quintin Williams of F.R.C.P. 30(b)(6) Corporate Representative Deposition of Defendant Ford Motor Company of Topic 78 on September 16, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Atkinson, Nathan)
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 618 NOTICE TO TAKE VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Mills Allison, Michael Antramgarza, Charles Johnson, Josh Legato, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Roofwerks, Inc., Quintin Williams of Raymond Nevi on September 17, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. (Atkinson, Nathan)
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 617 AMENDED NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Mills Allison, Michael Antramgarza, Charles Johnson, Josh Legato, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Roofwerks, Inc., Quintin Williams of F.R.C.P. 30(b)(6) Corporate Representative Deposition of Defendant Ford Motor Company of Topics 15 and 27 on September 18, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Atkinson, Nathan)
September 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 616 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Ford Motor Company of Christine Salamone on September 17, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. CDT (Schmalzer, Bradley)
September 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 615 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ford Motor Company for Defendant Ford Motor Company's Amended Response to Request No. 30 of Plaintiffs' Third Set of Requests for Admission (Schmalzer, Bradley)
September 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 614 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ford Motor Company for Ford Motor Company's Amended Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Admissions (Schmalzer, Bradley)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 613 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Mills Allison, Michael Antramgarza, Charles Johnson, Josh Legato, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Roofwerks, Inc., Quintin Williams of F.R.C.P. 30(b)(6) Corporate Representative Deposition of Defendant Ford Motor Company of Topic 15 on September 18, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Atkinson, Nathan)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 612 EXHIBIT C by Ford Motor Company in support of #551 Response In Opposition. (Schmalzer, Bradley)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 611 EXHIBIT A by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Mills Allison, Michael Antramgarza, Charles Johnson, Josh Legato, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Roofwerks, Inc., Quintin Williams in support of Plaintiffs' Reply to Ford's Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Second Motion to Challenge Confidential Designation and to Compel. (mkw)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 610 EXHIBIT B by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Mills Allison, Michael Antramgarza, Charles Johnson, Josh Legato, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Roofwerks, Inc., Quintin Williams in support of #377 SECOND MOTION by Plaintiffs to Challenge Confidential DesignationMOTION by Plaintiffs to Compel. (mkw)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 609 SEALED EXHIBIT A filed by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Mills Allison, Michael Antramgarza, Charles Johnson, Josh Legato, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Roofwerks, Inc., Quintin Williams pursuant to Court Order. Exhibit in support of Plaintiffs' #377 Second Motion to Challenge Confidential Designation and to Compel. (mkw)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 608 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT for pro se and non-electronic filers re #607 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Telephonic Motions Hearing held on September 2, 2015, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Lisa Cook, Telephone number 304-254-8053. (klc)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 607 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Telephonic Motions Hearing held on September 2, 2015, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Lisa Cook, Telephone number 304-254-8053. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 9/14/2015. Redaction Request due 9/24/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/5/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/2/2015. (lac)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 606 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiffs' #375 MOTION to Seal Exhibits A and B to Plaintiffs' Second Motion to Challenge Confidential Designation and to Compel and denying Plaintiffs' #482 MOTION to Seal Exhibit 1 to Plaintiffs' Reply to Ford's Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Second Motion to Challenge Confidential Designation and to Compel; directing the Clerk to seal ECF No. 375-1 (Exhibit A) and to unseal ECF Nos. 375 (Motion) and 375-2 (Exhibit B), unseal ECF Nos. 482 (Motion) and 482-1 (Exhibit A) as neither qualifies as confidential or privileged. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 9/3/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (mkw)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 605 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiffs' #377 Second MOTION to Challenge Confidential Designation and to Compel; directing that the pages more fully set forth herein shall be de-designated as privileged; and the pages more fully set forth herein shall be designated as privileged and may be clawed back by Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 9/3/2015. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (jsa)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 604 TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY CONFERENCE held by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 9/2/2015. (mkw)
September 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 603 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Ford Motor Company of Gabriel Kletschka on September 14, 2015 at 12:00 p.m. CT (Schmalzer, Bradley)
September 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 602 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Ford Motor Company of Laura Elsinger on September 14, 2015 at 5:15 p.m. CT (Schmalzer, Bradley)
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 601 NOTICE TO TAKE VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Mills Allison, Michael Antramgarza, Charles Johnson, Josh Legato, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Roofwerks, Inc., Quintin Williams of Kim Palczynski on September 3, 2015 at immediately following the deposition of Advantage Technical Resourcing, Inc. (Atkinson, Nathan)
