Dishman et al v. West Virginia American Water Company
Plaintiff: Adam Wellman, Earl Dishman, Arlie Crane and Utility Workers' United Association, Local 537
Defendant: West Virginia American Water Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv00066
Filed: January 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Mark H. Dellinger, Grace E. Hurney on behalf of West Virginia American Water Company. (Dellinger, Mark)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 WAIVER OF THE SERVICE OF SUMMONS EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Mark H. Dellinger on 02/10/2021. West Virginia American Water Company waiver mailed on 1/27/2021, answer due 3/29/2021. (Pasquarelli, Samuel)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION by Vincent Trivelli updating name and/or firm information on behalf of Utility Workers' United Association, Local 537. (Trivelli, Vincent)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Samuel J. Pasquarelli on behalf of Utility Workers' United Association, Local 537. Local counsel: Vincent Trivelli. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7863979. (Trivelli, Vincent)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to West Virginia American Water Company, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (hkl)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (hkl)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7862881. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Statement of Visiting Attorney and Designation of Local Counsel, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (hkl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dishman et al v. West Virginia American Water Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Wellman
Represented By: Vincent Trivelli
Represented By: Samuel James Pasquarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl Dishman
Represented By: Vincent Trivelli
Represented By: Samuel James Pasquarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arlie Crane
Represented By: Vincent Trivelli
Represented By: Samuel James Pasquarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Utility Workers' United Association, Local 537
Represented By: Vincent Trivelli
Represented By: Samuel James Pasquarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Virginia American Water Company
Represented By: Mark H. Dellinger
Represented By: Grace E. Hurney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?