Kitts v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Plaintiff: Brandon Kitts
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00916
Filed: December 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45 U.S.C. ยง 51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION by Angela W. Konrad updating name and/or firm information on behalf of Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Konrad, Angela)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 3/4/2020. Rule 26(f) Meeting 3/16/2020. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 3/23/2020. Scheduling/status Conference at 11:30 AM on 4/6/2020 in Huntington. Entry of Scheduling Order 4/13/2020. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 4/20/2020. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 2/14/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (hkl)
February 13, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER TO #1 Complaint by Norfolk Southern Railway Company.(Konrad, Angela)
January 22, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Angela Konrad on 01/17/2020. Norfolk Southern Railway Company waiver mailed on 1/8/2020, answer due 3/9/2020. (Thompson, Robert)
December 31, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (jsa)
December 24, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
December 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7495184. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jsa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kitts v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Represented By: Angela W. Konrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Kitts
Represented By: Robert B. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?