Clark v. HHC River Park, Inc.
Plaintiff: Trudi Clark
Defendant: HHC River Park, Inc. doing business as River Park Hospital
Case Number: 3:2020cv00497
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties, amended pleadings due by 9/28/2020. Discovery requests to be completed by 3/29/2021 and all depositions by 5/13/2021. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 2/16/2021, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 3/12/2021, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 3/29/2021. Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 6/2/2021, any response shall be filed within 14 days of the filing of the motion, with replies due within 7 days of the filing of the response. Settlement Meeting and Rule 26(a)(3) disclosures by 7/12/2021. Plaintiff's portion of proposed Pretrial Order to defendant due by 7/19/2021, Proposed Integrated Pretrial Order due by 7/26/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 8/2/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge Robert C. Chambers. Proposed Jury Charges due by 8/10/2021. Final Settlement Conference at 9:30 AM on 8/16/2021 in Huntington. Trial set for 8/17/2021 at 8:30 AM in Huntington before Judge Robert C. Chambers; canceling the scheduling conference set for 9/14/2020. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 9/2/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (hkl)
August 31, 2020 Filing 7 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by HHC River Park, Inc., Trudi Clark. (Capito, Katherine) (Modified on 9/1/2020 to add party filer) (ts).
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL by HHC River Park, Inc. (Capito, Katherine)
July 28, 2020 RESET ANSWER DEADLINE as to HHC River Park, Inc. for 8/19/2020. (ts)
July 28, 2020 Filing 5 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME for HHC River Park, Inc. to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal to August 19, 2020 by HHC River Park, Inc., Trudi Clark (Capito, Katherine) (Modified on 7/29/2020 to add party filer) (ts).
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 8/13/2020. Rule 26(f) Meeting 8/24/2020. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 8/31/2020. Scheduling/status Conference at 11:30 AM on 9/14/2020 in Huntington. Entry of Scheduling Order 9/21/2020. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 9/28/2020. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 7/24/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (hkl)
July 22, 2020 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant HHC River Park, Inc. (Capito, Katherine)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (jsa)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by HHC River Park, Inc. with summons, complaint and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Cabell County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7683513. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 state court summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (jsa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. HHC River Park, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trudi Clark
Represented By: Hoyt E. Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HHC River Park, Inc. doing business as River Park Hospital
Represented By: Katherine B. Capito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?