Picha et al v. Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Robyn Picha and Leonard Picha
Defendant: TransCanada Power Corp. and Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00872
Filed: December 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 THIS CASE HAS BEEN CONSOLIDATED WITH CASE NUMBERS 3:19-cv-0847, 3:19-cv-0859, 3:19-cv-0860, 3:19-cv-0861, 3:19-cv-0862, 3:19-cv-0863, 3:19-cv-0864, 3:19-cv-0865, 3:19-cv-0866, 3:19-cv-0867, 3:19-cv-0868, 3:19-cv-0869, 3:19-cv-0870, 3:19-cv-0871, 3:19-cv-0873. ALL FURTHER ENTRIES SHALL BE DOCKETED IN 3:19-cv-0847. (mkw)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re: #5 JOINT MOTION by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC, Transcanada Power Corp., Leonard Picha, Robyn Picha to Consolidate Civil Actions; directing the cases listed herein consolidated; Civil Action No. 3:19-cv-0847 shall be designated as the lead case, and the matter shall proceed under that styling. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 1/10/2020. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (mkw)
January 10, 2020 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC, TransCanada Power Corp., Robyn Picha, Leonard Picha in support of #5 JOINT MOTION by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC, TransCanada Power Corp., Robyn Picha, Leonard Picha to Consolidate Civil Actions (Raupp, Peter) (Modified on 1/13/2020 to add party filers)(ts).
January 10, 2020 Filing 5 JOINT MOTION by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC, TransCanada Power Corp., Robyn Picha, Leonard Picha to Consolidate Civil Actions (Raupp, Peter) (Modified on 1/13/2020 to add party filers) (ts).
December 10, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC, TransCanada Power Corp. (Raupp, Peter)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 12/24/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 1/6/2020. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 1/13/2020. Scheduling/status Conference at 11:30 AM on 1/27/2020 in Huntington. Entry of Scheduling Order 2/3/2020. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 2/10/2020. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 12/6/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (mkw)
December 5, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #1 Notice of Removal. ERROR: Image did not contain civil action number. CORRECTION: Civil action number added and image replaced. (kew)
December 5, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
December 5, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (hkl)
December 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC, TransCanada Power Corp. with summons, complaint and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Wayne County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7478594. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (st) (Modified on 12/5/2019 to add civil action number and replace image) (kew).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Picha et al v. Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robyn Picha
Represented By: Clayton J. Maddox
Represented By: Jeremy M. McGraw
Represented By: James G. Bordas, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard Picha
Represented By: Clayton J. Maddox
Represented By: Jeremy M. McGraw
Represented By: James G. Bordas, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransCanada Power Corp.
Represented By: John Joseph Meadows
Represented By: Devon J. Stewart
Represented By: Peter J. Raupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC
Represented By: John Joseph Meadows
Represented By: Devon J. Stewart
Represented By: Peter J. Raupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?