Romans v. Wayne County Commission et al
Plaintiff: Patricia Romans
Defendant: Wayne County Commission and Richard Thompson
Case Number: 3:2020cv00797
Filed: December 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RESPONSE by Patricia Romans in opposition to #9 MOTION by Richard Thompson, Wayne County Commission to Dismiss With Prejudice, re: #1 Complaint and #10 Memorandum In Support. (Glazer, Hoyt)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Richard Thompson, Wayne County Commission in support of #9 MOTION by Richard Thompson, Wayne County Commission to Dismiss With Prejudice. (Greve, Wendy)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION by Richard Thompson, Wayne County Commission to Dismiss With Prejudice, re: #1 Complaint. (Greve, Wendy) (Modified on 1/27/2021 to add link to #1 complaint) (mkw).
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 1/26/2021. Rule 26(f) Meeting 2/8/2021. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 2/16/2021. Scheduling/status Conference at 11:30 AM on 3/1/2021 in Huntington. Entry of Scheduling Order 3/8/2021. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 3/15/2021. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 1/7/2021. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jacob D. Layne on behalf of Richard Thompson, Wayne County Commission. (Layne, Jacob)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendants Richard Thompson, Wayne County Commission. (Greve, Wendy)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Richard Thompson, Wayne County Commission; Jury demand. (Greve, Wendy)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Wendy E. Greve on behalf of Richard Thompson, Wayne County Commission. (Greve, Wendy)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Richard Thompson, Wayne County Commission, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachment: #1 Summons as to Richard Thompson) (jsa)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7824634. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons as to Wayne County Commission, #2 Proposed Summons as to Richard Thompson, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jsa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Romans v. Wayne County Commission et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne County Commission
Represented By: Wendy E. Greve
Represented By: Jacob D. Layne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Thompson
Represented By: Wendy E. Greve
Represented By: Jacob D. Layne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Romans
Represented By: Hoyt E. Glazer
Represented By: Abraham J. Saad
Represented By: Eric B. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?