Blankenship v. Nimmo
Plaintiff: Ronnie L. Blankenship
Defendant: Brian Nimmo
Case Number: 3:2018cv01309
Filed: September 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Referring Judge: Cheryl A Eifert
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2018 Filing 6 AMENDED APPLICATION by Ronnie L. Blankenship to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. (hkl)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 or submit to the Court an amended Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs which accurately states Plaintiff's assets, as more fully set forth herein; notifying Plaintiff that failure to pay the fee or submit the application as instructed within 30 days of the date of this Order shall result in a recommendation that the complaint be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 9/24/2018. (cc: Plaintiff) (jsa)
September 21, 2018 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
September 21, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Ronnie L. Blankenship for Brian Nimmo, re: #2 Complaint. (hkl)
September 21, 2018 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (hkl)
September 21, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT. (Attachments: #1 Attachments to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (hkl)
September 21, 2018 Filing 1 APPLICATION by Ronnie L. Blankenship to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. (hkl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blankenship v. Nimmo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie L. Blankenship
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Nimmo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?