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 600 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Mills Allison, Michael Antramgarza, Charles Johnson, Josh Legato, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Roofwerks, Inc., Quintin Williams of F.R.C.P. 30(b)(6) Corporate Representative Deposition of Advantage Technical Resourcing, Inc. on September 3, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1)(Atkinson, Nathan)
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 599 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ford Motor Company for Ford Motor Company's Supplemental Responses to Fourth Set of Requests for Production of Documents (Schmalzer, Bradley)
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 598 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #536 MOTION to Compel, to the extent that it requests the Court to order Ford to provide a more detailed ASO privilege log; directing Ford to revise and supplement its privilege log in accordance with this opinion and Rule 26(b)(5)(A); denying Plaintiffs' request for Sanctions under Rule 37(b)(2); denying the request to find a waiver of the privilege by Ford and to compel production of the withheld documents; granting an award of reasonable expenses incurred in bringing the instant Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 8/28/2015. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (jsa)
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 597 ORDER directing that the Case Management Conference currently scheduled for 9/10/2015 will now be held on 9/25/2015 at 10:00 a.m.; the parties will discuss amongst themselves what issues they believe need to be addressed at the Case Management Conference; Plaintiffs counsel will submit a joint letter to the Court outlining the issues seven days prior to the Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 8/28/2015. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 596 REPLY by Ford Motor Company to #587 Response In Opposition. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Bonasso, Michael)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 595 NOTICE TO TAKE VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Mills Allison, Michael Antramgarza, Charles Johnson, Josh Legato, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Roofwerks, Inc., Quintin Williams of Eric Luehrsen on September 2, 2015 at 8:30 a.m. (Atkinson, Nathan)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 594 NOTICE TO TAKE VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Mills Allison, Michael Antramgarza, Charles Johnson, Josh Legato, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Roofwerks, Inc., Quintin Williams of Thomas Dressing on September 1, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. (Atkinson, Nathan)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 593 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT for pro se and non-electronic filers re #591 TRANSCRIPT of motion hearing held on August 18, 2015, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Mary Schweinhagen, Telephone number 304-347-3188. (klc)
August 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 592 NOTICE of Subpoena and Deposition Duces Tecum of Aaron Schweizerhof by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Mills Allison, Michael Antramgarza, Charles Johnson, Josh Legato, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Roofwerks, Inc., Quintin Williams (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1)(Atkinson, Nathan)
August 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 591 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of motion hearing held on August 18, 2015, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Mary Schweinhagen, Telephone number 304-347-3188. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 9/4/2015. Redaction Request due 9/15/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/25/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/23/2015. (mas)
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 590 MOTION HEARING held by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 8/18/2015; Court Reporter: Mary Schweinhagen. (mkw)
August 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 589 AFFIDAVIT of James Engle, dated 8/13/2015, filed on behalf of Ford Motor Company re: #537 MOTION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Mills Allison, Michael Antramgarza, Charles Johnson, Josh Legato, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Roofwerks, Inc., Quintin Williams to Sanction Ford Motor Company Regarding Engle Documents (Schmalzer, Bradley)
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 588 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Donald H. Slavik on behalf of Josh Legato, ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Michael Antramgarza, Mills Allison, Roofwerks, Inc., Charles Johnson, John McGee, Quintin Williams. Local counsel: Niall A. Paul. Fee $50.00. Receipt # 0425-4067978. (Paul, Niall)
August 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 587 RESPONSE by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Mills Allison, Michael Antramgarza, Charles Johnson, Josh Legato, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Roofwerks, Inc., Quintin Williams in opposition to #577 MOTION by Ford Motor Company for Reconsideration of July 8, 2015 #563 Memorandum Opinion and Order Requiring Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Atkinson, Nathan)
August 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 586 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT for pro se and non-electronic filers re #585 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Telephonic Motions Hearing held on August 5, 2015, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Lisa Cook, Telephone number 304-254-8053. (klc)
August 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 585 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Telephonic Motions Hearing held on August 5, 2015, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Lisa Cook, Telephone number 304-254-8053. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 8/17/2015. Redaction Request due 8/28/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/8/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/5/2015. (lac)
August 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 584 TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY CONFERENCE held by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 8/5/2015. (mkw)
July 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 583 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT for pro se and non-electronic filers re #582 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Telephonic Motions Hearing held on July 22, 2015, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Lisa Cook, Telephone number 304-254-8053. (klc)
