Hagler v. Western Regional Jail
Plaintiff: Hasaan Rekeem Hagler
Defendant: Western Regional Jail
Case Number: 3:2019cv00544
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Referring Judge: Cheryl A Eifert
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 TRANSMITTED CERTIFIED COPY of #6 JUDGMENT ORDER. Mailed to Plaintiff via USPS. (hkl)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 JUDGMENT ORDER in accordance with the accompanying #5 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER, directing that Plaintiff's #2 COMPLAINT be DISMISSED, with prejudice; the #1 APPLICATION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs be DENIED, as moot; and this action be REMOVED from the Court's docket. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 9/18/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (hkl)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER accepting and incorporating the #4 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert; directing that Plaintiff's #2 COMPLAINT be dismissed with prejudice; denying as moot the #1 APPLICATION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs; and removing this action from the Court's docket. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 9/18/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (hkl)
August 28, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert; recommending that Plaintiff's #2 Complaint be dismissed, with prejudice; deny as moot the #1 Application to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees or Costs; and this civil action be removed from the Court's docket. Objections to Proposed F&R due by 9/16/2019. This case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 8/28/2019. (cc: Plaintiff) (hkl)
July 24, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (jsa)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT. (jsa)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION by Hasaan Rekeem Hagler to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. (jsa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hagler v. Western Regional Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Regional Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hasaan Rekeem Hagler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?