International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No. 132 Health and Welfare Fund et al v. Cofano Energy Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No. 132, AFL-CIO, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No. 132 Health and Welfare Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No. 132 Apprenticeship and Skill Improvement Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No. 132 Pension Fund and International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No. 132 Annuity and Savings Fund
Defendant: Cofano Energy Services, LLC and Antero Resources Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv00788
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2019 Filing 13 RETURN RECEIPT CARD received re: #12 Clerk's Entry of Default. (mkw)
December 19, 2019 Filing 12 ENTRY OF DEFAULT BY CLERK as to Cofano Energy Services, LLC. (Attachment: #1 certified mail receipt) (cc: counsel of record; defendant Cofano Energy Services, LLC via certified mail) (jsa)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #10 AMENDED MOTION for Default against Defendant Cofano Energy Services, LLC; directing the Clerk to enter default, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a), against Defendant Cofano Energy Services, LLC; further directing counsel for Plaintiffs to file the appropriate motion and affidavit, or to arrange for the necessary evidentiary hearing, to facilitate the entry of default judgment, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(b), within twenty days of the entry of this Order; denying as moot Plaintiff's #9 MOTION for Default. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 12/19/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
December 16, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED MOTION by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No. 132, AFL-CIO, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No. 132 Health and Welfare Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No. 132 Annuity and Savings Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No. 132 Pension Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No. 132 Apprenticeship and Skill Improvement Fund for Entry of Default Judgment by the Clerk against Cofano Energy Services, LLC, AMENDED MOTION by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No. 132, AFL-CIO, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No. 132 Health and Welfare Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No. 132 Annuity and Savings Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No. 132 Pension Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No. 132 Apprenticeship and Skill Improvement Fund or Entry of Default Judgment by the Clerk against Cofano Energy Services, LLC. (Lowry, Lawrence)
December 13, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No. 132, AFL-CIO, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No. 132 Health and Welfare Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No. 132 Annuity and Savings Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No. 132 Pension Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No. 132 Apprenticeship and Skill Improvement Fund for Entry of Default Judgment by the Clerk against Cofano Energy Services, LLC. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit Signature card)(Lowry, Lawrence)
December 2, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Antero Resources Corporation in support of #7 MOTION by Antero Resources Corporation to Dismiss #1 Complaint (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Pizzo, John)
December 2, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION by Antero Resources Corporation to Dismiss #1 Complaint. (Pizzo, John) (Modified on 12/2/2019 to add link to #1 complaint) (ts).
December 2, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Antero Resources Corporation (Pizzo, John)
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 11/12/2019 as to Cofano Energy Services, LLC. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002610545. (hkl)
November 20, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 11/12/2019 as to Antero Resources Corporation. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002610538. (hkl)
October 30, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
October 30, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Cofano Energy Services, LLC, Antero Resources Corporation, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachment: #1 Summons for Antero Resources Corporation) (hkl)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (hkl)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7434517. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (hkl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No. 132 Health and Welfare Fund et al v. Cofano Energy Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cofano Energy Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antero Resources Corporation
Represented By: W. Henry Lawrence, IV
Represented By: John Dominic Pizzo, II
Represented By: Ancil G. Ramey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No. 132, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Lawrence B. Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No. 132 Health and Welfare Fund
Represented By: Lawrence B. Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No. 132 Apprenticeship and Skill Improvement Fund
Represented By: Lawrence B. Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No. 132 Pension Fund
Represented By: Lawrence B. Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No. 132 Annuity and Savings Fund
Represented By: Lawrence B. Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?