Clay v. Sulzer Pumps (US) Inc. et al
Plaintiff: David L. Clay
Defendant: Sulzer Pumps (US) Inc., Sulzer Sturm Manufacturing, Mark Black and Keith Zimmerman
Case Number: 3:2021cv00389
Filed: July 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #7 MOTION to Hold Scheduling Order and Notice of 26(f) Meeting in Abeyance; canceling the 8/30/2021 scheduling conference; the parties may have until 9/7/2021 in which to finalize settlement and submit an agreed dismissal order; if a settlement is not reached, directing the parties to notify the Court no later than 9/7/2021 so that further scheduling can be addressed. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 8/27/2021. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
August 26, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION by David L. Clay to Hold Scheduling Order and Notice of 26(f) Meeting in Abeyance, re: #3 Order and Notice. (Saad, Abraham) (Modified on 8/27/2021 to add link to #3 order and notice) (mkw).
July 21, 2021 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Sulzer Pumps (US) Inc. (Scarr, Thomas)
July 13, 2021 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM by Mark Black, Sulzer Pumps (US) Inc., Keith Zimmerman in support of #4 MOTION by Mark Black, Sulzer Pumps (US) Inc., Keith Zimmerman to Dismiss With Prejudice. (Scarr, Thomas)
July 13, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION by Mark Black, Sulzer Pumps (US) Inc., Keith Zimmerman to Dismiss With Prejudice, re: Complaint attached to the #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Scarr, Thomas) (Modified on 7/13/2021 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (mkw).
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions - 7/30/2021. Rule 26(f) Meeting - 8/9/2021. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting - 8/16/2021. Scheduling/status conference at 11:30 AM on 8/30/2021 in Huntington. Entry of Scheduling Order - 9/7/2021. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures - 9/13/2021. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 7/9/2021. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
July 7, 2021 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (ts)
July 7, 2021 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (hkl)
July 7, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Sulzer Pumps (US) Inc., Mark Black, Keith Zimmerman with summonses, complaint, notice of filing notice of removal, and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Cabell County. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7983235. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (hkl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clay v. Sulzer Pumps (US) Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sulzer Pumps (US) Inc.
Represented By: Michael A. Frye
Represented By: Thomas E. Scarr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sulzer Sturm Manufacturing
Represented By: Michael A. Frye
Represented By: Thomas E. Scarr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Black
Represented By: Michael A. Frye
Represented By: Thomas E. Scarr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Zimmerman
Represented By: Michael A. Frye
Represented By: Thomas E. Scarr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David L. Clay
Represented By: Abraham J. Saad
Represented By: Eric B. Anderson
Represented By: Hoyt E. Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?