Donahue et al v. Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Barbara Donahue and Rex Donahue
Defendant: First State Bank and Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Case Number: 3:2021cv00042
Filed: January 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 12:1821
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2021 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for The First State Bank in support of #6 MOTION by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for The First State Bank for Dismissal of All Claims With Prejudice, re: #1 Complaint. (Smith, Christopher)
March 4, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for The First State Bank for Dismissal of All Claims With Prejudice, re: #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Smith, Christopher) (Modified on 3/5/2021 to add party filer) (mkw).
February 1, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as receiver for the First State Bank, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 60 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 Summons for Robert Feldman, #2 Summons for B. Amon, #3 Summons for Nicholas Katsonis) (hkl)
February 1, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Rex Donahue for Rex Donahue, re: #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons for Attorney General of the United States, #2 Summons for Robert Feldman, #3 Summons for Attorney General of the United States, US Department of Justice)(Cook, Steven)
January 19, 2021 Filing 3 RESPONSE by Rex Donahue in support of #1 Complaint. (Cook, Steven)
January 15, 2021 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
January 15, 2021 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (hkl)
January 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7854863. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (hkl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Donahue et al v. Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First State Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Benjamin L. Bailey
Represented By: Christopher D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Donahue
Represented By: Steven T. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rex Donahue
Represented By: Steven T. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?