Henderson v. United States of America
Petitioner: Marquise Henderson
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2020cv00763
Filed: November 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Referring Judge: Cheryl A Eifert
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 474 ORDER directing the United States to answer Movant's #470 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence by a Person in Federal Custody pursuant to Title 28, United States Code, Section 2255, within sixty (60) days of the entry of this Order in accordance with Rule 5, Rules Governing 2255 Proceedings in the United States District Court; Movant may, if he wishes, file a reply to the answer of the United States within sixty (60) days after service of the answer by the United States. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 11/30/2020. (cc: USA; Movant) (jsa)
November 30, 2020 Filing 473 CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF 2255 MOTION by Marquise Edward Henderson to U. S. Attorney with copy to Movant, Judge, Magistrate Judge. (jsa)
November 23, 2020 Filing 472 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: Judge Chambers; Magistrate Judge Eifert; Petitioner; USA; USM; USP) Cross Reference Criminal Number 3:17-cr-00100-02. (klc)
November 19, 2020 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
November 19, 2020 Filing 471 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Marquise Henderson in support of #470 MOTION by Marquise Henderson to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence by a Person in Federal Custody pursuant to Title 28, United States Code, Section 2255. Cross Reference Criminal Case Number 3:17-cr-00100-02. (jsa) Modified document number on 11/20/2020 to correspond to companion criminal action (cbo).
November 19, 2020 Filing 470 MOTION by Marquise Henderson to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence by a Person in Federal Custody pursuant to Title 28, United States Code, Section 2255. Cross Reference Criminal Case Number 3:17-cr-00100-02. (jsa) Modified document number on 11/20/2020 to correspond to companion criminal action (cbo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henderson v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Joseph F. Adams
Represented By: Stephanie Shannon Taylor
Represented By: Gabriele Wohl (AUSA)
Represented By: Christopher R. Arthur
Represented By: Eumi L. Choi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marquise Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?