Lattea et al v. Vanderbilt Mortgage & Finance, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Gregory W. Lattea and Angela L. Lattea
Defendant: CMH Homes Inc., Vanderbilt Mortgage & Finance, Inc. and CMH Homes, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00375
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT by Gregory W. Lattea, Angela L. Lattea against CMH Homes, Inc., Vanderbilt Mortgage & Finance, Inc.; Jury demand. (jsa)
July 11, 2019 SET DEADLINES as to Defendants' #6 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and #8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Remaining Nonarbitrable Claims; Responses due by 7/19/2019, Replies due by 7/26/2019, pursuant to the #16 Order. (jsa)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #12 MOTION to Amend Complaint; directing Plaintiffs to file responses to Defendants' #6 Motion to Dismiss and #8 Motion to Compel Arbitration no later than 7/19/2019; Defendants shall file replies no later than 7/26/2019. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 7/11/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
July 2, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE by CMH Homes, Inc., Vanderbilt Mortgage & Finance, Inc. re: #12 MOTION by Angela L. Lattea, Gregory W. Lattea to Amend Complaint (White, Lucas)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER Joinder of Parties, amended pleadings due by 8/7/2019. Discovery requests to be completed by 3/16/2020, and all depositions by 4/29/2020. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 12/17/2019, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 1/17/2020, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 1/27/2020. Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 5/20/2020, any response shall be filed within 14 days of the filing of the motion, with replies due within 7 days of the filing of the response. Settlement Meeting and Rule 26(a)(3) disclosures by 6/29/2020. Plaintiffs' portion of proposed Pretrial Order to defendants due by 7/6/2020, Proposed Integrated Pretrial Order due by 7/13/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 7/20/2020 at 10:30 AM in Huntington before Judge Robert C. Chambers. Proposed Jury Charges due by 7/28/2020. Final Settlement Conference at 09:30 AM on 8/3/2020 in Huntington. Trial set for 8/4/2020 at 08:30 AM in Huntington before Judge Robert C. Chambers; further canceling the scheduling conference set for 7/8/2019. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 6/19/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (mkw)
June 19, 2019 Filing 13 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by CMH Homes, Inc., Vanderbilt Mortgage & Finance, Inc., Gregory W. Lattea, Angela L. Lattea. (Fenwick, Carrie) (Modified on 6/19/2019 to add party filers)(ts).
June 18, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION by Angela L. Lattea, Gregory W. Lattea to Amend Complaint (Attachment: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint)(Hedges 1, Daniel)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AGREED ORDER granting the parties' #10 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Initial Motions; Plaintiffs' Responses to Defendants' #6 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and #8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Remaining Non-Arbitrable Claims due by 7/20/2019. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 6/14/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (hkl)
June 13, 2019 Filing 10 JOINT MOTION by CMH Homes, Inc., Vanderbilt Mortgage & Finance, Inc., Gregory W. Lattea, Angela L. Lattea to Extend Time to Respond to #8 MOTION by CMH Homes, Inc., Vanderbilt Mortgage & Finance, Inc. Compel Arbitration and Stay Remaining Nonarbitrable Claims, #6 MOTION by CMH Homes, Inc., Vanderbilt Mortgage & Finance, Inc. to Dismiss Complaint to July 10, 2019 (Attachment: #1 Proposed Order)(Fenwick, Carrie) (Modified on 6/13/2019 to add party filers) (ts).
June 6, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by CMH Homes, Inc., Vanderbilt Mortgage & Finance, Inc. in support of #8 MOTION by CMH Homes, Inc., Vanderbilt Mortgage & Finance, Inc. Compel Arbitration and Stay Remaining Nonarbitrable Claims (White, Lucas)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION by CMH Homes, Inc., Vanderbilt Mortgage & Finance, Inc. Compel Arbitration and Stay Remaining Nonarbitrable Claims (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(White, Lucas)
June 6, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by CMH Homes, Inc., Vanderbilt Mortgage & Finance, Inc. in support of #6 MOTION by CMH Homes, Inc., Vanderbilt Mortgage & Finance, Inc. to Dismiss Complaint (White, Lucas)
June 6, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION by CMH Homes, Inc., Vanderbilt Mortgage & Finance, Inc. to Dismiss Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal. (White, Lucas) (Modified on 6/6/2019 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (ts).
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CMH Homes, Inc. (White, Lucas)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Vanderbilt Mortgage & Finance, Inc. (White, Lucas)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 6/6/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 6/17/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 6/24/2019. Scheduling/status Conference at 11:30 AM on 7/8/2019 in Huntington. Entry of Scheduling Order 7/15/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 7/22/2019. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 5/16/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
May 13, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (ts)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (hkl)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CMH Homes Inc., Vanderbilt Mortgage & Finance, Inc. with summons, complaint, docket sheet and other miscellaneous documents from Circuit Court of Putnam County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7229142. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (hkl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lattea et al v. Vanderbilt Mortgage & Finance, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMH Homes Inc.
Represented By: Carrie Goodwin Fenwick
Represented By: Lucas R. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanderbilt Mortgage & Finance, Inc.
Represented By: Carrie Goodwin Fenwick
Represented By: Lucas R. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMH Homes, Inc.
Represented By: Carrie Goodwin Fenwick
Represented By: Lucas R. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory W. Lattea
Represented By: Bren J. Pomponio
Represented By: Daniel F. Hedges 1
Represented By: Willard Clinton Carte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela L. Lattea
Represented By: Bren J. Pomponio
Represented By: Daniel F. Hedges 1
Represented By: Willard Clinton Carte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?