Ohio Valley Physicians, Inc. v. Commonwealth Billing, LLC
Plaintiff: Ohio Valley Physicians, Inc.
Defendant: Commonwealth Billing, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00094
Filed: February 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2021 Filing 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND RESPONSIVE PLEADING by Ohio Valley Physicians, Inc., Commonwealth Billing, LLC, re: #1 Complaint; the parties stipulate that the responsive pleading date for Commonwealth Billing, LLC, n/k/a/ Vivinx is extended to 5/6/2021. (French, Ashley) (Modified on 3/30/2021 to add party filer) (mkw).
March 30, 2021 RESET DEADLINE: Commonwealth Billing, LLC answer due 5/6/2021 pursuant to the #6 Stipulation. (mkw)
March 3, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Ashley W. French on 3/3/2021. Commonwealth Billing, LLC waiver mailed on 2/5/2021, answer due 4/6/2021. (French, Ashley)
February 5, 2021 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
February 5, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons by Ohio Valley Physicians, Inc. (Walling, Sarah)
February 5, 2021 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (jsa)
February 5, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Commonwealth Billing, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (jsa)
February 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7872054. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (jsa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ohio Valley Physicians, Inc. v. Commonwealth Billing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ohio Valley Physicians, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas E. Scarr
Represented By: Sarah A. Walling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth Billing, LLC
Represented By: Ashley W. French
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?