Puskas v. Western Regional Jail
Plaintiff: Jodi Puskas
Defendant: Western Regional Jail
Case Number: 3:2018cv01536
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Referring Judge: Cheryl A Eifert
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by U. S. Marshal for service upon Western Regional Jail, re: #1 Complaint. Western Regional Jail served on 2/11/2019, answer due 3/4/2019. (hkl)
January 16, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED by the Clerk on behalf of Jodi Puskas for Western Regional Jail, re: #1 Complaint, returnable 21 days. Original Summons and 2 copies forwarded to United States Marshal Service for service. (hkl)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #4 APPLICATION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs; directing Plaintiff to make an initial partial filing fee payment in the amount of $5.00 on or before 2/15/2019, and shall make monthly payments as more fully set forth herein; directing that the recovery, if any, obtained in this action shall be paid to the Clerk of Court who shall collect therefrom all unpaid fees and costs taxed against Plaintiff and shall pay the balance to the Plaintiff, if any; directing the Clerk of Court to issue a summons for the defendant; further directing The United States Marshals Service to serve the summons and complaint on the defendant, or its designated agent for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 1/16/2019. (cc: Plaintiff; Administrator of the Western Regional Jail; USM) (hkl)
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION by Jodi Puskas to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. (Attachments: #1 Average Resident Balance Statement, #2 Envelope) Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. (hkl)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400, or in the alternative, submit to the Court a completed and signed Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs, which includes the institutional certification and an inmate account transaction record; notifying Plaintiff that failure to pay the fee or submit a completed application within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order shall result in a recommendation that the Complaint be dismissed; directing Plaintiff to amend her complaint within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order; notifying Plaintiff that a failure to amend the complaint as ordered shall result in a recommendation that the complaint be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 12/26/2018. (cc: Plaintiff with an Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs) (hkl)
December 21, 2018 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (ts)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (jsa)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. (jsa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Puskas v. Western Regional Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Regional Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jodi Puskas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?