Newell v. Major Fleming et al
Plaintiff: Leroy Newell
Defendant: Western Regional Jail, Captain Diamond, Major Flemings, Aldridge and Major Fleming
Case Number: 3:2020cv00603
Filed: October 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Referring Judge: Cheryl A Eifert
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER directing Plaintiff to pay the $5.00 partial filing fee ordered by the Court on 10/5/2020, re: #10 Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 12/3/2020. (cc: Plaintiff) (hkl)
November 17, 2020 Filing 13 LETTER to Leroy Newell, from Rory L. Perry II dated 11/17/2020, re: #12 letter advising of updated address and requesting a copy of document. (klc)
November 13, 2020 Filing 12 LETTER to Clerk, USDC/SDWV, from Leroy Newell dated 11/9/2020, re: update of address and request of copy of document. (hkl)
October 15, 2020 Filing 11 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Leroy Newell against Captain Diamond, Major Fleming. (jsa)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting Plaintiff's #8 APPLICATION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs; directing Plaintiff to make a $5.00 initial filing fee payment on or before 10/23/2020 and to make monthly payments thereafter, as more fully set forth herein; further directing that the recovery, if any, obtained in this action shall be paid to the Clerk of Court, who shall collect therefrom all unpaid fees and costs taxed against Plaintiff and shall pay the balance, if any, to the Plaintiff; Plaintiff shall have through and including 10/30/2020 in which to amend the complaint a second time to include the necessary allegations, as more filly set forth herein; denying Plaintiff's #7 MOTION for the Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 10/5/2020. (cc: Plaintiff with 1983 Complaint form) (jsa)
September 29, 2020 Filing 9 AUTHORIZATION TO RELEASE INSTITUTIONAL ACCOUNT INFORMATION by Leroy Newell. (jsa)
September 29, 2020 Filing 8 APPLICATION by Leroy Newell to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. (jsa)
September 28, 2020 Filing 7 LETTER-FORM MOTION by Leroy Newell for Appointment of Counsel. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. (jsa)
September 28, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT by Leroy Newell against Western Regional Jail, Warden/Superintendent Aldridge, Major Flemings, Captain Diamond. (jsa)
September 23, 2020 Filing 5 LETTER to Leroy Newell, from Rory L. Perry II dated 9/23/2020, re: #4 letter with questions regarding case. (klc)
September 23, 2020 Filing 4 LETTER to Clerk, USDC/SDWV, from Leroy Newell dated 9/21/2020, re: questions regarding case. (jsa)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing Plaintiff to amend his complaint within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, as more fully set forth herein; notifying Plaintiff that a failure to amend the complaint as ordered shall result in a recommendation that the complaint be dismissed for failure to state a claim and/or for failure to prosecute; further directing Plaintiff, within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, to either pay the filing fee of $400 or submit to the Court a completed and signed Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs; notifying Plaintiff that no action will occur on his Complaint until the fee is paid or the application is approved. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 9/16/2020. (cc: Plaintiff with 1983 Complaint form and Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs) (jsa)
September 14, 2020 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (jsa)
September 14, 2020 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
September 14, 2020 Filing 1 LETTER-FORM COMPLAINT. (jsa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newell v. Major Fleming et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Regional Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Diamond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Major Flemings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Major Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leroy Newell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?