July 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 582 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Telephonic Motions Hearing held on July 22, 2015, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Lisa Cook, Telephone number 304-254-8053. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 8/10/2015. Redaction Request due 8/19/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/31/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/27/2015. (lac)
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 581 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Mills Allison, Michael Antramgarza, Charles Johnson, Josh Legato, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Roofwerks, Inc., Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Atkinson, Nathan)
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 580 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Mills Allison, Michael Antramgarza, Charles Johnson, Josh Legato, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Roofwerks, Inc., Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Atkinson, Nathan)
July 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 579 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT for pro se and non-electronic filers re #575 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of telephonic status conference held on July 8, 2015, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Mary Schweinhagen, Telephone number 304-347-3188. (klc)
July 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 578 ORDER Motion Hearing set for 8/18/2015 at 09:00 AM in Huntington before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert re: Plaintiffs' #377 SECOND MOTION to Challenge Confidential Designation and to Compel, #536 MOTION to Compel Defendant Ford Motor Company to Produce Documents Listed in its Supplemental ASO Privilege Log and for Sanctions and #537 Motion to Sanction Ford Motor Company Regarding Engle Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 7/23/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (skm)
July 22, 2015 Opinion or Order MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert: #577 MOTION by Ford Motor Company for Reconsideration of July 8, 2015 #563 Memorandum Opinion and Order Requiring Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition (skh)
July 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 577 MOTION by Ford Motor Company for Reconsideration of July 8, 2015 #563 Memorandum Opinion and Order Requiring Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit B)(Schmalzer, Bradley)
July 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 576 TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY CONFERENCE held by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 7/22/2015. (mkw)
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 575 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of telephonic status conference held on July 8, 2015, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Mary Schweinhagen, Telephone number 304-347-3188. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 7/31/2015. Redaction Request due 8/11/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/21/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/19/2015. (mas)
July 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 574 NOTICE OF FILING OF EXHIBIT 3 to #537 MOTION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Mills Allison, Michael Antramgarza, Charles Johnson, Josh Legato, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Roofwerks, Inc., Quintin Williams to Sanction Ford Motor Company Regarding Engle Documents by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Mills Allison, Michael Antramgarza, Charles Johnson, Josh Legato, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Roofwerks, Inc., Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Atkinson, Nathan)
July 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 573 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT for pro se and non-electronic filers re #571 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of telephone discovery conference held on June 24, 2015, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Mary Schweinhagen, Telephone number 304-347-3188 (klc)
July 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 572 NOTICE of Subpoena and Deposition Duces Tecum of Martin Davenport by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Mills Allison, Michael Antramgarza, Charles Johnson, Josh Legato, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Roofwerks, Inc., Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Atkinson, Nathan)
July 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 571 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of telephone discovery conference held on June 24, 2015, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Mary Schweinhagen, Telephone number 304-347-3188. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 7/27/2015. Redaction Request due 8/5/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/17/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/13/2015. (mas)
July 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 570 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS of the law firm of McGuire Woods LLP, counsel for Defendant Ford Motor Company (Schmalzer, Bradley)
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 569 REPLY by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Mills Allison, Michael Antramgarza, Charles Johnson, Josh Legato, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Roofwerks, Inc., Quintin Williams to #551 Response In Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Deposition Testimony, #2 Exhibit 2 - Deposition Testimony)(Paul, Niall)
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 568 REPLY by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Mills Allison, Michael Antramgarza, Charles Johnson, Josh Legato, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Roofwerks, Inc., Quintin Williams to #555 Response In Opposition. (Paul, Niall)
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 565 ORDER: Scheduling telephonic conferences as follows: 7/22/2015 at 03:00 PM, 8/5/2015 at 03:00 PM, 8/19/2015 at 03:00 PM, 9/2/2015 at 03:00 PM, 9/16/2015 at 03:00 PM, 9/30/2015 at 03:00 PM, 10/14/2015 03:00 PM, and 10/28/2015 at 03:00 PM. Parties are directed to exchange agenda items by noon on the Monday preceding each conference as directed herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 7/9/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (cbo) Modified text on 7/9/2015 to correct typographical error (cbo).
