Massie v. Saul
Plaintiff: Gina Rae Massie
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 3:2020cv00545
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Referring Judge: Cheryl A Eifert
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Gina Rae Massie for service upon Andrew Saul, re: #6 Electronic Summons Issued re: Complaint. Andrew Saul served on 8/26/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. Person Served: U.S. Attorney Office, Vicky Dickerson. Return Receipt Card for Attorney General signed on 8/28/2020. Return Receipt Card for Commissioner of Social Security signed on 8/26/2020. (Hicks, Kenneth)
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Andrew Saul, re: #2 Complaint. Summons returnable 60 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (hkl)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AND NOTICE ALLOWING PLAINTIFF TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF COSTS AND FEES granting Plaintiff's #1 APPLICATION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs; directing the Clerk of the Court to issue the summonses; directing the Plaintiff to serve the summonses and #2 Complaint pursuant to Rule 4, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; further directing that the recovery, if any, obtained in this action shall be paid to the Clerk of the Court, who shall pay therefrom all unpaid costs and fees taxed against the plaintiff and pay the balance to the plaintiff and her attorney, if any. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 8/18/2020. (cc: counsel of record) (hkl)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
August 17, 2020 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Gina Rae Massie for Andrew Saul, re: #2 Complaint. (jsa)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jsa)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION by Gina Rae Massie to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. (jsa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Massie v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Nora R. Koch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gina Rae Massie
Represented By: Kenneth P. Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?