Jeffers et al v. West Virginia Division of Corrections and Rehabilitation et al
Plaintiff: Kathleen Jeffers and Bradley Siders, II
Defendant: West Virginia Division of Corrections and Rehabilitation, PrimeCare Medical of West Virginia, Inc., John and Jane Doe or Does, Officer Jimmy Pine, Officer Ricky Gaberielse, PSIMED Corrections, LLC and Anita Petitte
Case Number: 3:2019cv00462
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by PrimeCare Medical of West Virginia, Inc. in support of #14 MOTION by PrimeCare Medical of West Virginia, Inc. to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim re: #1 Notice of Removal,. (O'Hare, Anne)
August 15, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION by PrimeCare Medical of West Virginia, Inc. to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim re: #1 Notice of Removal,. (O'Hare, Anne)
August 15, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by PrimeCare Medical of West Virginia, Inc..(O'Hare, Anne)
August 14, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William E. Murray on behalf of West Virginia Division of Corrections and Rehabilitation. (Murray, William)
August 14, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL With Jury Demand by PSIMED Corrections, LLC, Anita Petitte.(Sengewalt, Jordan) (Modified on 8/14/2019 to add link to #1 notice of removal and to add jury demand) (ts).
August 13, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #10 Rule 26(f) Report of Planning Meeting by PrimeCare Medical of West Virginia, Inc., West Virginia Division of Corrections and Rehabilitation, PSIMED Corrections, LLC, Anita Petitte, Kethleen Jeffers, Bradley Siders, II. ERROR: Image did not contain signature of counsel. CORRECTION: Image replaced. (ts)
August 12, 2019 Filing 10 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by PrimeCare Medical of West Virginia, Inc., West Virginia Division of Corrections and Rehabilitation, PSIMED Corrections, LLC, Anita Petitte, Kethleen Jeffers, Bradley Siders, II (O'Hare, Anne) (Modified on 8/13/2019 to replace unsigned image and to add party filers)(ts).
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #8 MOTION to Extend Deadline for Filing Response to #4 MOTION by West Virginia Division of Corrections and Rehabilitation to Dismiss; Plaintiff's Response is now due by 8/20/2019. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 8/6/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION by Kathleen Jeffers, Bradley Siders, II to Extend Deadline for Filing Response to #4 MOTION by West Virginia Division of Corrections and Rehabilitation to Dismiss Complaint to 8-20-2019 (Weston, Richard)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard W. Weston on behalf of Kathleen Jeffers, Bradley Siders, II. (Weston, Richard)
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S ORDER. Due to a conflict, the referral of this civil action for discovery matters is transferred from Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley. Signed by Clerk of Court Rory L. Perry II on 7/23/2019.(cc: Magistrate Judge Eifert; Magistrate Judge Tinsley; unrepresented parties; non CM/ECF users). (klc)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by West Virginia Division of Corrections and Rehabilitation in support of #4 MOTION by West Virginia Division of Corrections and Rehabilitation to Dismiss Complaint (Brison, M.)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION by West Virginia Division of Corrections and Rehabilitation to Dismiss Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal. (Brison, M.) (Modified on 7/22/2019 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (ts).
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 7/22/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 8/5/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 8/12/2019. Scheduling/status Conference at 11:30 AM on 8/26/2019 in Huntington. Entry of Scheduling Order 9/3/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 9/9/2019. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 7/1/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (mkw)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (hkl)
June 17, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by West Virginia Division of Corrections and Rehabilitation with summons, amended complaint, second amended complaint, notice of filing notice of removal, consent to removal, and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Cabell County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7286253. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 1 continued, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 3 continued, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (hkl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jeffers et al v. West Virginia Division of Corrections and Rehabilitation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Virginia Division of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Represented By: M. Andrew Brison
Represented By: William E. Murray
Represented By: Mark Jeffrey McGhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PrimeCare Medical of West Virginia, Inc.
Represented By: Anne Liles O'Hare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Doe or Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Jimmy Pine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Ricky Gaberielse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PSIMED Corrections, LLC
Represented By: Jordan Sengewalt
Represented By: Philip John Sbrolla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anita Petitte
Represented By: Jordan Sengewalt
Represented By: Philip John Sbrolla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Jeffers
Represented By: Connor D. Robertson
Represented By: Richard W. Weston
Represented By: Charles M. Hatcher, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Siders, II
Represented By: Connor D. Robertson
Represented By: Richard W. Weston
Represented By: Charles M. Hatcher, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?