Blankenship v. Jordan et al

Plaintiff: Ginny Blankenship
Defendant: Andrew Jordan and Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00372
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER Joinder of Parties, amended pleadings due by 9/13/2019. Discovery requests to be completed by 12/10/2019, and all depositions by 1/24/2020. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 11/15/2019, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 12/16/2019, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 12/30/2019. Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 2/28/2020, any response shall be filed within 14 days of the filing of the motion, with replies due within 7 days of the filing of the response. Settlement Meeting and Rule 26(a)(3) disclosures by 5/18/2020. Plaintiff's portion of proposed Pretrial Order to defendants due by 5/26/2020, Proposed Integrated Pretrial Order due by 6/1/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 6/8/2020 at 10:30 AM in Huntington before Judge Robert C. Chambers. Proposed Jury Charges due by 6/16/2020. Final Settlement Conference at 09:30 AM on 6/22/2020 in Huntington. Trial set for 6/23/2020 at 08:30 AM in Huntington before Judge Robert C. Chambers; further canceling the scheduling conference set for 7/8/2019. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 6/19/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (mkw)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Kesner, Tanya)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Ginny Blankenship, Andrew Jordan. (Kesner, Tanya) (Modified on 6/18/2019 to add party filers) (ts).
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 6/6/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 6/17/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 6/24/2019. Scheduling/status Conference at 11:30 AM on 7/8/2019 in Huntington. Entry of Scheduling Order 7/15/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 7/22/2019. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 5/16/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (hkl)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL With Jury Demand by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company.(Kesner, Tanya) (Modified on 5/15/2019 to add jury demand)(ts).
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mkw)
May 10, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (ts)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company with summons, complaint, docket sheet and other miscellaneous documents from Circuit Court of Putnam County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #CHAR015853. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Receipt) (mkw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blankenship v. Jordan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ginny Blankenship
Represented By: Charles M. Love, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Jordan
Represented By: Tanya M. Kesner
Represented By: Joshua A. Lanham
Represented By: Ronda L. Harvey
Represented By: Brent K. Kesner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Tanya M. Kesner
Represented By: Joshua A. Lanham
Represented By: Ronda L. Harvey
Represented By: Brent K. Kesner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?