Holland et al v. Keyrock Energy, Inc.
Plaintiff: United Mine Workers of America 1992 Benefit Plan, Joseph R. Reschini, Michael H. Holland, Carlo Tarley, Micheal O. McKown, Paul Piccolini and Michael O. McKown
Defendant: Keyrock Energy, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00374
Filed: June 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1002
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Anthony J. Sparacino, Jr./Attorney on 08/02/2021. (Hill, James)
July 26, 2021 Filing 5 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Barbara Locklin on behalf of United Mine Workers of America 1992 Benefit Plan. Local counsel: James Woodrow Hill. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7996169. (Hill, James)(Modified on 7/26/2021 to add name of visiting attorney) (mkw).
July 26, 2021 Filing 4 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Larry D. Newsome on behalf of United Mine Workers of America 1992 Benefit Plan. Local counsel: James Woodrow Hill. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7996163. (Hill, James) (Modified on 7/26/2021 to add name of visiting attorney) (mkw).
July 2, 2021 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT by Carlo Tarley, Michael H. Holland, United Mine Workers of America 1992 Benefit Plan, Micheal O. McKown, Paul Piccolini against Keyrock Energy, Inc. (jsa)
June 29, 2021 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (hkl)
June 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7975163. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (kew)
June 24, 2021 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holland et al v. Keyrock Energy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Mine Workers of America 1992 Benefit Plan
Represented By: Barbara E. Locklin
Represented By: Glenda S. Finch
Represented By: James Woodrow Hill
Represented By: Larry D. Newsome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph R. Reschini
Represented By: Barbara E. Locklin
Represented By: Glenda S. Finch
Represented By: James Woodrow Hill
Represented By: Larry D. Newsome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael H. Holland
Represented By: Barbara E. Locklin
Represented By: Glenda S. Finch
Represented By: James Woodrow Hill
Represented By: Larry D. Newsome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlo Tarley
Represented By: Barbara E. Locklin
Represented By: Glenda S. Finch
Represented By: James Woodrow Hill
Represented By: Larry D. Newsome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Micheal O. McKown
Represented By: Barbara E. Locklin
Represented By: Glenda S. Finch
Represented By: James Woodrow Hill
Represented By: Larry D. Newsome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Piccolini
Represented By: Barbara E. Locklin
Represented By: Glenda S. Finch
Represented By: James Woodrow Hill
Represented By: Larry D. Newsome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael O. McKown
Represented By: Barbara E. Locklin
Represented By: Glenda S. Finch
Represented By: James Woodrow Hill
Represented By: Larry D. Newsome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keyrock Energy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?