Corns v. Goodwill Industries of KYOWVA Area, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ann Corns
Defendant: Goodwill Industries of KYOWVA Area, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00112
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED SCHEDULING DATES IN LIGHT OF GENERAL ORDER #3 directing the following deadlines have been extended: Rule 12(b) Motions to 04/30/20. Rule 26(f) Meeting to 05/26/20. Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline to 06/01/20. Scheduling Conference to 06/15/20 at 11:30 AM. Entry of Scheduling Order to 06/22/20. Rule 26(a) Disclosure to 06/29/20. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mwk)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 3/31/2020. Rule 26(f) Meeting 4/13/2020. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 4/20/2020. Scheduling/status Conference at 11:30 AM on 5/4/2020 in Huntington. Entry of Scheduling Order 5/11/2020. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 5/18/2020. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 3/11/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
March 6, 2020 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Goodwill Industries of KYOWVA Area, Inc. (Walling, Sarah)
March 6, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER TO #1 Complaint With Jury Demand by Goodwill Industries of KYOWVA Area, Inc. (Walling, Sarah) (Modified on 3/6/2020 to add jury demand) (ts).
February 20, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 2/14/2020 as to Goodwill Industries of KYOWVA Area, Inc.. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002674974. (hkl)
February 7, 2020 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
February 7, 2020 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Goodwill Industries of KYOWVA Area, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (hkl)
February 7, 2020 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (hkl)
February 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7538597. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (hkl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corns v. Goodwill Industries of KYOWVA Area, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodwill Industries of KYOWVA Area, Inc.
Represented By: Arnold John Janicker
Represented By: Sarah A. Walling
Represented By: Dakota Robert Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Corns
Represented By: Hoyt E. Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?