In re: Blackjewel L.L.C. et al
Appellee: Revelation Management Corp., Blackjewel L.L.C., Dominion Coal Corporation, Powell Mountain Energy, LLC, Revelation Energy Holdings, LLC, Lone Mountain Processing, LLC, Vansant Coal Corporation, Cumberland River Coal LLC, Harold Keene Coal Co. LLC, Blackjewel Holdings L.L.C. and Revelation Energy, LLC
Interested Party: James Pfeifer, Stephen G. Barker, Joseph Yoerg, Karen Ferris, Henry Looney, Whitney Kegley and Contura Energy, Inc.
Trustee: United States Trustee
Appellant: Fifth Third Bank
Case Number: 3:2019cv00663
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT by Elizabeth A. Amandus, on behalf of Contura Energy, Inc. in support of #16 MOTION by Contura Energy, Inc. to Dismiss #1 Notice of Appeal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Amandus, Elizabeth)
October 25, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Contura Energy, Inc. in support of #16 MOTION by Contura Energy, Inc. to Dismiss #1 Notice of Appeal (Amandus, Elizabeth)
October 25, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION by Contura Energy, Inc. to Dismiss #1 Notice of Appeal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Amandus, Elizabeth) (Modified on 10/27/2019 to add link to #1 appeal) (ts).
October 25, 2019 Filing 15 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Angela M. Libby on behalf of Contura Energy, Inc. Local counsel: Elizabeth A. Amandus. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7427783. (Amandus, Elizabeth)
October 25, 2019 Filing 14 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Nate Sokol on behalf of Contura Energy, Inc. Local counsel: Elizabeth A. Amandus. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7427738. (Amandus, Elizabeth)
October 24, 2019 Filing 13 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Damian S. Schaible on behalf of Contura Energy, Inc. Local counsel: Elizabeth A. Amandus. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7426252. (Cline, Whytni)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AGREED ORDER SETTING STIPULATED SCHEDULE FOR BRIEFING OF MOTION TO DISMISS granting the parties' #11 JOINT MOTION for Entry of Agreed Order Setting Stipulated Schedule for Briefing of Motion to Dismiss; directing that the prior briefing orders entered in this case by the Bankruptcy Court and this Court are VACATED; the parties shall submit briefing on the motion to dismiss the appeal as follows: Filing of Contura's motion to dismiss by 10/25/2019; Filing of Fifth Third's opposition by 11/22/2019; Filing of Contura's reply by 12/11/2019. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 10/24/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
October 22, 2019 Filing 11 JOINT MOTION by Blackjewel Holdings L.L.C., Blackjewel L.L.C., Contura Energy, Inc., Cumberland River Coal LLC, Dominion Coal Corporation, Fifth Third Bank, Harold Keene Coal Co. LLC, Lone Mountain Processing, LLC, Powell Mountain Energy, LLC, Revelation Energy Holdings, LLC, Revelation Energy, LLC, Revelation Management Corp., Vansant Coal Corporation for Entry of Agreed Order Setting Stipulated Schedule for Briefing of Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Proposed Order)(Amandus, Elizabeth)
October 11, 2019 Filing 10 LETTER-FORM STIPULATION between Contura and Fifth Third Bank extending deadline to file motion to dismiss the appeal, response and reply by Contura Energy, Inc. (Amandus, Elizabeth)
October 11, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #6 Notice Of Change Of Attorney Information by Joseph W. Caldwell. ERROR: Image did not contain signature of counsel. CORRECTION: Image replaced with signed image. (ts)
October 10, 2019 Filing 9 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from M. Nick Sage on behalf of Contura Energy, Inc. Local counsel: Elizabeth A. Amandus. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7410675. (Amandus, Elizabeth)
October 10, 2019 Filing 8 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from James H.R. Windels on behalf of Contura Energy, Inc. Local counsel: Elizabeth A. Amandus. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7410653. (Amandus, Elizabeth)
October 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Elizabeth A. Amandus on behalf of Contura Energy, Inc. (Amandus, Elizabeth)
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION by Joseph W. Caldwell substituting within-firm representation for Joseph W. Caldwell on behalf of Blackjewel Holdings L.L.C. (Caldwell, Joseph) (Modified on 10/11/2019 to replace unsigned image)(ts).
October 3, 2019 Filing 5 ADDITIONAL DESIGNATION OF RECORD ON APPEAL received from Fifth Third Bank as to U. S. Bankruptcy Court in 1 volume. (mkw)
September 27, 2019 Filing 4 DESIGNATION OF RECORD ON APPEAL AND STATEMENT OF ISSUES TO BE PRESENTED received from U. S. Bankruptcy Court in 1 volume. (Attachments: #1 Motion of Debtors for an Order, #2 Declaration of David J. Beckman in Support of Sale Motion, #3 Declaration of Robert J. White in Support of Sale Motion, #4 Fifth Third Bank's Objection to Motion of Debtors for an Order, #5 Order entered 07/26/2019, #6 Objection of Fifth Third Bank to Sale of the Debtors' Assets Free and Clear of Liens, Claims Encumbrances and Interests Pursuant to 363(f) of the Bankruptcy Code, #7 Notice Regarding Draft Proposed Form of Sale Order for Contura Energy, Inc., #8 Amended Notice Regarding Draft Proposed Form of Sale Order for Contura Energy, Inc., #9 Motion of Debtors for Entry of Order Approving the Sale of Pax Assets to Contura Energy, Inc. Free and Clear of Liens, Claims and Encumbrances, #10 Fifth Third Bank's Objection and Response to Debtors' Motion for Entry of Order Approving the Sale of Pax Assets to Contura Energy, Inc. Free and Clear of Liens, Claims and Encumbrances, #11 Notice of Filing of Amended Proposed Order and Asset Purchase Agreement Approving the Sale of Pax Assets to Contura Energy, Inc., #12 Order entered 08/29/2019, #13 Transcript for hearing held 08/28/2019, #14 Transcript for hearing held 08/05/2019, #15 Transcript for hearing held 08/06/2019, #16 Transmittal Sheet) (mkw)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 VACATED PURSUANT TO THE #12 ORDER. AMENDED ORDER directing that the appellant shall file its brief within fourteen days of service of Appellee's Designation of Additional Items to be Included in the Record; the appellees' brief shall be filed within fourteen days after service of the appellant's brief; the appellant's reply brief shall be filed within fourteen days after service of the appellees' brief. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 9/24/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa) Modified on 10/24/2019 to note that this order has been vacated pursuant to the #12 order) (mkw).
