Turner v. Synchrony Bank

Plaintiff: Natalie Turner
Defendant: Synchrony Bank
Case Number: 3:2019cv00466
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 SECOND STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME for Synchrony Bank to Respond to #1 Complaint to August 30, 2019 by Synchrony Bank, Natalie Turne (Griffith, M.) (Modified on 8/12/2019 to add link to #1 complaint and to add party filer)(ts).
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME for Synchrony Bank to Respond to #1 Complaint to August 9, 2019 by Synchrony Bank, Natalie Turner (Griffith, M.) (Modified on 7/14/2019 to add link to #1 complaint and to add party filer) (ts).
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 6/21/2019 as to Synchrony Bank. (jsa)
June 18, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (hkl)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Synchrony Bank, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (hkl)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7287957. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (hkl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. Synchrony Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalie Turner
Represented By: Benjamin Sheridan
Represented By: Megan Alicia Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synchrony Bank
Represented By: M. David Griffith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?