Hackman v. The Chemours Company
Plaintiff: William Hackman
Defendant: The Chemours Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00557
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Without Prejudice by William Hackman pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i), Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Glazer, Hoyt)
September 30, 2020 RESET DEADLINE: The Chemours Company answer due 10/19/2020 pursuant to the #5 Stipulation. (mkw)
September 30, 2020 Filing 5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO #1 COMPLAINT by William Hackman, The Chemours Company; the parties stipulate and agree that Defendant shall have until 10/19/2020 to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. (Vance, Ellen) (Modified on 9/30/2020 to add party filer) (mkw).
September 14, 2020 RESET ANSWER DEADLINE as to The Chemours Company for 10/5/2020 pursuant to #4 Stipulation. (ts)
September 14, 2020 Filing 4 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME for The Chemours Company to Answer or Otherwise Plead to #1 Complaint to October 5, 2020 by The Chemours Company, William Hackman(Vance, Ellen) (Modified on 9/15/2020 to add party filer) (ts).
August 21, 2020 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (jsa)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Chemours Company, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (jsa)
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7713521. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jsa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hackman v. The Chemours Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chemours Company
Represented By: Ellen J. Vance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Hackman
Represented By: Hoyt E. Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?