Henderson et al v. Paramount Senior Living at Ona, LLC

Plaintiff: Aline E. Henderson and Steven H. Burgh
Defendant: Paramount Senior Living at Ona LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00139
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Steven H. Burgh, Aline E. Henderson for First Set of Discovery Requests to Defendant Paramount Senior Living at Ona LLC (Lunsford, David)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 4/25/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 5/6/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 5/13/2019. Scheduling/status Conference at 11:30 AM on 5/28/2019 in Huntington. Entry of Scheduling Order 6/3/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 6/10/2019. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 4/5/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (mkw)
April 4, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER TO #1 Complaint With Jury Demand by Paramount Senior Living at Ona LLC. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sunseri, Anthony) (Modified on 4/5/2019 to add jury demand) (ts).
March 26, 2019 Filing 5 JOINT STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME for Paramount Senior Living at Ona LLC to Respond to #1 Complaint to April 5, 2019 by Aline E. Henderson, Steven H. Burgh, Paramount Senior Living at Ona LLC (Lunsford, David) (Modified on 3/27/2019 to add party filer) (ts).
March 4, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Personal Service for Paramount Senior Living at Ona LLC. Paramount Senior Living at Ona LLC served on 3/1/2019, answer due 3/22/2019. Summons served on Paramount Health Resources, Inc. (Lunsford, David)
February 27, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (hkl)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Paramount Senior Living at Ona, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (hkl)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7090561. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (hkl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henderson et al v. Paramount Senior Living at Ona, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paramount Senior Living at Ona LLC
Represented By: Anthony C. Sunseri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aline E. Henderson
Represented By: David B. Lunsford
Represented By: Mark R. Staun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven H. Burgh
Represented By: David B. Lunsford
Represented By: Mark R. Staun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?