Smith v. Western Regional Jail

Plaintiff: Jefferson O. Smith
Defendant: Western Regional Jail
Case Number: 3:2018cv01490
Filed: December 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Referring Judge: Cheryl A Eifert
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 THIS CASE HAS BEEN CONSOLIDATED WITH CASE NUMBER 3:18-cv-1525 AS OF 12/19/2018. ALL FURTHER ENTRIES SHALL BE DOCKETED IN 3:18-cv-1490. (mkw)
December 19, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED by the Clerk on behalf of Jefferson O. Smith for Western Regional Jail, re: #1 Complaint, returnable 21 days. Original Summons and 2 copies delivered to U.S. Marshals for service. (jsa)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing the Clerk to consolidate this action with Case No. 3:18-cv-01525; granting Plaintiff's Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs; directing Plaintiff to make monthly payments beginning on 2/7/2019, as more fully set forth herein; further directing that the recovery, if any, obtained in this action shall be paid to the Clerk of Court, who shall collect therefrom all unpaid fees and costs taxed against Plaintiff and shall pay the balance, if any, to the Plaintiff; directing the Clerk of Court to issue a summons for the named defendant and the United States Marshals Service to serve the summons and complaint on the defendant, or its designated agent for service of process. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 12/19/2018. (cc: Plaintiff; USM; WRJ Administrator) (jsa) (jsa)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing the Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 or submit to the Court a completed and signed Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs; further directing Plaintiff to amend his complaint as specified herein within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 12/6/2018. (cc: Plaintiff with a form Complaint under 42 U.S.C. 1983, an Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs, and any available instructions for completing the forms) (jsa)
December 4, 2018 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
December 4, 2018 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (jsa)
December 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. (jsa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Western Regional Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Regional Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jefferson O. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?