Cantley et al v. Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC
Plaintiff: Connie Cantley and Jack Cantley
Defendant: Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00640
Filed: September 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties, amended pleadings due by 12/23/2020. Discovery requests to be completed by 3/29/2021 and all depositions by 5/14/2021. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 3/15/2021, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 4/15/2021, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 5/13/2021. Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 6/3/2021, any response shall be filed within 14 days of the filing of the motion, with replies due within 7 days of the filing of the response. Settlement Meeting and Rule 26(a)(3) disclosures by 7/19/2021. Plaintiffs' portion of proposed Pretrial Order to defendant due by 7/26/2021, Proposed Integrated Pretrial Order due by 8/2/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 8/9/2021 at 11:00 AM in Huntington before Judge Robert C. Chambers. Proposed Jury Charges due by 8/17/2021. Final Settlement Conference at 9:30 AM on 8/23/2021 in Huntington. Trial set for 8/24/2021 at 8:30 AM in Huntington before Judge Robert C. Chambers; further canceling the scheduling conference set for 11/23/2020. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 11/10/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (hkl)
November 9, 2020 Filing 5 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by Jack Cantley, Connie Cantley, Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Raupp, Peter) (Modified on 11/9/2020 to add party filers) (mkw).
October 20, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Connie Cantley, Jack Cantley for Plaintiffs Answers to Defendant's First Set of Combined Discovery Requests to Plaintiffs. (Elmore, O.)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 10/21/2020. Rule 26(f) Meeting 11/2/2020. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 11/9/2020. Scheduling/status Conference at 11:30 AM on 11/23/2020 in Huntington. Entry of Scheduling Order 11/30/2020. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 12/7/2020. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 10/1/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (hkl)
September 28, 2020 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
September 28, 2020 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (hkl)
September 28, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC with summons, complaint, answer, docket sheet and other miscellaneous documents from Circuit Court of Cabell County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7751374. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (hkl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cantley et al v. Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Cantley
Represented By: O. Gay Elmore, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Cantley
Represented By: O. Gay Elmore, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC
Represented By: Peter J. Raupp
Represented By: John Joseph Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?