Hamilton v. Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Plaintiff: Roy Hamilton
Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation and The First State Bank
Case Number: 3:2020cv00377
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Counsel by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, The First State Bank (Franks, Raymond)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT FDIC-RECEIVER'S MOTION FOR A STAY OF ALL JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS granting Defendant's #3 MOTION for a Stay of All Judicial Proceedings; this matter is hereby STAYED pending Plaintiff's exhaustion of the administrative claims process mandated by the Financial Institutions Reform, Recovery and Enforcement Act and until further order of the Court; all case deadlines are hereby SUSPENDED pending Plaintiff's exhaustion of the administrative claims process mandated by FIRREA and until further order of the Court; directing the FDIC-Receiver to inform the Court of any final administrative decision within seven days of such decision. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 6/18/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
June 10, 2020 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, The First State Bank in support of #3 MOTION by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, The First State Bank to Stay (Bailey, Benjamin)
June 10, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, The First State Bank to Stay of All Judicial Proceedings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Bailey, Benjamin)
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (jsa)
June 3, 2020 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The First State Bank, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation with summons, complaint, answer, motions, orders, and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Cabell County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, Part 1, #6 Exhibit E, Part 2, #7 Exhibit E, Part 3, #8 Exhibit E, Part 4, #9 Civil Cover Sheet) (jsa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamilton v. Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Represented By: B. Amon James
Represented By: Raymond S. Franks, II
Represented By: Benjamin L. Bailey
Represented By: Kaye A. Allison
Represented By: Christopher D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The First State Bank
Represented By: B. Amon James
Represented By: Raymond S. Franks, II
Represented By: Benjamin L. Bailey
Represented By: Justin M. Harrison
Represented By: Kaye A. Allison
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Christopher D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Hamilton
Represented By: Hoyt E. Glazer
Represented By: Webster J. Arceneaux, III
Represented By: Valerie Harris Raupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?