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: 566 Exhibits in Support. Error: Incorrect event selected. Correction: Refiled using the correct event. (mkw)
July 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 567 SEALED EXHIBITS filed by Plaintiffs pursuant to Court Order. EXHIBITS in support of #476 MOTION by Plaintiffs for Reconsideration of the Court's 2/10/2015 Decision on the Record Permitting Defendant's Self-Selected Searches for Responsive Documents. (mkw) (Additional attachments added on 7/9/2015: #1 Exhibit 11, #2 Exhibit 12, #3 Exhibit 13) (mkw).
July 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 566 INCORRECT ENTRY; SEE ENTRY #567 (mkw) (Modified on 7/9/2015 to detach images and file as entry #567) (mkw).
July 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 564 TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY CONFERENCE held by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 7/8/2015; Court Reporter: Mary Schweinhagen. (skm)
July 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 563 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying Ford Motor Company's #438 MOTION to Quash; granting in part and denying in part Ford Motor Company's #438 MOTION for Protective Order; granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's' #476 MOTION for Reconsideration, as more fully set forth herein; granting Plaintiffs' #485 MOTION to Seal confidential documents attached as exhibits to Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 7/8/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (skm) (Modified on 7/9/2015 to add ruling on the #485 motion in text) (mkw).
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 562 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT for pro se and non-electronic filers re #561 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Case Management Conference held on June 29, 2015, before Judge Robert C. Chambers. Court Reporter Terry Ruffner, Telephone number 304-528-7583. (klc)
July 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 561 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Case Management Conference held on June 29, 2015, before Judge Robert C. Chambers. Court Reporter Terry Ruffner, Telephone number 304-528-7583. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 7/13/2015. Redaction Request due 7/23/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/3/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/30/2015. (tmr)
July 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 560 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #558 MOTION for Leave to Withdraw Appearance of Maja Lukic as one of the Counsel of Record for Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 7/1/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (skm)
June 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 559 SCIENCE DAY held by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 6/30/2015; Court Reporter: not reported. (trj)
June 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 558 MOTION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Mills Allison, Michael Antramgarza, Charles Johnson, Josh Legato, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Roofwerks, Inc., Quintin Williams to Withdraw Appearance of Maja Lukic as one of the Counsel of Record for Plaintiffs (Paul, Niall)
June 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 557 NOTICE TO TAKE CONTINUED DEPOSITIONS UNDER F.R.C.P. 30(b)(6) by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Mills Allison, Michael Antramgarza, Charles Johnson, Josh Legato, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Roofwerks, Inc., Quintin Williams of Mark Tuneff and James Engle on July 7, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. and 1:45 p.m. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Schedule A)(Paul, Niall)
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 556 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Ford Motor Company of Dean Richardson on July 15, 2015 at 9:30 am EDT (Schmalzer, Bradley)
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 555 RESPONSE by Ford Motor Company in opposition to #537 MOTION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Mills Allison, Michael Antramgarza, Charles Johnson, Josh Legato, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Roofwerks, Inc., Quintin Williams to Sanction Ford Motor Company Regarding Engle Documents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q)(Schmalzer, Bradley)
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 554 ORDER rescheduling the September Case Management Conference until 9/10/2015 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 6/29/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (mkw)
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 553 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE held by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 6/29/2015; Court Reporter: Teresa Ruffner. (trj)
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 552 ORDER SUSPENDING the Expert Witness deadline set forth in paragraph 3 of the #235 Amended Scheduling Order and the Mediation deadline set forth in paragraph 7; the Court will reset these deadlines at a later time. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 6/29/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (mkw)
June 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 551 RESPONSE by Ford Motor Company in opposition to #536 MOTION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Mills Allison, Michael Antramgarza, Charles Johnson, Josh Legato, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Roofwerks, Inc., Quintin Williams to Compel Defendant Ford Motor Company to Produce Documents Listed in its Supplemental ASO Privilege Log and for Sanctions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Bonasso, Michael) (Modified on 6/25/2015 to add link to #536 motion) (skh).