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing that the appellant shall file its brief within fourteen days of the date of this order; the appellees' brief shall be filed within fourteen days after service of the appellant's brief; the appellant's reply brief shall be filed within fourteen days after service of the appellees' brief. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 9/23/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
September 16, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL AND TRANSMITTAL by Fifth Third Bank. (Attachments: #1 Order (A) Approving Sale of Debtors' Purchased Assets Free and Clear of Liens, Claims, Interests, and Encumbrances, (B) Authorizing Assumption and Assignment of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases, and (C) Granting Related Relief, #2 Docket Sheet, #3 Transmittal Sheet) (mkw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Blackjewel L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Revelation Management Corp.
Represented By: Joe M. Supple
Represented By: Maura P. McIntyre
Represented By: Nava Hazan
Represented By: Travis A. McRoberts
Represented By: F. Maximilian Czernin
Represented By: Stephen D. Lerner
Represented By: Scott A. Kane
Represented By: Kyle F. Arendsen
Represented By: Felix Maximilian Czernin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Blackjewel L.L.C.
Represented By: Joseph W. Caldwell
Represented By: Joe M. Supple
Represented By: Maura P. McIntyre
Represented By: Nava Hazan
Represented By: Travis A. McRoberts
Represented By: F. Maximilian Czernin
Represented By: Stephen D. Lerner
Represented By: Scott A. Kane
Represented By: Kyle F. Arendsen
Represented By: Felix Maximilian Czernin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Dominion Coal Corporation
Represented By: Joe M. Supple
Represented By: Maura P. McIntyre
Represented By: Nava Hazan
Represented By: Travis A. McRoberts
Represented By: Stephen D. Lerner
Represented By: Kyle F. Arendsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Powell Mountain Energy, LLC
Represented By: Joe M. Supple
Represented By: Maura P. McIntyre
Represented By: Nava Hazan
Represented By: Travis A. McRoberts
Represented By: Stephen D. Lerner
Represented By: Kyle F. Arendsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Revelation Energy Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Joe M. Supple
Represented By: Maura P. McIntyre
Represented By: Nava Hazan
Represented By: Travis A. McRoberts
Represented By: F. Maximilian Czernin
Represented By: Stephen D. Lerner
Represented By: Scott A. Kane
Represented By: Kyle F. Arendsen
Represented By: Felix Maximilian Czernin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Lone Mountain Processing, LLC
Represented By: Joe M. Supple
Represented By: Maura P. McIntyre
Represented By: Nava Hazan
Represented By: Travis A. McRoberts
Represented By: Stephen D. Lerner
Represented By: Kyle F. Arendsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Vansant Coal Corporation
Represented By: Joe M. Supple
Represented By: Maura P. McIntyre
Represented By: Nava Hazan
Represented By: Travis A. McRoberts
Represented By: Stephen D. Lerner
Represented By: Kyle F. Arendsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Cumberland River Coal LLC
Represented By: Joe M. Supple
Represented By: Maura P. McIntyre
Represented By: Nava Hazan
Represented By: Travis A. McRoberts
Represented By: Stephen D. Lerner
Represented By: Kyle F. Arendsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Harold Keene Coal Co. LLC
Represented By: Joe M. Supple
Represented By: Maura P. McIntyre
Represented By: Nava Hazan
Represented By: Travis A. McRoberts
Represented By: Stephen D. Lerner
Represented By: Kyle F. Arendsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Blackjewel Holdings L.L.C.
Represented By: Joseph W. Caldwell
Represented By: Joe M. Supple
Represented By: Maura P. McIntyre
Represented By: Nava Hazan
Represented By: Travis A. McRoberts
Represented By: F. Maximilian Czernin
Represented By: Stephen D. Lerner
Represented By: Scott A. Kane
Represented By: Kyle F. Arendsen
Represented By: Felix Maximilian Czernin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Revelation Energy, LLC
Represented By: Joe M. Supple
Represented By: Maura P. McIntyre
Represented By: Nava Hazan
Represented By: Travis A. McRoberts
Represented By: F. Maximilian Czernin
Represented By: Stephen D. Lerner
Represented By: Scott A. Kane
Represented By: Kyle F. Arendsen
Represented By: Felix Maximilian Czernin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: James Pfeifer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Stephen G. Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Joseph Yoerg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Karen Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Henry Looney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Whitney Kegley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Contura Energy, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Amandus
Represented By: Nathaniel Sokol
Represented By: Angela M. Libby
Represented By: M. Nick Sage
Represented By: James H.R. Windels
Represented By: Damian S. Schaible
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: United States Trustee
Represented By: David L. Bissett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Fifth Third Bank
Represented By: Kirk B. Burkley
Represented By: John J. Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?