Branch Banking and Trust Company v. Meridian Holding Company, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Branch Banking and Trust Company
Defendant: Meridian Holding Company, LLC, Gregory L. Howard, Jr., Roger J. Harris, Jr. and Michael C. Dragovich
Case Number: 3:2018cv00486
Filed: March 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Office: Huntington Office
County: Cabell
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Chambers
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting Plaintiff's 86 MOTION for Attorney Fees; directing Defendants to reimburse Plaintiff its reasonable attorney's fees in the amount of $85,035.51. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 5/26/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (hkl)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting Plaintiff's 76 MOTION for Summary Judgment in the principal sum of $614,341.73, plus accrued interest of $9,594.85 through 3/22/2018, and late fees and other charges of $8,065.88, for a tota l of $632,002.46, together with pre-and post-judgment interest after 3/22/2018 at a per annum rate equal to Plaintiff's Prime Rate, as announced from time to time, plus 5 percent until paid, and for Plaintiff's reasonable attorney' ;s fees and costs incurred in attempting to collect the indebtedness due under the Note and Guaranty Agreement; directing this case removed from the docket. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 4/17/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting Third-Party Defendant State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Inc.'s 61 MOTION to Strike or, in the alternative, Sever the 48 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Meridian Holding Company, LLC; striking the 48 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT in its entirety. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 11/12/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 31 MOTION by Michael C. Dragovich, Roger J. Harris, Jr., Gregory L. Howard, Jr., Meridian Holding Company, LLC for Leave to File Amended Counterclaim; denying as moot 20 PARTIAL MOTION by Branch Banking and Trust Company to Dismiss 11 , 12 , 13 , 14 Counterclaims. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 2/5/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (mkw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Branch Banking and Trust Company v. Meridian Holding Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Branch Banking and Trust Company
Represented By: Debra Lee Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meridian Holding Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory L. Howard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger J. Harris, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael C. Dragovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?