United States of America et al v. KAR Contracting, LLC et al
Plaintiff: United States of America and Asphalt Contractors & Site Work, Inc.
Defendant: KAR Contracting, LLC and Great American Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2014cv27451
Filed: October 31, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Office: Huntington Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Chambers
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 46 JOINT MOTION and 48 SUPPLEMENTAL JOINT MOTION by Great American Insurance Company, KAR Contracting, LLC for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 12/4/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (mkw)
August 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 28 MOTION to Compel; directing that plaintiff provide full and complete responses to the discovery requests set forth in Defendants' motion, as they are amended in this Order, within fourteen (14) days of today's date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 8/10/2015. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (jsa)
June 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 8 Motion to Dismiss Complaint; granting in part as to Count IV and denying in part as to Counts I, II, and III, the statute of limitations defense, and Plaintiffs' claims for attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 6/11/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (mkw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America et al v. KAR Contracting, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Charles M. Johnstone, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asphalt Contractors & Site Work, Inc.
Represented By: Charles M. Johnstone, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAR Contracting, LLC
Represented By: Anders W. Lindberg
Represented By: Ancil G. Ramey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great American Insurance Company
Represented By: Anders W. Lindberg
Represented By: Ancil G. Ramey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?