Allied Insurance Company of America v. Professional Fire Extinguishers Sales & Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Allied Insurance Company of America
Defendant: Professional Fire Extinguishers Sales & Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00540
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER continuing the stay of this matter to allow the parties additional time to review evidence, consult with experts, review significant documents, and other efforts necessary for substantive settlement negotiations; the parties will report the settlement status to the Court via letter by 12/1/2020. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 10/5/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (mkw)
October 5, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Professional Fire Extinguishers Sales & Services, Inc. for Subpoenas for Sholand, LLC, ARC Fat Patty's LLC and Clint Artrip. (Hulett, Eric)
October 5, 2020 Filing 9 STATUS REPORT by Professional Fire Extinguishers Sales & Services, Inc. (Warder, Zachary)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AGREED ORDER STAYING CASE directing that this case is hereby stayed pending further order of the Court and, further, counsel for the parties shall report to this Court via letter on 10/1/2020 as to the status of the efforts described herein towards resolution of this case, and upon motion of either party, this Court shall set a scheduling hearing promptly in response. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 9/2/2020. (cc: counsel of record) (jsa)
August 21, 2020 Filing 7 PROPOSED ORDER Agreed Order Staying Case by Professional Fire Extinguishers Sales & Services, Inc., Allied Insurance Company of America (Hulett, Eric) (Modified on 8/24/2020 to add party filer) (ts).
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 9/10/2020. Rule 26(f) Meeting 9/21/2020. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 9/28/2020. Scheduling/status Conference at 11:30 AM on 10/13/2020 in Huntington. Entry of Scheduling Order 10/19/2020. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 10/26/2020. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 8/21/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Professional Fire Extinguishers Sales & Services, Inc. (Warder, Zachary) (Modified on 8/20/20 to remove jury demand) (ts)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Professional Fire Extinguishers Sales & Services, Inc. in support of #3 MOTION by Professional Fire Extinguishers Sales & Services, Inc. to Dismiss Complaint. (Warder, Zachary)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION by Professional Fire Extinguishers Sales & Services, Inc. to Dismiss Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal. (Warder, Zachary) (Modified on 8/20/2020 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (ts).
August 13, 2020 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
August 13, 2020 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (hkl)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Professional Fire Extinguishers Sales & Services, Inc. with notice of filing, affidavit of service, summons, complaint, and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Putnam County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7705031. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (hkl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allied Insurance Company of America v. Professional Fire Extinguishers Sales & Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Professional Fire Extinguishers Sales & Services, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Jett Hulett
Represented By: Zachary Hanley Warder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allied Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Jeremy Lynn Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?