R. et al v. Justice et al
Plaintiff: Calvin K., Carolina K., Gretchen C., Anastasia M., Chris K., Karter W., Dennis R., Isabelle Santillion, Garrett M., Sarah Dixon, April Flowers, Serena S., L. Scott Briscoe, Debbie Stone, Jonathan R., Ace L., Cheryl Ord, Katherine Huffman and Theo S.
Defendant: Bill Crouch, Linda Watts, Jim Justice, West Virginia Department of Health and Human Resources and Jeremiah Samples
Case Number: 3:2019cv00710
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Referring Judge: Thomas E Johnston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Filing 20 JOINT MOTION by L. Scott Briscoe, Gretchen C., Sarah Dixon, April Flowers, Katherine Huffman, Calvin K., Carolina K., Chris K., Ace L., Anastasia M., Garrett M., Cheryl Ord, Dennis R., Jonathan R., Serena S., Theo S., Isabelle Santillion, Debbie Stone, Karter W. to Extend Time to File Response/Reply as to #17 MOTION by Bill Crouch, Jim Justice, Jeremiah Samples, Linda Watts, West Virginia Department of Health and Human Resources to Dismiss #1 Complaint to 12/23/19 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Walters, Richard)
November 26, 2019 Filing 19 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Dawn J. Post on behalf of Jonathan R. Local counsel: James A. Meade. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7472576. (Meade, James)
November 26, 2019 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM by Bill Crouch, Jeremiah Samples, Linda Watts, West Virginia Department of Health and Human Resources in support of #17 MOTION by Bill Crouch, Jim Justice, Jeremiah Samples, Linda Watts, West Virginia Department of Health and Human Resources to Dismiss #1 Complaint. (Peisch, Philip)
November 26, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION by Bill Crouch, Jim Justice, Jeremiah Samples, Linda Watts, West Virginia Department of Health and Human Resources to Dismiss #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Appendix Table of Contents, #3 Appendix 1, #4 Appendix 2, #5 Appendix 3, #6 Appendix 4)(Peisch, Philip)
November 21, 2019 Filing 16 UNOPPOSED MOTION by Bill Crouch, Jeremiah Samples, Linda Watts, West Virginia Department of Health and Human Resources to Exceed Page Limit for Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Attachment: #1 Proposed Order)(Peisch, Philip)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER acknowledging the parties' #11 Stipulation Extending Time for Defendants to file their response to the #1 Complaint and extending the deadline for Defendants to file their response to the complaint to no later than 12/2/2019. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 11/12/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mkw)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 11/18/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 12/2/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 12/9/2019. Telephonic Scheduling Conference at 10:00 AM on 12/13/2019 in Charleston. Entry of Scheduling Order 12/18/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 12/27/2019. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 10/31/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (jsa)
October 24, 2019 Filing 13 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Allison Lynette Mahoney on behalf of Jonathan R. Local counsel: James A. Meade. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7426616. (Meade, James)
October 24, 2019 Filing 12 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Marcia Robinson Lowry on behalf of Jonathan R. Local counsel: James A. Meade. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7426563. (Meade, James)
October 24, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME for Defendants' to file responsive pleading to #1 complaint to 12/02/2019 by Bill Crouch, Jim Justice, Jeremiah Samples, Linda Watts, West Virginia Department of Health and Human Resources, All Plaintiffs (Smith, Rebecca) (Modified on 10/27/2019 to add link to #1 complaint to add party filers) (ts).
October 22, 2019 Filing 10 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Rebecca E. Smith on behalf of Linda Watts, Jim Justice, Jeremiah Samples, West Virginia Department of Health and Human Resources, Bill Crouch. Local counsel: Steven R. Compton. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7421714. (Compton, Steven)
October 22, 2019 Filing 9 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Caroline M. Brown on behalf of Linda Watts, Jim Justice, Jeremiah Samples, West Virginia Department of Health and Human Resources, Bill Crouch. Local counsel: Steven R. Compton. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7421687. (Compton, Steven)
October 22, 2019 Filing 8 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Philip J. Peisch on behalf of Linda Watts, Jim Justice, Jeremiah Samples, West Virginia Department of Health and Human Resources, Bill Crouch. Local counsel: Steven R. Compton. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7421656. (Compton, Steven)
October 21, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Douglas Buffington, Steven Ray Compton on behalf of Bill Crouch, Jim Justice, Jeremiah Samples, Linda Watts, West Virginia Department of Health and Human Resources. (Compton, Steven)
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Lori (Peters) Waller on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Waller, Lori) (Modified on 10/8/2019 to replace blank image and on 10/10/2019 to replace unsigned image and to add party filers)(ts).
