Snyder v. South Central Regional Jail et al
Plaintiff: Joshua Ryan Snyder
Defendant: Corporal Roop, Officer King, Sgt Tony, Sgt Franklin, Western Regional Jail, PrimeCare and South Central Regional Jail
Case Number: 3:2018cv01441
Filed: November 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Referring Judge: Cheryl A Eifert
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT by Joshua Ryan Snyder against Franklin, King, PrimeCare, Roop, South Central Regional Jail, Tony, Western Regional Jail. (jsa)
December 7, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION by Joshua Ryan Snyder to Dismiss Sgt. King, Western Regional Jail, Sgt. Franklin, and PrimeCare. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. (jsa)
December 7, 2018 Filing 5 APPLICATION by Joshua Ryan Snyder to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. (jsa)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 or submit a completed Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs; further directing Plaintiff to amend his complaint as specified herein and to advise the Court whether there are any claims in this particular action pertaining to the Western Regional Jail that cannot or should not be prosecuted as part of Case No. 3:18-cv-1438. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 11/28/2018. (cc: Plaintiff with Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs) (jsa)
November 15, 2018 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (ts)
November 15, 2018 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (hkl)
November 15, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (hkl)
November 15, 2018 Filing 1 APPLICATION by Joshua Ryan Snyder to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (hkl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snyder v. South Central Regional Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Ryan Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporal Roop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt Tony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Regional Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PrimeCare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Central Regional Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?