Wilkinson et al v. Allergan Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Steve Wilkinson and Jenny Lee Wilkinson
Defendant: Inamed Corporation, Allergan, PLC, Allergan Inc. and Allergan USA, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00724
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 RESET DEADLINES: Allergan Inc., Allergan USA, Inc. answer due 1/20/2020 pursuant to the #9 Second Joint Stipulation. (mkw)
November 25, 2019 Filing 9 SECOND JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL #1 COMPLAINT to 1/20/2020 by Jenny Lee Wilkinson, Steve Wilkinson, Allergan Inc., Allergan USA, Inc. (Shearer, Richard) (Modified on 11/26/2019 to add party filers and to add link to #1 complaint) (mkw).
November 5, 2019 Filing 8 JOINT STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME for Allergan Inc. and Allergan USA, Inc. to Respond to #1 Complaint to December 6, 2019 by Allergan Inc., Allergan USA, Inc., Steve Wilkinson, Jenny Lee Wilkinson (Shearer, Richard) (Modified on 11/7/2019 to add party filers and to add link to #1 complaint) (ts).
October 25, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 10/16/2019 as to Inamed Corporation. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002597426. (hkl)
October 25, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 10/16/2019 as to Allergan Inc. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002597419. (hkl)
October 25, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 10/16/2019 as to Allergan USA, Inc. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002597402. (hkl)
October 25, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 10/16/2019 as to Allergan, PLC. (hkl)
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (jsa)
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Allergan Inc., Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan, PLC, Inamed Corporation, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 summons as to Allergan USA, Inc., #2 summons as to Allergan PLC, #3 summons as to Inamed Corporation) (jsa)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7404924. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jsa)
October 4, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilkinson et al v. Allergan Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inamed Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Inc.
Represented By: Richard F. Shearer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan USA, Inc.
Represented By: Richard F. Shearer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Wilkinson
Represented By: Brian A. Prim
Represented By: David Todd Mathews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenny Lee Wilkinson
Represented By: Brian A. Prim
Represented By: David Todd Mathews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?