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. For reasons appearing to the court, this action is reassigned from Judge Robert C. Chambers to Chief Judge Thomas E. Johnston. Signed by Clerk of Court Rory L. Perry II on 10/2/2019.(cc: Judge Chambers; Judge Johnston; counsel of record; unrepresented parties) (klc)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing this case transferred to Rory L. Perry II, Clerk of Court, for reassignment to another judge within this district. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 10/2/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (jsa)
October 1, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bill Crouch, Jim Justice, Jeremiah Samples, Linda Watts, West Virginia Department of Health and Human Resources, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 summons as to Bill Crouch, #2 summons as to Jeremiah Samples, #3 summons as to Linda Watts, #4 summons as to West Virginia Department of Health and Human Resources) (jsa)
September 30, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7399173. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jsa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: R. et al v. Justice et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin K.
Represented By: James A. Meade
Represented By: Richard W. Walters
Represented By: Jeremiah Underhill
Represented By: Erin Snyder
Represented By: Brian L. Ooten
Represented By: Allison Lynette Mahoney
Represented By: Marcia Robinson Lowry
Represented By: Lori (Peters) Waller
Represented By: Dawn J. Post
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolina K.
Represented By: James A. Meade
Represented By: Richard W. Walters
Represented By: Jeremiah Underhill
Represented By: Erin Snyder
Represented By: Brian L. Ooten
Represented By: Allison Lynette Mahoney
Represented By: Marcia Robinson Lowry
Represented By: Lori (Peters) Waller
Represented By: Dawn J. Post
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gretchen C.
Represented By: James A. Meade
Represented By: Richard W. Walters
Represented By: Jeremiah Underhill
Represented By: Erin Snyder
Represented By: Brian L. Ooten
Represented By: Allison Lynette Mahoney
Represented By: Marcia Robinson Lowry
Represented By: Lori (Peters) Waller
Represented By: Dawn J. Post
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anastasia M.
Represented By: James A. Meade
Represented By: Richard W. Walters
Represented By: Jeremiah Underhill
Represented By: Erin Snyder
Represented By: Brian L. Ooten
Represented By: Allison Lynette Mahoney
Represented By: Marcia Robinson Lowry
Represented By: Lori (Peters) Waller
Represented By: Dawn J. Post
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris K.
Represented By: James A. Meade
Represented By: Richard W. Walters
Represented By: Jeremiah Underhill
Represented By: Erin Snyder
Represented By: Brian L. Ooten
Represented By: Allison Lynette Mahoney
Represented By: Marcia Robinson Lowry
Represented By: Lori (Peters) Waller
Represented By: Dawn J. Post
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karter W.
Represented By: James A. Meade
Represented By: Richard W. Walters
Represented By: Jeremiah Underhill
Represented By: Erin Snyder
Represented By: Brian L. Ooten
Represented By: Allison Lynette Mahoney
Represented By: Marcia Robinson Lowry
Represented By: Lori (Peters) Waller
Represented By: Dawn J. Post
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis R.
Represented By: James A. Meade
Represented By: Richard W. Walters
Represented By: Jeremiah Underhill
Represented By: Erin Snyder
Represented By: Brian L. Ooten
Represented By: Allison Lynette Mahoney
Represented By: Marcia Robinson Lowry
Represented By: Lori (Peters) Waller
Represented By: Dawn J. Post
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isabelle Santillion
Represented By: James A. Meade
Represented By: Richard W. Walters
Represented By: Jeremiah Underhill
Represented By: Erin Snyder
Represented By: Brian L. Ooten
Represented By: Allison Lynette Mahoney
Represented By: Marcia Robinson Lowry
Represented By: Lori (Peters) Waller
Represented By: Dawn J. Post
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garrett M.
Represented By: James A. Meade
Represented By: Richard W. Walters
Represented By: Jeremiah Underhill
Represented By: Erin Snyder
Represented By: Brian L. Ooten
Represented By: Allison Lynette Mahoney
Represented By: Marcia Robinson Lowry
Represented By: Lori (Peters) Waller
Represented By: Dawn J. Post
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Dixon
Represented By: James A. Meade
Represented By: Richard W. Walters
Represented By: Jeremiah Underhill
Represented By: Erin Snyder
Represented By: Brian L. Ooten
Represented By: Allison Lynette Mahoney
Represented By: Marcia Robinson Lowry
Represented By: Lori (Peters) Waller
Represented By: Dawn J. Post
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Flowers
Represented By: James A. Meade
Represented By: Richard W. Walters
Represented By: Jeremiah Underhill
Represented By: Erin Snyder
Represented By: Brian L. Ooten
Represented By: Allison Lynette Mahoney
Represented By: Marcia Robinson Lowry
Represented By: Lori (Peters) Waller
Represented By: Dawn J. Post
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Serena S.
