Vaughan v. Saul
Plaintiff: Lawrence Bradford Vaughan
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 3:2019cv00514
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Referring Judge: Cheryl A Eifert
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held before the Administrative Law Judge. (Attachments: #1 002 Court Transcript Index 08-11-2019, #2 003 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable 08-15-2014, #3 004 Payment Documents and Decisions 08-15-2014, #4 005 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices 08-15-2014 Part 1, #5 006 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices 08-15-2014 Part 2, #6 007 Non Disability Related Development 08-15-2014, #7 008 Disability Related Development 08-15-2014 Part 1, #8 009 Disability Related Development 08-15-2014 Part 2, #9 010 Medical Records 08-15-2014 Part 1, #10 011 Medical Records 08-15-2014 Part 2, #11 012 Medical Records 08-15-2014 Part 3, #12 013 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable 08-11-2019, #13 014 Payment Documents and Decisions 08-11-2019, #14 015 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices 08-11-2019, #15 016 Non Disability Related Development 08-11-2019, #16 017 Disability Related Development 08-11-2019, #17 018 Medical Records 08-11-2019)(Neil, Gregory)
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER TO #2 Complaint by Andrew Saul.(Neil, Gregory)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Andrew Saul, re: #2 Complaint. Summons returnable 60 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (hkl)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AND NOTICE ALLOWING PLAINTIFF TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF COSTS AND FEES granting Plaintiff's #1 APPLICATION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs; directing the Clerk of the Court to issue the summonses and Plaintiff to serve the summonses and Complaint pursuant to Rule 4, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; further directing that the recovery, if any, obtained in this action shall be paid to the Clerk of the Court, who shall pay therefrom all unpaid costs and fees taxed against the plaintiff and pay the balance to the plaintiff and his attorney, if any. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 7/16/2019. (cc: counsel of record) (hkl)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
July 11, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Lawrence Bradford Vaughan for Andrew Saul, re: #2 Complaint. (hkl)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (hkl)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION by Lawrence Bradford Vaughan to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. (Attachment: #1 Proposed Order) (hkl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vaughan v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Nora R. Koch
Represented By: Gregory P. Neil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Bradford Vaughan
Represented By: James T. Meisel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?