June 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 550 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ford Motor Company for Ford Motor Company's Responses to Plaintiffs' Fifth Request for Production of Documents (Bonasso, Michael)
June 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 549 TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY CONFERENCE held by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 6/24/2015. (mkw)
June 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 548 REPLY by Ford Motor Company to #532 Reply to Response. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Schmalzer, Bradley)
June 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 547 SECOND AMENDED NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Mills Allison, Michael Antramgarza, Charles Johnson, Josh Legato, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Roofwerks, Inc., Quintin Williams of F.R.C.P. 30(b)(6) Corporate Representative Deposition of Defendant Ford Motor Company on June 25, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. (Atkinson, Nathan) (Modified on 6/23/2015 to add "second") (taq).
June 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 546 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT for pro se and non-electronic filers re #545 TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Motions Hearing held on June 10, 2015, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Lisa Cook, Telephone number 304-254-8053. (klc)
June 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 545 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Telephonic Motions Hearing held on June 10, 2015, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Lisa Cook, Telephone number 304-254-8053. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 6/25/2015. Redaction Request due 7/6/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/16/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/14/2015. (lac)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 544 REPLY by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Mills Allison, Michael Antramgarza, Charles Johnson, Josh Legato, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Roofwerks, Inc., Quintin Williams to #529 Response In Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Atkinson, Nathan)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 543 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION AND ORDER The Court Orders that Ford must provide the ETC source code in read-only format and need not provide Plaintiffs with write access to the ETC source code; parties are Ordered to meet and confer regarding the remaining terms of the special protective order and shall tender an Agreed Order Governing Disclosure of Ford's Source Code to the undersigned no later than 06/22/2015 as outlined within this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 6/12/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (skm)
June 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 542 ORDER denying Plaintiffs' #447 Objections to Magistrate Judge's Opinion and Order Issued on 4/14/2015. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 6/11/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mkw)
June 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 541 AMENDED NOTICE of Subpoena and Deposition Duces Tecum of Advantage Technical Resourcing, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 45 and 30(b)(6) by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Mills Allison, Michael Antramgarza, Charles Johnson, Josh Legato, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Roofwerks, Inc., Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Atkinson, Nathan)
June 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 540 NOTICE of Subpoena for Deposition of Kim Palczynski by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Mills Allison, Michael Antramgarza, Charles Johnson, Josh Legato, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Roofwerks, Inc., Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Atkinson, Nathan)
June 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 539 TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY CONFERENCE held by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 6/10/2015. (mkw)
June 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 538 MEMORANDUM by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Mills Allison, Michael Antramgarza, Charles Johnson, Josh Legato, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Roofwerks, Inc., Quintin Williams in support of #537 MOTION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Mills Allison, Michael Antramgarza, Charles Johnson, Josh Legato, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Roofwerks, Inc., Quintin Williams to Sanction Ford Motor Company Regarding Engle Documents (Atkinson, Nathan)
June 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 537 MOTION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Mills Allison, Michael Antramgarza, Charles Johnson, Josh Legato, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Roofwerks, Inc., Quintin Williams to Sanction Ford Motor Company Regarding Engle Documents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Atkinson, Nathan)
June 10, 2015 Opinion or Order MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert: #537 MOTION by Plaintiffs to Sanction Ford Motor Company Regarding Engle Documents (skh)
June 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 536 MOTION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Mills Allison, Michael Antramgarza, Charles Johnson, Josh Legato, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Roofwerks, Inc., Quintin Williams to Compel Defendant Ford Motor Company to Produce Documents Listed in its Supplemental ASO Privilege Log and for Sanctions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Paul, Niall).
