Turley v. Western Regional Jail

Plaintiff: Angela G. Turley and Jodi Marie Puskas
Defendant: Western Regional Jail, Medical Staff and Brittany Adkins
Case Number: 3:2018cv01474
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
0 Judge: Robert C Chambers
1 Judge: Cheryl A Eifert
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Filing 12 LETTER to Angela Turley, from Rory L. Perry II dated 12/21/2018, re: #11 letter with questions regarding case. (brn)
December 20, 2018 Filing 11 LETTER to Sidney L. Christie from Angela Turley dated 12/16/2018, re: questions regarding case. (jsa)
December 17, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS ISSUED by the Clerk on behalf of Angela G. Turley for Medical Staff, re: #1 Complaint, #6 Amended Complaint, returnable 21 days. Original Summons and 2 copies delivered to U.S. Marshals for service. (jsa)
December 17, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS ISSUED by the Clerk on behalf of Angela G. Turley for Brittany Adkins, re: #1 Complaint, #6 Amended Complaint, returnable 21 days. Original Summons and 1 copy delivered to U.S. Marshals for service. (jsa)
December 17, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS ISSUED by the Clerk on behalf of Angela G. Turley for Western Regional Jail, re: #1 Complaint, #6 Amended Complaint, returnable 21 days. Original Summons and 2 copies delivered to U.S. Marshals for service. (jsa)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #4 APPLICATION to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees or Costs; directing Plaintiff to make monthly payments beginning on 2/5/2019, as more fully set forth herein; further directing that the recovery, if any, obtained in this action shall be paid to the Clerk of Court, who shall collect therefrom all unpaid fees and costs taxed against Plaintiff and shall pay the balance, if any, to the Plaintiff; further directing the Clerk of Court to issue a summons for the named defendants and the United States Marshals Service to serve the summons, complaint, and amended complaint on each defendant, or his/her/its designated agent for service; notifying the Clerk that Jodi Marie Puskas shall not be joined as a Plaintiff in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 12/17/2018. (cc: Plaintiff; USM; Administrator of the Western Regional Jail) (jsa)
December 14, 2018 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT by Angela G. Turley, Jodi Marie Puskas against Western Regional Jail, Brittany Adkins, Medical Staff. (jsa)
December 14, 2018 Filing 5 AUTHORIZATION TO RELEASE INSTITUTIONAL ACCOUNT INFORMATION by Angela G. Turley. (jsa)
December 14, 2018 Filing 4 APPLICATION by Angela G. Turley to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. (Attachment: #1 Average Resident Balance Statement) Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. (jsa)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 or submit to the Court a completed and signed Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs; further directing Plaintiff to amend her complaint as specified herein within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 11/30/2018. (cc: Plaintiff with a form Complaint under 42 U.S.C. 1983, an Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs, and any available instructions for completing the forms) (jsa)
November 29, 2018 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
November 29, 2018 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (jsa) (Modified on 11/29/2018 to replace incorrect image) (mkw).
November 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. (jsa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turley v. Western Regional Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Regional Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brittany Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela G. Turley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jodi Marie Puskas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?