Tabor v. CSX Transportation, Inc.
Plaintiff: Brian Tabor
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00153
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas H. Peyton on behalf of Brian Tabor. (Peyton, Thomas)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 4/30/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 5/13/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 5/20/2019. Scheduling/status Conference at 11:30 AM on 6/3/2019 in Huntington. Entry of Scheduling Order 6/10/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 6/17/2019. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 4/10/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (mkw)
April 8, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant CSX Transportation, Inc. (Bird, Melissa)
April 8, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER TO #1 Complaint by CSX Transportation, Inc. (Bird, Melissa)
March 18, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 3/13/2019 as to CSX Transportation, Inc. (hkl)
March 6, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
March 6, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to CSX Transportation, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (hkl)
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (hkl)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7101759. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (hkl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tabor v. CSX Transportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Tabor
Represented By: Harvey D. Peyton
Represented By: Thomas H. Peyton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Foster Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?