Gibson v. Uptowner Inns Inc.
Plaintiff: Megan Gibson
Defendant: Uptowner Inns Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00785
Filed: December 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 2/16/2021. Rule 26(f) Meeting 3/1/2021. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 3/8/2021. Scheduling/status Conference at 11:30 AM on 3/22/2021 in Huntington. Entry of Scheduling Order 3/29/2021. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 4/5/2021. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 1/25/2021. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
January 21, 2021 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Uptowner Inns Inc. (Rhein, Mitchell)
January 21, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Uptowner Inns Inc. (Rhein, Mitchell)
December 16, 2020 RESET DEADLINE: Uptowner Inns Inc. answer due 1/21/2021. (mkw)
December 16, 2020 Filing 4 STIPULATION EXTENDING DEFENDANT'S DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT by Megan Gibson, Uptowner Inns Inc.; the parties stipulate that Defendant's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the #1 Complaint shall be extended to January 21, 2021. (Rhein, Mitchell) (Modified on 12/17/2020 to add party filer and to add link to #1 complaint) (mkw).
December 4, 2020 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
December 4, 2020 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Uptowner Inns Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (hkl)
December 4, 2020 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (hkl)
December 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7819226. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (hkl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gibson v. Uptowner Inns Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Gibson
Represented By: Hoyt E. Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uptowner Inns Inc.
Represented By: Eric W. Iskra
Represented By: Mitchell J. Rhein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?