June 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 535 NOTICE of Subpoena and Deposition Duces Tecum of Advantage Technical Resourcing, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 45 and 30(b)(6) by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Mills Allison, Michael Antramgarza, Charles Johnson, Josh Legato, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Roofwerks, Inc., Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Atkinson, Nathan)
June 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 534 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT for pro se and non-electronic filers re #531 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Hearing re: protective order held on May 28, 2015, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Mary Schweinhagen, Telephone number 304-347-3188. (klc)
June 9, 2015 Opinion or Order MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert: #536 MOTION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Mills Allison, Michael Antramgarza, Charles Johnson, Josh Legato, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Roofwerks, Inc., Quintin Williams to Compel Defendant Ford Motor Company to Produce Documents Listed in its Supplemental ASO Privilege Log and for Sanctions (skh)
June 8, 2015 Opinion or Order MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert: #533 MOTION by Plaintiffs for Leave to Reply to Ford Motor Company's June 3, 2015 Source Code Letter. (mkw)
June 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 533 MOTION by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Mills Allison, Michael Antramgarza, Charles Johnson, Josh Legato, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Roofwerks, Inc., Quintin Williams for Leave to Reply to Ford Motor Company's June 3, 2015 Source Code Letter (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Paul, Niall)
June 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 532 REPLY by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Mills Allison, Michael Antramgarza, Charles Johnson, Josh Legato, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Roofwerks, Inc., Quintin Williams to #452 Response In Opposition. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A - Allegations)(Paul, Niall)
June 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 531 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Hearing re. protective order held on May 28, 2015, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Mary Schweinhagen, Telephone number 304-347-3188. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 6/15/2015. Redaction Request due 6/26/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/6/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/3/2015. (mas)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 530 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying #437 MOTION for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 6/4/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (skm)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 529 RESPONSE by Ford Motor Company in opposition to #476 MOTION by Plaintiffs for Reconsideration of the Court's 2/10/2015 Decision on the Record Permitting Defendant's Self-Selected Searches for Responsive Documents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13)(Schmalzer, Bradley)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 528 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Mills Allison, Michael Antramgarza, Charles Johnson, Josh Legato, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Roofwerks, Inc., Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Niall)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 527 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Mills Allison, Michael Antramgarza, Charles Johnson, Josh Legato, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Roofwerks, Inc., Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Niall)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 526 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Mills Allison, Michael Antramgarza, Charles Johnson, Josh Legato, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Roofwerks, Inc., Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Niall)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 525 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Mills Allison, Michael Antramgarza, Charles Johnson, Josh Legato, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Roofwerks, Inc., Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Niall)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 524 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Mills Allison, Michael Antramgarza, Charles Johnson, Josh Legato, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Roofwerks, Inc., Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Niall)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 523 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Mills Allison, Michael Antramgarza, Charles Johnson, Josh Legato, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Roofwerks, Inc., Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Niall)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 522 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ford Motor Company for FORD MOTOR COMPANYS RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS THIRD SET OF REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION (Schmalzer, Bradley)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 521 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ford Motor Company for Ford Motor Company's Responses to Plaintiffs' Fourth Set of Request for Production of Documents (Schmalzer, Bradley)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 520 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ford Motor Company for Ford Motor Company's Responses to Plaintiffs' Third Set of Interrogatories (Schmalzer, Bradley)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 519 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Mills Allison, Michael Antramgarza, Charles Johnson, Josh Legato, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Roofwerks, Inc., Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Niall)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 518 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Mills Allison, Michael Antramgarza, Charles Johnson, Josh Legato, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Roofwerks, Inc., Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Niall)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 517 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Mills Allison, Michael Antramgarza, Charles Johnson, Josh Legato, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Roofwerks, Inc., Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Niall)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 516 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Mills Allison, Michael Antramgarza, Charles Johnson, Josh Legato, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Roofwerks, Inc., Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Niall)
