International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No. 132 Pension Fund v. Taylor et al
Plaintiff: International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No. 132 Pension Fund
Defendant: Ginger Marcella Kuhen, Diana Taylor, Diana L. Taylor and James W. Taylor
Case Number: 3:2019cv00511
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ginger Marcella Kuhen, James W. Taylor, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachment: #1 summons as to Ginger Marcella Kuhen) (jsa)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED SUMMONS SUBMITTED by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No. 132 Pension Fund for James W. Taylor and Ginger Marcella Kuhen, re: #1 Complaint. (Lowry, Lawrence) (Modified on 7/19/2019 to add link to #1 complaint) (kew).
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No. 132 Pension Fund for James W. Taylor and Ginger Mrcella Kuhen (Lowry, Lawrence)
July 11, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (jsa)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7315168. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jsa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No. 132 Pension Fund v. Taylor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ginger Marcella Kuhen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diana Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diana L. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James W. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No. 132 Pension Fund
Represented By: Lawrence B. Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?