Morgan et al v. Azar
Plaintiff: Breton L. Morgan
Defendant: Alex M. Azar
Case Number: 3:2019cv00406
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 8/5/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 8/19/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 8/26/2019. Scheduling/status Conference at 11:30 AM on 9/9/2019 in Huntington. Entry of Scheduling Order 9/16/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 9/23/2019. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 7/15/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (hkl)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing of the Administrative Record by Alex M. Azar (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A - CD)(Westfall, Fred)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER TO #1 Complaint by Alex M. Azar. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Westfall, Fred)
May 24, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (jsa)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alex M. Azar, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 60 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (jsa)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7251174. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jsa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morgan et al v. Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Breton L. Morgan
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Jurca
Represented By: Alexander Macia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar
Represented By: Michael B. Stuart
Represented By: Fred B. Westfall, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?