International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No. 132 Health and Welfare Fund et al v. Beckley Drilling & Blasting Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 132 Apprenticeship and Skill Improvement Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No. 132, AFL-CIO, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No. 132 Health and Welfare Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No. 132 Pension Fund and International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 132 Annuity and Savings Fund,
Defendant: Beckley Drilling & Blasting Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00734
Filed: October 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 12/23/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 1/6/2020. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 1/13/2020. Scheduling/status Conference at 11:30 AM on 1/27/2020 in Huntington. Entry of Scheduling Order 2/3/2020. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 2/10/2020. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 12/2/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER TO #1 Complaint by Beckley Drilling & Blasting Services, Inc. (Romano, Shawn)
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 11/7/2019 as to Beckley Drilling & Blasting Services, Inc. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002609389. (jsa)
October 10, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
October 10, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Beckley Drilling & Blasting Services, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (hkl)
October 10, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (hkl)
October 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7410089. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (hkl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No. 132 Health and Welfare Fund et al v. Beckley Drilling & Blasting Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 132 Apprenticeship and Skill Improvement Fund
Represented By: Lawrence B. Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No. 132, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Lawrence B. Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No. 132 Health and Welfare Fund
Represented By: Lawrence B. Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No. 132 Pension Fund
Represented By: Lawrence B. Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 132 Annuity and Savings Fund,
Represented By: Lawrence B. Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beckley Drilling & Blasting Services, Inc.
Represented By: Shawn R. Romano
Represented By: Miles B. Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?