Hanson v. Saul
Plaintiff: Kevin Julius Hanson
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 3:2020cv00432
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Referring Judge: Dwane L Tinsley
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #8 Summons Returned Executed. ERROR: Duplicate image filed. CORRECTION: Image removed; see entry #7. (ts)
July 15, 2020 RESET ANSWER DEADLINE as to Andrew Saul for 8/31/2020. (ts)
July 15, 2020 Filing 8 INCORRECT ENTRY; IMAGE REMOVED. (Modified on 7/19/2020 to remove incorrect duplicate entry; see entry #7) (ts).
July 15, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Kevin Julius Hanson for service upon Andrew Saul, re: #2 Complaint . Andrew Saul served on 7/2/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. Person Served: Sharon White. Return Receipt Card for Attorney General signed on 7/9/2020. Return Receipt Card for Commissioner of Social Security signed on 7/10/2020. (Harbor, Paula) (Modified on 7/19/2020 to convert event to summons returned executed) (ts).
June 25, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Andrew Saul, re: #2 Complaint. Summons returnable 60 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (hkl)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AND NOTICE GRANTING IN FORMA PAUPERIS granting Plaintiff's #1 APPLICATION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs; directing the Clerk of the Court to issue the summons(es); directing that Plaintiff shall serve the summons(es) and complaint pursuant to Rule 4, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; further directing that the recovery, if any, obtained in this action shall be paid to the Clerk of the Court, who shall pay therefrom all unpaid costs taxed against plaintiff and pay the balance to the plaintiff and his attorney, if any. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley on 6/25/2020. (cc: counsel of record) (hkl)
June 25, 2020 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
June 24, 2020 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
June 24, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Kevin Julius Hanson for Andrew Saul, re: #2 Complaint. (jsa)
June 24, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jsa)
June 24, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION by Kevin Julius Hanson to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. (jsa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hanson v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Nora R. Koch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Julius Hanson
Represented By: Paula L. Harbour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?