Osburn v. Precision Cast Corporation

Plaintiff: Taeger Osburn
Defendant: Precision Cast Corporation
Case Number: 3:2017cv04236
Filed: October 27, 2017
Court: West Virginia Southern District Court
Office: Huntington Office
County: Cabell
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Chambers
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 29:160
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 9, 2018 26 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting Defendant's 19 MOTION to Dismiss 18 Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 8/9/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
December 20, 2017 17 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting Plaintiff's 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend; directing Plaintiff to file his Amended Complaint immediately; denying as moot Defendant's 15 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 12/20/2017. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (hkl)
November 30, 2017 14 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 7 MOTION by Taeger Osburn to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Cabell County; granting 8 MOTION by Taeger Osburn for Leave to Amend Complaint and/or Substitution of Parties; denying as moot 4 MOTION by Precisi on Cast Corporation to Dismiss Complaint; directing Plaintiff to file an Amended Complaint by 12/7/2017; canceling the scheduling conference scheduled for 12/18/2017 at 11:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 11/30/2017. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (mkw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Osburn v. Precision Cast Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taeger Osburn
Represented By: Donald R. Jarrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Precision Cast Corporation
Represented By: Michael A. Frye
Represented By: Thomas E. Scarr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?