Scott Hutchison Enterprises, Inc. v. Cranberry Pipeline Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Scott Hutchison Enterprises, Inc.
Defendant: Cranberry Pipeline Corporation and Cabot Oil & Gas Corporation
Case Number: 3:2015cv13415
Filed: September 23, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Office: Huntington Office
County: Cabell
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Chambers
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 302 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 286 MOTION by Scott Hutchison Enterprises, Inc. to Amend Complaint to Assert the Claim and Remedy for Ejectment. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 12/22/2016. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (mkw)
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 291 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER denying Defendants' 181 Renewed MOTION to Compel Production of Plaintiff's Financial Information; granting Plaintiff's 182 MOTION for Sanctions; directing Defendants to pay Plaintiff reimbursement of attorneys' fees and costs as more fully set forth herein within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 11/30/2016. (cc: counsel of record) (jsa)
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 257 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting Defendants' 205 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Defendants' Revenue and Financial Information; denying Plaintiff's 230 MOTION to Designate Defendants' Discovery Responses as Non-Confidential. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 11/4/2016. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 162 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER granting Defendants' 133 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Plaintiffs FRCP 30(b)(6) Notices of Corporate Representative Deposition; granting Plaintiff's 136 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses of Defend ants; directing Defendants to produce to Plaintiff within seven (7) days (from the date of the hearing on 9/19/2016) a copy of the documents more fully described herein; directing the parties to meet and confer upon completion of Plaintiff's rev iew and attempt to agree on the scope of any depositions to be taken pursuant to the second notices; directing the parties to take the Rule 30(b)(6) depositions at a location convenient for Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 9/20/2016. (cc: counsel of record) (jsa)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING MOTION TO COMPEL denying 57 MOTION by Scott Hutchison Enterprises, Inc. to Compel Responses to Requests for Production of Document Number 7. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 6/6/2016. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mkw)
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 21 MOTION by Scott Hutchison Enterprises, Inc. for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 3/16/2016. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (mkw)
March 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part 6 MOTION by Cabot Oil & Gas Corporation, Cranberry Pipeline Corporation to Dismiss Complaint with respect to Count Three and denying in part with respect to Counts One, Two and Four; denying 13 MO TION by Cabot Oil & Gas Corporation, Cranberry Pipeline Corporation to Strike 11 Memorandum of Law in Reply to Response; granting 14 MOTION by Scott Hutchison Enterprises, Inc. to File a Surreply. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 3/11/2016. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (mkw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott Hutchison Enterprises, Inc. v. Cranberry Pipeline Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Hutchison Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Paul E. Biser
Represented By: R. R. Fredeking, II
Represented By: Zachary J. Poole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cranberry Pipeline Corporation
Represented By: Timothy M. Miller
Represented By: Robert M. Stonestreet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cabot Oil & Gas Corporation
Represented By: Timothy M. Miller
Represented By: Robert M. Stonestreet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?