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 515 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Mills Allison, Michael Antramgarza, Charles Johnson, Josh Legato, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Roofwerks, Inc., Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Niall)
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 514 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Mills Allison, Michael Antramgarza, Charles Johnson, Josh Legato, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Roofwerks, Inc., Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Niall)
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 513 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Mills Allison, Michael Antramgarza, Charles Johnson, Josh Legato, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Roofwerks, Inc., Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Niall)
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 512 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Mills Allison, Michael Antramgarza, Charles Johnson, Josh Legato, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Roofwerks, Inc., Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Niall)
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 511 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Mills Allison, Michael Antramgarza, Charles Johnson, Josh Legato, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Roofwerks, Inc., Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Niall)
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 510 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Mills Allison, Michael Antramgarza, Charles Johnson, Josh Legato, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Roofwerks, Inc., Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Niall)
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 509 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Mills Allison, Michael Antramgarza, Charles Johnson, Josh Legato, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Roofwerks, Inc., Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Niall)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 508 EXHIBIT AND WITNESS LIST FROM PROTECTIVE ORDER HEARING by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Mills Allison, Michael Antramgarza, Ford Motor Company, Charles Johnson, Josh Legato, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Roofwerks, Inc., Quintin Williams. Defendant's Exhibit Numbers: 1-3. (Attachments: #1 Defendant's Exhibit #1, #2 Defendant's Exhibit #2, #3 Defendant's Exhibit #3) (cbo)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 507 HEARING re: Protective Order held by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 5/28/2015; Court Reporter: Mary Schweinhagen. (mkw)
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 506 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Mills Allison, Michael Antramgarza, Charles Johnson, Josh Legato, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Roofwerks, Inc., Quintin Williams for Plaintiffs' Fifth Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Defendant Ford Motor Company (Atkinson, Nathan)
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 505 NOTICE OF CERTIFICATION FOR USE OF COURTROOM TECHNOLOGY at 9:30 a.m., May 28, 2015, Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert, Huntington (Paul, Niall)
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 504 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF REASONABLE PRODUCTION OF RELEVANT SOURCE CODE by John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Roofwerks, Inc., Quintin Williams, ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Mills Allison, Michael Antramgarza, Charles Johnson, Josh Legato (Paul, Niall) (Modified on 5/26/2015 to add party filers) (skh).
May 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 503 NOTICE OF INTENT TO CROSS EXAMINE PLAINTIFFS' DEMONSTRATOR WITNESS NIGEL JONES by Ford Motor Company (Schmalzer, Bradley)
May 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 502 MEMORANDUM REGARDING SOURCE CODE PROTECTIVE ORDER by Ford Motor Company re: #306 MOTION by Ford Motor Company for Protective Order Preventing the Production of Ford's Highly Confidential and Proprietary Source Code (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Schmalzer, Bradley)
May 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 501 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT for pro se and non-electronic filers re #498 TRANSCRIPT of Telephone Conference held on 04/29/2015, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Catherine Schutte-Stant, Telephone number 304-347-3151, and #499 TRANSCRIPT of Telephone Conference held on 05/13/2015, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Catherine Schutte-Stant, Telephone number 304-347-3151. (klc)
May 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 500 REPLY by Ford Motor Company to #475 Response In Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(Schmalzer, Bradley)
May 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 499 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Telephone Conference held on 05/13/2015, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Catherine Schutte-Stant, Telephone number 304-347-3151. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 6/1/2015. Redaction Request due 6/10/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/22/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/18/2015. (css)
May 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 498 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Telephone Conference held on 04/29/2015, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Catherine Schutte-Stant, Telephone number 304-347-3151. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 6/1/2015. Redaction Request due 6/10/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/22/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/18/2015. (css)
May 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 497 ORDER rescheduling the Case Management Conference for 6/29/2015 at 1:30 p.m. and Science Day shall be held on 6/30/2015 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 5/20/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (mkw)
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 496 NOTICE of Intent to Present Technical Demonstration by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Mills Allison, Michael Antramgarza, Charles Johnson, Josh Legato, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Roofwerks, Inc., Quintin Williams (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Paul, Niall)
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 495 REPLY by ACA Legal Investigations, Inc., Mills Allison, Michael Antramgarza, Charles Johnson, Josh Legato, John McGee, David H. Patton, Inez A. Patton, Roofwerks, Inc., Quintin Williams to #471 Response In Opposition. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Paul, Niall)
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order