Hammonds v. Western Regional Jail W.V. et al

Plaintiff: Ronnie Lee Hammonds
Defendant: Western Regional Jail W.V. and Prime Care
Case Number: 3:2018cv01377
Filed: November 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
0 Judge: Robert C Chambers
1 Judge: Cheryl A Eifert
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by U. S. Marshal for service upon Western Regional Jail W.V., re: #2 Complaint. Western Regional Jail W.V. served on 12/12/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. Person Served: Administrator Joseph Wood. (hkl)
November 28, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS ISSUED by the Clerk on behalf of Ronnie Lee Hammonds for Western Regional Jail W.V., re: #2 Complaint, returnable 21 days. Original Summons and 2 copies forwarded to United States Marshal Service for service. (hkl)
November 28, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS ISSUED by the Clerk on behalf of Ronnie Lee Hammonds for Prime Care, re: #2 Complaint, returnable 21 days. Original Summons and 2 copies forwarded to United States Marshal Service for service. (hkl)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #1 and #5 APPLICATIONS to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs; directing to make monthly payments beginning on 1/10/2019, as more fully set forth herein; directing that the recovery, if any, obtained in this action shall be paid to the Clerk of Court who shall collect therefrom all unpaid fees and costs taxed against Plaintiff and shall pay the balance, if any, to the Plaintiff; directing the Clerk of Court to issue a summons for the named defendants; further directing the United States Marshals Service to serve the summons and complaint on each defendant,or its designated agent for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 11/28/2018. (cc: Plaintiff; USM; Administrator of the Western Regional Jail, Executive Director of the West Virginia Regional Jail and Correctional Facility Authority) (hkl)
November 26, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Ronnie Lee Hammonds. (hkl)
November 16, 2018 Filing 5 APPLICATION by Ronnie Lee Hammonds to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. (Attachments: #1 Average Resident Balance Statement, #2 Resident Transaction Details, #3 Order, #4 Envelope) Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. (hkl)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 or submit a completed Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs; notifying Plaintiff that failure to pay the fee or submit an amended Application within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order may result in a recommendation that the complaint be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 11/7/2018. (cc: Plaintiff with copy of Application to Proceed) (jsa)
October 24, 2018 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
October 24, 2018 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (jsa)
October 24, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT. (jsa)
October 24, 2018 Filing 1 APPLICATION by Ronnie Lee Hammonds to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. (jsa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hammonds v. Western Regional Jail W.V. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Regional Jail W.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prime Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Lee Hammonds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?