Represented By: James A. Meade
Represented By: Richard W. Walters
Represented By: Jeremiah Underhill
Represented By: Erin Snyder
Represented By: Brian L. Ooten
Represented By: Allison Lynette Mahoney
Represented By: Marcia Robinson Lowry
Represented By: Lori (Peters) Waller
Represented By: Dawn J. Post
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L. Scott Briscoe
Represented By: James A. Meade
Represented By: Richard W. Walters
Represented By: Jeremiah Underhill
Represented By: Erin Snyder
Represented By: Brian L. Ooten
Represented By: Allison Lynette Mahoney
Represented By: Marcia Robinson Lowry
Represented By: Lori (Peters) Waller
Represented By: Dawn J. Post
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Stone
Represented By: James A. Meade
Represented By: Richard W. Walters
Represented By: Jeremiah Underhill
Represented By: Erin Snyder
Represented By: Brian L. Ooten
Represented By: Allison Lynette Mahoney
Represented By: Marcia Robinson Lowry
Represented By: Lori (Peters) Waller
Represented By: Dawn J. Post
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan R.
Represented By: James A. Meade
Represented By: Richard W. Walters
Represented By: Jeremiah Underhill
Represented By: Erin Snyder
Represented By: Brian L. Ooten
Represented By: Allison Lynette Mahoney
Represented By: Marcia Robinson Lowry
Represented By: Lori (Peters) Waller
Represented By: Dawn J. Post
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ace L.
Represented By: James A. Meade
Represented By: Richard W. Walters
Represented By: Jeremiah Underhill
Represented By: Erin Snyder
Represented By: Brian L. Ooten
Represented By: Allison Lynette Mahoney
Represented By: Marcia Robinson Lowry
Represented By: Lori (Peters) Waller
Represented By: Dawn J. Post
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Ord
Represented By: James A. Meade
Represented By: Richard W. Walters
Represented By: Jeremiah Underhill
Represented By: Erin Snyder
Represented By: Brian L. Ooten
Represented By: Allison Lynette Mahoney
Represented By: Marcia Robinson Lowry
Represented By: Lori (Peters) Waller
Represented By: Dawn J. Post
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Huffman
Represented By: James A. Meade
Represented By: Richard W. Walters
Represented By: Jeremiah Underhill
Represented By: Erin Snyder
Represented By: Brian L. Ooten
Represented By: Allison Lynette Mahoney
Represented By: Marcia Robinson Lowry
Represented By: Lori (Peters) Waller
Represented By: Dawn J. Post
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theo S.
Represented By: James A. Meade
Represented By: Richard W. Walters
Represented By: Jeremiah Underhill
Represented By: Erin Snyder
Represented By: Brian L. Ooten
Represented By: Allison Lynette Mahoney
Represented By: Marcia Robinson Lowry
Represented By: Lori (Peters) Waller
Represented By: Dawn J. Post
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Crouch
Represented By: Caroline M. Brown
Represented By: Rebecca E. Smith
Represented By: Philip J. Peisch
Represented By: Steven Ray Compton
Represented By: Douglas P. Buffington, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Watts
Represented By: Caroline M. Brown
Represented By: Rebecca E. Smith
Represented By: Philip J. Peisch
Represented By: Steven Ray Compton
Represented By: Douglas P. Buffington, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Justice
Represented By: Caroline M. Brown
Represented By: Rebecca E. Smith
Represented By: Philip J. Peisch
Represented By: Steven Ray Compton
Represented By: Douglas P. Buffington, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Virginia Department of Health and Human Resources
Represented By: Caroline M. Brown
Represented By: Rebecca E. Smith
Represented By: Philip J. Peisch
Represented By: Steven Ray Compton
Represented By: Douglas P. Buffington, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremiah Samples
Represented By: Caroline M. Brown
Represented By: Rebecca E. Smith
Represented By: Philip J. Peisch
Represented By: Steven Ray Compton
Represented By: Douglas P. Buffington, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?