Marcum v. Appalachian Power Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Chloe Marcum
Defendant: Appalachian Power Company, Inc. and Appalachian Power Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00766
Filed: October 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties, amended pleadings due by 3/27/2020. Discovery requests to be completed by 5/29/2020 and all depositions by 9/17/2020. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 7/17/2020, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 8/17/2020, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 9/4/2020. Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 10/9/2020; any response shall be filed within 14 days of the filing of the motion, with replies due within 7 days of the filing of the response. Settlement Meeting and Rule 26(a)(3) disclosures by 12/28/2020. Plaintiff's portion of proposed Pretrial Order to defendants due by 1/4/2021; Proposed Integrated Pretrial Order due by 1/11/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 1/19/2021 at 10:00 AM in Huntington before Judge Robert C. Chambers. Proposed Jury Charges due by 1/26/2021. Final Settlement Conference at 9:30 AM on 2/1/2021 in Huntington. Trial set for 2/2/2021 at 8:30 AM in Huntington before Judge Robert C. Chambers. The Court further CANCELS the scheduling conference set for 1/6/2020. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 12/20/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
December 18, 2019 Filing 18 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by Appalachian Power Company, Chloe Marcum. (Donnellan-Pomeroy, Rebecca) (Modified on 12/19/2019 to add party filer)(ts).
December 18, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER TO #13 Amended Complaint by Appalachian Power Company.(Budig, John)
December 17, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Rebecca L. Donnellan-Pomeroy on behalf of Appalachian Power Company (Donnellan-Pomeroy, Rebecca) (Modified on 12/17/2019 to remove terminated party filer) (ts).
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying as moot Plaintiff's #11 MOTION to Strike Pleading. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 12/5/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (hkl)
December 4, 2019 Filing 14 EXHIBITS 1-4 by Chloe Marcum in support of #13 Amended Complaint. (Hill, R.)
December 4, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT by Chloe Marcum against Appalachian Power Company. (jsa)
December 3, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chloe Marcum for Motion to Strike Pleading. (Hill, R.)
December 2, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION by Chloe Marcum to Strike #7 Answer to Complaint (Hill, R.)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 12/5/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 12/12/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 12/18/2019. Scheduling/status Conference at 11:30 AM on 1/6/2020 in Huntington. Entry of Scheduling Order 1/13/2020. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 1/20/2020. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 11/15/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (hkl)
November 14, 2019 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Appalachian Power Company, Inc. (Budig, John)
November 14, 2019 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Appalachian Power Company, Inc./American Electric Power Company (Budig, John)
November 14, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER TO #1 Complaint by Appalachian Power Company, Inc./American Electric Power Company, Inc. (Budig, John)
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER TO #1 Complaint by Appalachian Power Company, Inc. (Budig, John)
October 28, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 10/24/2019 as to Appalachian Power Company, Inc. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002601925. (mkw)
October 25, 2019 Filing 4 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from William P. Walker Jr. on behalf of Chloe Marcum. Local counsel: R. Edison Hill. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7429186. (Hill, R.)
October 22, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
October 22, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Appalachian Power Company, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (hkl)
October 22, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (hkl)
October 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7421604. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3-A, #4 Exhibit 3-B, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (hkl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marcum v. Appalachian Power Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chloe Marcum
Represented By: R. Edison Hill
Represented By: James Woodrow Hill
Represented By: William P. Walker, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Appalachian Power Company, Inc.
Represented By: John A. Budig
Represented By: Brian R. Swiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Appalachian Power Company
Represented By: Brian R. Swiger
Represented By: Rebecca L. Donnellan-Pomeroy
Represented By: John A. Budig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?