Spurlock v. Saul
Plaintiff: Christopher E. Spurlock
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill and Andrew Saul
Case Number: 3:2019cv00476
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Referring Judge: Dwane L Tinsley
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 11 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held before the Administrative Law Judge. (Attachments: #1 002 Court Transcript Index, #2 003 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable Part 1, #3 004 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable Part 2, #4 005 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable Part 3, #5 006 Payment Documents and Decisions, #6 007 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, #7 008 Non Disability Related Development, #8 009 Disability Related Development, #9 010 Medical Records Part 1, #10 011 Medical Records Part 2, #11 012 Medical Records Part 3, #12 013 Medical Records Part 4, #13 014 Medical Records Part 5, #14 015 Medical Records Part 6, #15 016 Medical Records Part 7, #16 017 Medical Records Part 8, #17 018 Medical Records Part 9, #18 019 Medical Records Part 10)(Neil, Gregory)
August 27, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER TO #2 Complaint by Andrew Saul.(Neil, Gregory)
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN RECEIPT CARD received from Attorney General Return Receipt Card signed by Sharon White, on undated. (Boggs, Thomas)
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN RECEIPT CARD received from Commissioner of Social Security Return Receipt Card signed by illegible, on July 6, 2019. (Boggs, Thomas)
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN RECEIPT CARD received from Attorney General Return Receipt Card signed by illegible, on July 9, 2019. (Boggs, Thomas)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Andrew Saul, re: #2 Complaint. Summons returnable 60 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (mkw)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AND NOTICE GRANTING IN FORMA PAUPERIS granting Plaintiff's #1 APPLICATION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs; the Clerk of Court shall issue the summonses; Plaintiff shall serve the summonses and complaint pursuant to Rule 4, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; further directing and noticing that the recovery, if any, obtained in this action shall be paid to the Clerk of Court, who shall pay therefrom all unpaid costs taxed against plaintiff and pay the balance to the plaintiff and his attorney, if any. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley on 7/1/2019. (cc: counsel of record) (mkw)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
June 25, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Christopher E. Spurlock for Nancy A. Berryhill, re: #2 Complaint. (jsa)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jsa)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION by Christopher E. Spurlock to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. (jsa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spurlock v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher E. Spurlock
Represented By: Thomas P. Boggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Nora R. Koch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Nora R. Koch
Represented By: Gregory P. Neil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?